Carmen Layne Gehris et al v. Yard House USA, Inc. et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Andrew J Guilford |
Referred: | Karen E Scott |
Case #: | 8:17-cv-00446 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1441 Notice of Removal - Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Mar 14, 2017 |
Terminated: | Mar 24, 2017 |
Last checked: Sunday Sep 10, 2017 1:19 AM PDT |
Defendant
Does
|
|
Defendant
Yard House USA, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Carmen Layne Gehris
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Gehris
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/17/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Friday, March 24, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41a (1))
Fri 03/24 10:39 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiffs Carmen Layne Gehris, John Gehris. Dismissal is WITHOUT. (Jerisat, Martin) |
|
Wednesday, March 15, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
order
Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only
Wed 03/15 2:18 PM
ORDER RE EARLY MEETING OF PARTIES AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 5/8/2017 at 9:00 am before Judge Andrew J. Guilford. (lb) |
|
Tuesday, March 14, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Tue 03/14 5:16 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Tue 03/14 5:15 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andrew J. Guilford and Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (car) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Tue 03/14 8:44 AM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by defendant Yard House USA, Inc., identifying Carmen Layne Gehris; John Gehris and Yard House USA, Inc.. (Lenkov, Jeffrey) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Tue 03/14 8:43 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Yard House USA, Inc.. (Lenkov, Jeffrey) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Tue 03/14 8:42 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orange County Superior Court, case number 30-2017 00902704 Receipt No: 0973-19509439 - Fee: $400, filed by defendant Yard House USA, Inc.. (Attorney Jeffrey M Lenkov added to party Yard House USA, Inc.(pty:dft))(Lenkov, Jeffrey) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C | ||
cmp
Complaint - (Discovery)
Tue 03/14 5:11 PM
CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1 to 50, Inclusive, Yard House USA, Inc., filed by Plaintiffs Carmen Layne Gehris, John Gehris. Filed in State Court on 2/10/17 Submitted with Exhibit A to Notice of Removal (car) |
||
answer
Answer to Complaint (Discovery)
Wed 03/15 8:31 AM
CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant Yard House USA, Inc. Filed in State Court on 3/10/17 Submitted with Attachment 2 Exhibit B to Notice of Removal. (car) |