Mario Vasquez v. La Parilla Guacamole Grill, Inc. et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Cormac J Carney |
Referred: | Douglas F Mccormick |
Case #: | 8:17-cv-00453 |
Nature of Suit | 446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other |
Cause | 42:12101 Americans With Disabilities Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 14, 2017 |
Terminated: | Apr 17, 2017 |
Last checked: Sunday Sep 10, 2017 1:14 AM PDT |
Defendant
Rosa K. Interian
|
|
Defendant
La Parilla Guacamole Grill, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
RTM Investments LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Mario Vasquez
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Monday, April 17, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41a (1))
Mon 04/17 10:57 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by plaintiff Mario Vasquez. (Politiski, Richard) |
|
Friday, March 17, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
othcmp
Amended Complaint/Petition
Fri 03/17 12:01 PM
First Amended (Corrected) AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendants All Defendants amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 , filed by plaintiff Mario Vasquez(Politiski, Richard) |
|
10 | 10
order
Response By Court to Notice of Deficiencies (G-112B)
Fri 03/17 9:11 AM
RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 by Judge Cormac J. Carney. The document is stricken and counsel is ordered to file an amended or corrected document by 03/20/2017. (dro) |
|
Thursday, March 16, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Deficiency in Attorney Case Opening
Thu 03/16 10:21 AM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 . The following error(s) was found: The caption on the document uploaded to the docket entry number referenced above does not match the case information on the docket (e.g., case title, case number, document name, etc.). The Court may 1)order an amended or corrected document to be filed, 2)order the document stricken, or 3)take other action the Court deems appropriate. You may file a Notice of Errata attaching a corrected version of the document, but you are not required to take any action to correct this deficiency unless the Court so directs. (ghap) |
|
8 | 8
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Thu 03/16 10:14 AM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Thu 03/16 10:14 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Cormac J. Carney and Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (ghap) |
|
Tuesday, March 14, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Tue 03/14 4:46 PM
Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff Mario Vasquez, (Politiski, Richard) |
|
5 | 5
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Tue 03/14 4:40 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Mario Vasquez. (Politiski, Richard) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Summons Request
Tue 03/14 4:37 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by plaintiff Mario Vasquez. (Politiski, Richard) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Summons Request
Tue 03/14 4:30 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by plaintiff Mario Vasquez. (Politiski, Richard) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Summons Request
Tue 03/14 4:22 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by plaintiff Mario Vasquez. (Politiski, Richard) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Tue 03/14 4:07 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-19514684 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Mario Vasquez. (Attorney Richard James Politiski added to party Mario Vasquez(pty:pla))(Politiski, Richard) |