Lyubomir Mihailov Yordanov v. L. J. Milusnic
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Christina A Snyder |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-02034 |
Nature of Suit | 530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General |
Cause | 28:2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federal) |
Case Filed: | Mar 14, 2017 |
Terminated: | Apr 18, 2017 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 04/17/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Wednesday, June 29, 2022 | ||
18 | 18
notice
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123)
Wed 06/29 2:53 PM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Victoria A Degtyareva counsel for Respondent L J Milusnic. Victoria A Degtyareva is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by plaintiff Warden L J Milusnic. (Degtyareva, Victoria) |
|
Monday, April 23, 2018 | ||
17 | 17
appeal
USCA Mandate
Wed 04/25 2:17 PM
MANDATE of Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals10 CCA # 17-55584 The judgment of this Court, entered February 27, 2018, takes effect this date. This constitutes the formal mandate of this Court issued pursuant to Rule 41(a) of the Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure. [See USCA Memorandum16 DISMISSED.] (mat) |
|
Tuesday, February 27, 2018 | ||
16 | 16
appeal
USCA Memorandum/Opinion/Order
Wed 02/28 11:38 AM
ORDER from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals10 filed by Lyubomir Mihailov Yordanov. CCA # 17-55584 Appellee's motion to dismiss this appeal is granted. (gk) |
|
Friday, September 22, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
appeal
USCA Memorandum/Opinion/Order
Mon 09/25 2:58 PM
ORDER from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals10 filed by Lyubomir Mihailov Yordanov. CCA # 17-55584 The motion for a stay of extradition pending appellant's filing of a motion for reconsideration is denied. Appellant's request to extend the deadline for filing his motion for reconsideration until September 29, 2017 is granted. (mat) |
|
Wednesday, April 26, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
appeal
USCA Notification of Case Number
Thu 04/27 1:34 PM
NOTIFICATION from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals of case number assigned and briefing schedule. Appeal Docket No. 17-55584 assigned to Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals10 as to Petitioner Lyubomir Mihailov Yordanov. (gk) |
|
13 | 13
order
Stay Order (other)
Thu 04/27 9:39 AM
ORDER by Judge Christina A. Snyder: Upon Defendant's Ex Parte Application11 , IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that surrender of Defendant Lyubomir Mihailov Yordanov by the United States government to the Bulgarian government shall be STAYED for 30 days pending an application for a further stay from the Court of Appeals. (gk) |
|
12 | 12
respm
Objection/Opposition (Motion related)
Wed 04/26 9:26 AM
UNITED STATES' OPPOSITION re: EX PARTE APPLICATION to Stay pending Surrender Pending Appeal Order, Terminated Case9 11 filed by Respondent L J Milusnic. (Degtyareva, Victoria) |
|
Tuesday, April 25, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Stay Order (other)
Tue 04/25 3:05 PM
EX PARTE APPLICATION to Stay pending Surrender Pending Appeal Order, Terminated Case9 filed by defendant Lyubomir Mihailov Yordanov. (Chowdhury, Ashfaq) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
10 | 10
appeal
Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals
Tue 04/25 1:33 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by petitioner Lyubomir Mihailov Yordanov. Appeal of Order, Terminated Case9 . (Appeal Fee - Fee exempt pursuant to statute). (Chowdhury, Ashfaq) |
|
Tuesday, April 18, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
order
Order ~Util - Terminate Civil Case
Wed 04/19 4:49 PM
ORDER by Judge Christina A. Snyder: Petitioner Lyubomir Mihailov Yordanov's petition for habeas relief3 is DENIED. The stay of extradition proceedings entered on 3/21/20178 is VACATED. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (gk) |
|
Tuesday, March 21, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
order
Stay Order (other)
Tue 03/21 3:32 PM
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Christina A. Snyder: The Court grants defendant's Ex Parte Application Seeking Stay of Extradition of Habeas Petition filed 3/15/20173 . Defendant's extradition shall be stayed pending resolution of his habeas petition. The Court is in receipt of the government's opposition to Petitioner's Habeas Petition/Appeal From Certification of Extradition filed on 3/17/20176 . Defendant shall file a reply on or before 3/31/2017. Court Reporter: Not Present. (gk) |
|
Friday, March 17, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
respm
Objection/Opposition (Motion related)
Fri 03/17 3:24 PM
OPPOSITION re: EX PARTE APPLICATION to Stay pending SEEKING STAY OF EXTRADITION PENDING RESOLUTION OF HABEAS PETITION 3 filed by Respondent L J Milusnic.(Degtyareva, Victoria) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of Victoria A. Degtyareva | ||
6 | 6
misc
Miscellaneous Document
Fri 03/17 3:18 PM
UNITED STATES OPPOSITION TO PETITIONERS HABEAS PETITION/APPEAL FROM CERTIFICATION OF EXTRADITION filed by Respondent L J Milusnic re: Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus,1 (Degtyareva, Victoria) |
|
Thursday, March 16, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
attorney
Attorney Appearance or Reassignment for the USA
Thu 03/16 6:49 AM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE of Assistant United States Attorney VICTORIA A. DEGTYAREVA on behalf of RESPONDENT L J Milusnic. (Attorney Victoria A Degtyareva added to party L J Milusnic(pty:res))(Degtyareva, Victoria) |
|
Wednesday, March 15, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
respm
Memorandum in Support of Motion
Wed 03/15 4:44 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support MR. YORDANOVS MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF HIS PETITION HABEAS CORPUS/APPEAL FROM ORDER CERTIFYING EXTRADITION filed by Petitioner Lyubomir Mihailov Yordanov. (Chowdhury, Ashfaq) |
|
3 | 3
motion
Stay Order (other)
Wed 03/15 11:40 AM
EX PARTE APPLICATION to Stay pending SEEKING STAY OF EXTRADITION PENDING RESOLUTION OF HABEAS PETITION filed by defendant Lyubomir Mihailov Yordanov. (Chowdhury, Ashfaq) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, March 14, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Tue 03/14 3:51 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Petitioner Lyubomir Mihailov Yordanov. (Chowdhury, Ashfaq) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Tue 03/14 3:28 PM
PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus by a Person in Federal Custody (28 USC 2241), Fee Exempt pursuant to statue, filed by Petitioner Lyubomir Mihailov Yordanov. (Attorney Ashfaq G Chowdhury added to party Lyubomir Mihailov Yordanov(pty:pet))(Chowdhury, Ashfaq) |