Emanon Thease Carr v. Nancy A. Berryhill
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Shashi H Kewalramani |
Referred: | Charles F Eick |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-02040 |
Nature of Suit | 864 Social Security - SSID Title XVI |
Cause | 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID) |
Case Filed: | Mar 14, 2017 |
Terminated: | Oct 25, 2017 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 7 hours ago |
Wednesday, October 25, 2017 | ||
25 | 25
order
Dismissing Case
Wed 10/25 3:11 PM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL by Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani Re Stipulation24 : The above captioned matter is dismissed with prejudice, each party to bear its own fees, costs, and expenses. IT IS SO ORDERED. Case Terminated. Made JS-6. (ad) |
|
24 | 24
stip
Dismiss Case
Wed 10/25 2:57 PM
STIPULATION to Dismiss Case filed by Plaintiff Emanon Tnease Carr.(Safa, Cyrus) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Friday, October 06, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
1
pgs
order
Order
Fri 10/06 11:57 AM
ORDER EXTENDING BRIEFING SCHEDULE NOTE CHANGES MADE BY THE COURT by Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani, re Stipulation for Extension of Time to File22 (dc) |
|
Thursday, October 05, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
stip
Extension of Time to File Document
Thu 10/05 4:43 PM
STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Motion Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff Emanon Tnease Carr.(Safa, Cyrus) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, August 31, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
2
pgs
order
Order
Thu 08/31 9:14 AM
ORDER EXTENDING BRIEFING SCHEDULE by Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani.IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, that Plaintiff shall have an extension of time, toand include September 25, 2017, in which to file Plaintiff's Motion For SummaryJudgment Or Remand; and that all other deadlines set forth in the March 17, 2017Case Management Order shall be extended accordingly. IT IS SO ORDERED. (dc) (Main Document 21 replaced on 8/31/2017) (dc) |
|
Wednesday, August 30, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
stip
Extension of Time to File Document
Wed 08/30 4:18 PM
STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Motion Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff Emanon Tnease Carr.(Safa, Cyrus) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, August 17, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
misc
Consent to Proceed before U S Magistrate Judge (non-AUSA)
Thu 08/17 10:47 AM
CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Plaintiff Emanon Tnease Carr. (Safa, Cyrus) |
|
Friday, August 11, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
cs_rasgn
Chief Magistrate Judge Transferring Case (non-consent)
Mon 08/14 11:32 AM
ORDER OF THE CHIEF MAGISTRATE JUDGE - OCMJ# 17-095 by Magistrate Judge Patrick J. Walsh. Pursuant to the recommended procedure adopted by the Court for the CREATION OF THE CALENDAR of Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani, this case is transferred from the calendar of Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick to the calendar of Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani for all further proceedings authorized by statute, local rules and general orders. All documents subsequently filed shall bear this new case designation 2:17-cv-02040 SHK absent further order of the Court. (esa) |
|
Wednesday, August 02, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
order
Order
Wed 08/02 1:59 PM
ORDER Extending Briefing Schedule by Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick, re Stipulation for Extension of Time to File16 . It is Hereby Ordered, that Plaintiff shall have an extension of time, to and include 8/28/17, in which to file Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment or Remand; and that all other deadlines set forth in the 3/17/17 "Order" shall be extended accordingly. (sp) |
|
16 | 16
stip
Extension of Time to File Document
Wed 08/02 10:41 AM
STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File filed by Plaintiff Emanon Tnease Carr.(Safa, Cyrus) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, June 29, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
respoth
Administrative Record
Thu 06/29 9:32 AM
CERTIFIED ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD filed by DEFENDANT Nancy A. Berryhill.(Turk, Jean) |
|
Att: 1 Certification Page, | ||
Att: 2 Court Transcript Index, | ||
Att: 3 Documents Related to Administrative Process Including Transcript of Oral Hearing, if applicable, | ||
Att: 4 Payment Documents and Decisions, | ||
Att: 5 Jurisdictional Documents and Notices, | ||
Att: 6 Non Disability Related Development, | ||
Att: 7 Disability Related Development, | ||
Att: 8 Medical Records Part 1, | ||
Att: 9 Medical Records Part 2, | ||
Att: 10 Medical Records Part 3, | ||
Att: 11 Medical Records Part 4, | ||
Att: 12 Medical Records Part 5 | ||
14 | 14
answer
Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Thu 06/29 9:21 AM
ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by DEFENDANT Nancy A. Berryhill.(Turk, Jean) |
|
Friday, April 21, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Notice from Clerk re Final Consent to Proceed before US Magistrate Judge
Fri 04/21 3:29 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL: ALL PARTIES having consented to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge, this case has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick for all further proceedings. Please use the case number CV17-2040 E on all documents subsequently filed to ensure the proper routing of all filings. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. TEXT ONLY ENTRY. (sn) |
|
Thursday, April 20, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Consent to Proceed before U S Magistrate Judge (AUSA filers only)
Thu 04/20 10:41 AM
CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by DEFENDANT Nancy A. Berryhill. (Attorney Jean M Turk added to party Nancy A. Berryhill(pty:dft))(Turk, Jean) |
|
Tuesday, April 04, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Consent to Proceed before U S Magistrate Judge (non-AUSA)
Tue 04/04 1:54 PM
CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), (Safa, Cyrus) |
|
10 | 10
service
Service of Summons and Social Security Complaint Returned Executed as to USA (120 days)
Tue 04/04 1:53 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Emanon Tnease Carr, upon Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill served on 3/31/2017, answer due 7/31/2017. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to O. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to A. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to civil process clerk. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. Original Summons NOT returned.(Safa, Cyrus) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 | ||
Friday, March 17, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
order
Order
Fri 03/17 1:38 PM
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. Plaintiff shall promptly serve the Summons and Complaint on defendant and shall file a proof of such service within 30 days of the date of this order. Failure to comply with this aspect of this Order may result in the issuance of an Order to Show Cause Re Dismissal for Failure to Prosecute. It is Ordered that defendant's time to plead to the complaint is extended such that defendant's pleading must be filed within 90 days of service of the complaint. Defendant shall file a transcript of the administrative proceedings at the same time that defendant pleads to the complaint. A paper copy of the transcript of the administrative proceedings must be submitted directly to chambers within 24 hours of the time defendant pleads to the complaint. Within 30 days of the filing of defendant's answer, the plaintiff shall file a motion for summary judgment or remand. Within 30 days of the filing of plaintiff's motion for summary judgment or remand, defendant shall file a motion for summary judgment or remand. If either party believes that the case cannot be resolved by motion, such party shall so advise the Court and the opposing party in writing. The Court will take the motions under submission without oral argument, unless the Court otherwise orders. (sp) |
|
Thursday, March 16, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
service
Summons Issued
Thu 03/16 3:48 PM
60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint1 as to Nancy A. Berryhill. (sp) |
|
7 | 7
order
Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60)
Thu 03/16 2:40 PM
ORDER Re Request to Proceed in Forma Pauperis by Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick: granting3 REQUEST to Proceed in Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60). It is Ordered that the Request to Proceed in Forma Pauperis is hereby Granted. (sp) |
|
Wednesday, March 15, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Reference to US Magistrate Judge (CV-25) - optional html form
Wed 03/15 10:24 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge David O. Carter and referred to Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. (et) |
|
Tuesday, March 14, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Tue 03/14 5:20 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Emanon Tnease Carr, (Safa, Cyrus) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Tue 03/14 5:19 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Emanon Tnease Carr. (Safa, Cyrus) |
|
3 | 3
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60)
Tue 03/14 5:18 PM
REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support filed by Plaintiff Emanon Tnease Carr. (Safa, Cyrus) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Summons Request
Tue 03/14 5:17 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Emanon Tnease Carr. (Safa, Cyrus) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Tue 03/14 5:16 PM
COMPLAINT with In Forma Pauperis request, filed by Plaintiff Emanon Tnease Carr. (Attorney Cyrus Safa added to party Emanon Tnease Carr(pty:pla))(Safa, Cyrus) |