Jeanine Marie Kennemur v. Nancy A. Berryhill
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Victor E Bianchini |
Referred: | Jay C Gandhi |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-02041 |
Nature of Suit | 864 Social Security - SSID Title XVI |
Cause | 42:205 Denial Social Security Benefits |
Case Filed: | Mar 14, 2017 |
Terminated: | Sep 24, 2018 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 6 hours ago |
Wednesday, December 19, 2018 | ||
25 | 25
order
Awarding EAJA Fees
Wed 12/19 3:12 PM
ORDER AWARDING EAJA FEES by Magistrate Judge Victor E Bianchini. Re: Stipulation for Award of EAJA Fees24 . IT IS ORDERED that fees and expenses in the amount of $3,282.85 as authorized by 28 U.S.C. § 2412, and no costs authorized by 28 U.S.C. § 1920, be awarded subject to the terms of the Stipulation. (hr) |
|
Monday, December 17, 2018 | ||
24 | 24
stip
Award of EAJA Fees
Mon 12/17 4:33 PM
STIPULATION FOR AWARD of EAJA Fees in the amount of $3282.85. filed by Plaintiff Jeanine Marie Kennemur.(Safa, Cyrus) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order | ||
Monday, September 24, 2018 | ||
23 | 23
judgmentCV
Judgment
Tue 09/25 3:22 PM
JUDGMENT by Magistrate Judge Victor E Bianchini, in favor of Jeanine Marie Kennemur against Nancy A. Berryhill Related to: Order,22 . (Plaintiff's request for an order remanding this case for further proceedings is GRANTED and the Commissioner's decision is REVERSED. (See document for details.) (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (sbou) |
|
22 | 22
18
pgs
order
Order
Tue 09/25 3:20 PM
DECISION AND ORDER by Magistrate Judge Victor E Bianchini. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that: Judgment be entered REVERSING the Commissioner's decision and REMANDING this matter for further proceedings consistent with this Decision and Order, and it is further ORDERED. (See document for further details.) (sbou) |
|
Friday, April 27, 2018 | ||
21 | 21
misc
Consent to Proceed before U S Magistrate Judge (non-AUSA)
Fri 04/27 8:50 AM
CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), (Safa, Cyrus) |
|
Wednesday, April 25, 2018 | ||
20 | 20
cs_rasgn
Chief Magistrate Judge Transferring Consent Case
Wed 04/25 8:14 PM
ORDER OF THE CHIEF MAGISTRATE JUDGE - OCMJ # 18-047 by Chief Magistrate Judge Patrick J. Walsh. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that pursuant to General Order 05-07, the following cases are transferred to the calendar of Magistrate Judge Victor E. Bianchini for all further proceedings. On all documents subsequently filed in the case, please substitute the Magistrate Judge initials (VEB) after the case number in place of the initials of the prior Magistrate Judge. Case now reads as CV 17-02041 VEB. (mca) |
|
Wednesday, December 13, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
stip
Joint Stipulation for Social Security Cases
Wed 12/13 9:13 AM
JOINT STIPULATION, on behalf of both parties, for Disposition of Claim from Relief From Decision of the Commissioner, filed by Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill.(Schapel, Amanda) |
|
Tuesday, October 31, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
2
pgs
order
Order
Tue 10/31 10:26 AM
OORDER TO EXTEND BRIEFING SCHEDULE by Magistrate Judge Jay C. Gandhi, re Stipulation for Extension of Time to File17 : IT IS ORDERED that Defendant shall have until November 22, 2017 to provide her portion of the Joint Stipulation to Plaintiff, and then Defendant will file the Joint Stipulation by December 13, 2017. (kh) |
|
Monday, October 30, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
stip
Extension of Time to File Document
Mon 10/30 1:26 PM
STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Defendant's Portions of the Joint Stipulation filed by Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill.(Schapel, Amanda) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Monday, August 14, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
respoth
Administrative Record
Mon 08/14 9:43 AM
CERTIFIED ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD OF JEANINE MARIE KENNEMUR (mj) filed by Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill.(Schapel, Amanda) |
|
Att: 1 Certification Page, | ||
Att: 2 Court Transcript Index, | ||
Att: 3 Documents Related to Administrative Process Including Transcript of Oral Hearing, if applicable, | ||
Att: 4 Payment Documents and Decisions, | ||
Att: 5 Jurisdictional Documents and Notices, | ||
Att: 6 Non Disability Related Development, | ||
