Tara Perry v. Kelly Services, Inc. et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Christina A Snyder |
Referred: | Steve Kim |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-02039 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 28:1441 Notice of Removal - Employment Discrimination |
Case Filed: | Mar 14, 2017 |
Terminated: | Apr 13, 2017 |
Last checked: Sunday Sep 10, 2017 1:57 AM PDT |
Defendant
Kelly Services, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Does
|
|
Plaintiff
Tara Perry
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Health Net, Inc
Terminated: 03/14/2017
|
Docket last updated: 04/18/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Friday, April 14, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Letter of Transmittal - Remand to Superior Court (CV-103) - optional html form
Fri 04/14 2:25 PM
TRANSMITTAL of documents to Clerk, Los Angeles Superior Court, Stanley Mosk Courthouse. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Clerk, Los Angeles Superior Court, Stanley Mosk Courthouse. (gk) |
|
Thursday, April 13, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
order
Order Remand Case to State Court
Fri 04/14 2:22 PM
ORDER RE STIPULATION TO REMAND REMOVAL ACTION by Judge Christina A. Snyder: Upon Stipulation15 , the Court orders that Central District of California case number 2:17-cv-02039-CAS-SK styled Tara Perry v. Kelly Services, Inc, et al. is hereby remanded to Los Angeles County Superior Court, Case Number BC633062. ( Case Terminated. Made JS-6 ) (gk) |
|
15 | 15
stip
Remand Case to State Court
Thu 04/13 9:44 AM
STIPULATION to Remand Case to State Court filed by Plaintiff Tara Perry Tara Perry.(Ellison, Christopher) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Friday, March 31, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
Mon 04/03 10:34 AM
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) - DOE DISMISSAL by Judge Christina A. Snyder: Pursuant to Local Rule 19-1, no complaint or petition shall be filed that includes more than ten (10) Doe or fictitiously named parties. Accordingly, the Court hereby DISMISSES Doe Defendants 11 through 30, inclusive. Court Reporter: Not Present. (gk) |
|
Thursday, March 30, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
order
Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only
Thu 03/30 7:34 PM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Christina A. Snyder. Scheduling Conference set for 6/26/2017 at 11:00 AM before Judge Christina A. Snyder. (cj) |
|
Wednesday, March 15, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Wed 03/15 12:40 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) |
|
11 | 11
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Wed 03/15 12:39 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (et) |
|
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Wed 03/15 11:57 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number BC633062 with filing fee previously paid ($400 paid on 03/14/2017, receipt number 26193IFQ), filed by defendant Kelly Services, Inc..(Crespo, Amanda) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Part 1 of 2, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A - Part 2 of 2 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice (Other)
Wed 03/15 11:52 AM
NOTICE of Errata to Defendant Kelly Services, Inc.'s Notice of Removal filed by defendant Kelly Services, Inc.. (Crespo, Amanda) |
|
Tuesday, March 14, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
service
Proof of Service (subsequent documents)
Tue 03/14 5:54 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE filed by defendant Kelly Services, Inc., re Declaration2 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties7 , Corporate Disclosure Statement6 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)4 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,,,1 , Declaration,3 , Request for Judicial Notice5 served on March 14, 2017. (Crespo, Amanda) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Tue 03/14 5:53 PM
Kelly Services, Inc.'s NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by defendant Kelly Services, Inc., identifying Kelly Services, Inc., Plaintiff Tara Perry. (Crespo, Amanda) |
|
6 | 6
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Tue 03/14 5:51 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Kelly Services, Inc. identifying Kelly Services, Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Crespo, Amanda) |
|
5 | 5
misc
For Judicial Notice
Tue 03/14 5:50 PM
REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE in Support of Kelly Services, Inc.'s Notice of Removal of Civil Action to Federal Court filed by Defendant Kelly Services, Inc.. (Crespo, Amanda) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Tue 03/14 5:49 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Kelly Services, Inc.. (Crespo, Amanda) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Declaration
Tue 03/14 5:48 PM
DECLARATION of Amanda Bolliger Crespo re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,,,1 filed by Defendant Kelly Services, Inc..(Crespo, Amanda) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A through I, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit J-Part 1 of 2, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit J-Part 2 of 2 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Declaration
Tue 03/14 5:42 PM
DECLARATION of Alma Del Toro re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,,,1 filed by Defendant Kelly Services, Inc.. (Crespo, Amanda) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Tue 03/14 5:40 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number BC633062 Receipt No: 0973-19515639 - Fee: $400, filed by defendant Kelly Services, Inc.. (Attorney Amanda Bolliger Crespo added to party Kelly Services, Inc.(pty:dft))(Crespo, Amanda) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Summons, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Notice of Case Management Conference, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Order to Show Cause Heareing, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit Peremptory Challenge to Judicial Officer, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit Notice of Case Management Conference, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit Order to Show Cause Hearing, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit Proof of Service of Summons, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit Proof of Service of Summons, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit Answer to Complaint by Health Net, Inc., | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit Answer to Complaint by Kelly Services, Inc., | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit Notice of Change of Firm Address, | ||
Att: 13 Exhibit Case Management Statement of Kelly Services, Inc., | ||
Att: 14 Exhibit Case Management Statement of Health Net, Inc., | ||
Att: 15 Exhibit Case Management Statement of Plaintiff, | ||
Att: 16 Exhibit Request for Dismissal, | ||
Att: 17 Exhibit Case Management Statement of Defendant Kelly Services, Inc., | ||
Att: 18 Exhibit Case Management Statement of Plaintiff, | ||
Att: 19 Exhibit Dismissal of Health Net, Inc., | ||
Att: 20 Exhibit Notice of Continuance of Case Management Conference | ||
cmp
Complaint - (Discovery)
Wed 03/15 12:27 PM
CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Health Net, Inc, Kelly Services, Inc., Does 1-30, inclusive. Jury Demanded., filed by Plaintiff Tara Perry. [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 9/14/2016 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO EXHIBIT A TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL AS ATTACHMENT # 1] (et) |
||
service
Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
Wed 03/15 12:32 PM
CONFORMED FILED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT Executed by Plaintiff Tara Perry, upon Defendant Kelly Services, Inc. served on 11/9/2016, answer due 11/30/2016. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CT Corporation, Registered Agent, by Serving Vivian Imperial, Process Specialist in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. [SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL AS ATTACHMENT #8] (et) |
||
service
Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
Wed 03/15 12:34 PM
CONFORMED FILED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT Executed by Plaintiff Tara Perry, upon Defendant Health Net, Inc served on 11/9/2016, answer due 11/30/2016. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CT Corporation, Registered Agent, by Serving Vivian Imperial, Process Specialist in in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 11/17/2016 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL AS ATTACHMENT #9] (et) |
||
answer
Answer to Complaint (Discovery)
Wed 03/15 12:36 PM
CONFORMED FILED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Defendant Kelly Services, Inc. [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 12/9/2016 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL AS ATTACHMENT #11](et) |
||
notice
Voluntary Dismissal of Party(ies) (Pursuant to FRCP 41a(1))
Wed 03/15 12:37 PM
CONFORMED FILED COPY OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL filed by Plaintiff Tara Perry pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) as to Health Net, Inc, only. [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 3/3/2017 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL AS ATTACHMENT #19] (et) |