Karen Wooten et al v. Monsanto Company, et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Dolly M Gee |
Referred: | Charles F Eick |
Case #: | 5:17-cv-00477 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Mar 14, 2017 |
Terminated: | Mar 27, 2017 |
Last checked: Sunday Sep 10, 2017 2:31 AM PDT |
Defendant
Monsanto Company
|
|
Defendant
Does
|
|
Plaintiff
Harley Wooten, III
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Karen Wooten
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Timothy Wooten
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 88 minutes ago |
Thursday, March 30, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Receipt of Case by Other District (Electronic Case Transfer)
Fri 03/31 7:23 AM
TEXT-ONLY ENTRY - RECEIVED Notice of Receipt of Electronic Case Transfer from California Northern District, 3:17-cv-01735 filed 3/29/2017. (lom) |
|
Monday, March 27, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
order
Transferring MDL Case per JPML Order
Tue 03/28 3:38 PM
Conditional Transfer Order - CT0-12 from the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, MDL 2741, transferring case to USDC, Northern District of California and assigned to Honorable Vince Chhabria. Case transferred electronically. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (gk) |
|
Tuesday, March 21, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
order
Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
Tue 03/21 11:41 AM
INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dolly M. Gee. (clee) |
|
10 | 10
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
Tue 03/21 11:40 AM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Dolly M. Gee: Please take notice that this action has been reassigned to the HONORABLE DOLLY M. GEE, United States District Judge, pursuant to the Order Re Transfer Pursuant to General Order 16-05 filed on March 17, 2017. Please substitute the initials DMG in place of the current initials, so that the case number will now readED CV 17-477-DMG (Ex). As documents are routed using the judge's initials, it is imperative that the correct initials DMG be used on all subsequent filings to prevent any delays in the processing of documents. Judge Gee's Courtroom Deputy Clerk is Kane Tien. He can be reached at (213) 894-5452. Judge Gee's courtroom is located on the 8th floor of the First Street Courthouse, Courtroom #8C. Additional information about Judge Gee's procedures and schedules is available on the court's website at www.cacd.uscourt.gov. (clee) |
|
Friday, March 17, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
order
Transferring Case purs GO 16-05 (Related Case)(CV 34)
Mon 03/20 3:54 PM
ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 16-05-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 2:15-cv-07426-DMG-Ex. Case transferred from Judge Jesus G. Bernal and Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym to Judge Dolly M. Gee and Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 5:17-cv-00477-DMG-Ex. Signed by Judge Dolly M. Gee (aco) |
|
Wednesday, March 15, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
attorney
Pro Hac Vice Application Due (G-109) - optional html form
Wed 03/15 10:43 AM
NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Yvonne M. Flaherty. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (esa) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Deficiency in Attorney Case Opening
Wed 03/15 10:42 AM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening. The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s): Civil Cover Sheet, Notice of Interested Parties, Notice of Related Cases, and Summons Request are attached to the Complaint. Each of these documents should have been filed and entered separately under its proper event. (esa) |
|
6 | 6
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Wed 03/15 10:37 AM
21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint,1 as to defendant Monsanto Company. (esa) |
|
5 | 5
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Wed 03/15 10:24 AM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Wed 03/15 10:24 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym. (esa) |
|
Tuesday, March 14, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Related Case(s)
Wed 03/15 9:32 AM
NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by plaintiffs Harley Wooten, III, Karen Wooten, Timothy Wooten. Related Case(s): 2:16-cv-7386 DMG (Ex); 8:16-cv-01410 DMG (Ex) ***DOCKETED BY CLERK*** (esa) |
|
2 | 2
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Tue 03/14 7:49 PM
COMPLAINT with filing fee previously paid ($400.00 paid on 03/14/2017, receipt number 261938M8), filed by Plaintiff Karen Wooten, Timothy Wooten, Harley Wooten, III.(Andrus, Lori) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Tue 03/14 5:02 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-19515457 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Karen Wooten, Timothy Wooten, Harley Wooten, III. (Attorney Lori Erin Andrus added to party Harley Wooten, III(pty:pla), Attorney Lori Erin Andrus added to party Karen Wooten(pty:pla), Attorney Lori Erin Andrus added to party Timothy Wooten(pty:pla))(Andrus, Lori) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Notice of Interested Parties, | ||
Att: 4 Notice of Related Cases |