Att: 7 Disability Related Development, | ||
Att: 8 Medical Records Part 1, | ||
Att: 9 Medical Records Part 2, | ||
Att: 10 Medical Records Part 3, | ||
Att: 11 Medical Records Part 4, | ||
Att: 12 Medical Records Part 5 | ||
15 | 15
answer
Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Mon 08/14 9:34 AM
ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 (mj) filed by Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill.(Schapel, Amanda) |
|
Monday, July 03, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 07/03 9:21 AM
NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING SERVICE OF CERTIFIED ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD filed by DEFENDANT Nancy A. Berryhill. (Schapel, Amanda) |
|
Friday, April 21, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Notice from Clerk re Final Consent to Proceed before US Magistrate Judge
Fri 04/21 3:30 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL: ALL PARTIES having consented to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge, this case has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Jay C. Gandhi for all further proceedings. Please use the case number CV17-2041 JCG on all documents subsequently filed to ensure the proper routing of all filings. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. TEXT ONLY ENTRY. (sn) |
|
Thursday, April 20, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Consent to Proceed before U S Magistrate Judge (AUSA filers only)
Thu 04/20 9:02 AM
CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by DEFENDANT Nancy A. Berryhill. (Attorney Amanda Schapel added to party Nancy A. Berryhill(pty:dft))(Schapel, Amanda) |
|
Friday, April 07, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Consent to Proceed before U S Magistrate Judge (non-AUSA)
Fri 04/07 8:11 AM
CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), (Safa, Cyrus) |
|
10 | 10
service
Service of Summons and Social Security Complaint Returned Executed as to USA (120 days)
Fri 04/07 8:10 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Jeanine Marie Kennemur, upon Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill served on 4/4/2017, answer due 8/2/2017. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to O. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to A. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to civil process clerk. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. Original Summons NOT returned.(Safa, Cyrus) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 | ||
Tuesday, March 28, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - form only -no proceeding held
Tue 03/28 4:13 PM
ORDER RE: PROCEDURES IN SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL (JOINT SUBMISSION FORMAT) by Magistrate Judge Jay C. Gandhi. **See Order for details** (kh) |
|
8 | 8
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Tue 03/28 4:10 PM
60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill. (kh) |
|
7 | 7
order
Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60)
Tue 03/28 4:05 PM
ORDER RE REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Magistrate Judge Jay C. Gandhi: IT IS ORDERED that the Request to Proceed In Forma Pauperis3 is hereby GRANTED. (kh) |
|
Wednesday, March 15, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Reference to US Magistrate Judge (CV-25) - optional html form
Wed 03/15 2:49 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge George H. Wu and referred to Magistrate Judge Jay C. Gandhi. (jtil) |
|
Tuesday, March 14, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Tue 03/14 5:34 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Jeanine Marie Kennemur, (Safa, Cyrus) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Tue 03/14 5:31 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Jeanine Marie Kennemur. (Safa, Cyrus) |
|
3 | 3
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60)
Tue 03/14 5:30 PM
REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support filed by Plaintiff Jeanine Marie Kennemur. (Safa, Cyrus) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Summons Request
Tue 03/14 5:29 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Jeanine Marie Kennemur. (Safa, Cyrus) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Tue 03/14 5:27 PM
COMPLAINT with In Forma Pauperis request, filed by Plaintiff Jeanine Marie Kennemur. (Attorney Cyrus Safa added to party Jeanine Marie Kennemur(pty:pla))(Safa, Cyrus) |