Letters Rogatory from the 1st Civil Section of the Judicial District of Lisbon, Portugal et al
California Central District Court | |
Referred: | Rozella A Oliver |
Case #: | 2:17-mc-00026 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | Civil Miscellaneous Case |
Case Filed: | Mar 14, 2017 |
Terminated: | Mar 17, 2017 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 03/27/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Friday, March 17, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
order
For Order
Fri 03/17 2:12 PM
ORDER APPOINTING THE ASSISTANT UNITED STATES ATTORNEY AS COMMISSIONER by Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. I Rozella A. Oliver, United States Magistrate Judge for the Central District of California, pursuant to authority contained in § 1782 of Title 28 of the United States Code, hereby appoint Erika Johnson-Brooks, Assistant United States Attorney, or her successor in office, as Commissioner, to take such steps as may be necessary to obtain evidence from Stacey Callovi, and to do all else that may be reasonably necessary for the accomplishment of this Order.3 (SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS) (gr) |
|
3 | 3
motion
Order
Fri 03/17 11:46 AM
APPLICATION for Order for to appoint AUSA as Commissioner filed by movant United States of America. (Johnson-Brooks, Erika) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, March 16, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Thu 03/16 11:08 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. (car) |
|
Tuesday, March 14, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Application/Motion/Request (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Tue 03/14 4:12 PM
APPLICATION for Order Appointing the AUSA as Commissioner No Fee Required - US Government, filed by movant United States of America. (Attorney Erika Johnson-Brooks added to party United States of America(pty:mov))(Johnson-Brooks, Erika) |
|
Att: 1 order |