Trujillo v. Los Camperos, Inc. et al
California Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Lawrence J O'Neill |
Referred: | Barbara A Mcauliffe |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-00367 |
Nature of Suit | 446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other |
Cause | 42:12101 Americans with Disabilities Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 14, 2017 |
Terminated: | Aug 03, 2017 |
Last checked: Sunday Sep 10, 2017 2:13 AM PDT |
Defendant
Los Camperos, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Munoz Brothers, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jose Trujillo
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 25 minutes ago |
Thursday, August 03, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
order
Minute Order ~Util - 1 Terminate Deadlines and Hearings ~Util - Terminate Civil Case
Thu 08/03 1:03 PM
MINUTE ORDER: (TEXT ENTRY ONLY) On August 1, 2017, the parties filed a stipulation dismissing this entire action with prejudice under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii). (Doc.14 ). In light of stipulated dismissal, this action is terminated by operation of law without further order from the Court. Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii). This Court VACATES all pending dates and matters. The Clerk of the Court is directed to CLOSE THIS CASE. Minute order signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 8/3/2017. (Valdez, E) |
|
Tuesday, August 01, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Tue 08/01 2:06 PM
STIPULATION of DISMISSAL of Entire Action by Jose Trujillo. (Best, Zachary) |
|
Monday, July 24, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
order
Minute Order ~Util - 1 Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings
Mon 07/24 2:25 PM
MINUTE ORDER: (TEXT ENTRY ONLY) Due to the courts schedule, the Mandatory Scheduling Conference currently set for 8/9/2017 is ADVANCED to 8/8/2017, at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. The parties are to file their Joint Scheduling Report no later than seven days prior to the conference. The parties wishing to appear telephonically may do so with each party using the following dial-in number and passcode: dial-in number 1-877-411-9748; passcode 3190866. Minute order signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 7/24/2017. (Thorp, J) |
|
Wednesday, June 07, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
order
Stipulation and Order ~Util - 1 Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings
Wed 06/07 10:39 AM
STIPULATION for Continuance of Mandatory Scheduling Conference; ORDER that the Mandatory Scheduling Conference currently set for June 14, 2017 is continued to August 9, 2017 at 9:00 a.m. in Courtroom 8, before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. The parties are to file their Joint Scheduling Report no later than seven days prior to the conference. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 6/7/2017. (Herman, H) |
|
Tuesday, June 06, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Stipulation and Proposed Order
Tue 06/06 10:09 AM
STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for continuance of mandatory scheduling conference re4 Civil New Case Documents for LJO by Jose Trujillo. (Best, Zachary) |
|
Monday, May 22, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Mon 05/22 3:16 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendants Los Camperos, Inc., Munoz Brothers, LLC. (Macias, Jr., Jose) |
|
9 | 9
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 05/22 3:15 PM
ANSWER by Los Camperos, Inc., Munoz Brothers, LLC.(Macias, Jr., Jose) |
|
Monday, April 24, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 04/24 11:03 AM
NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Jose Macias, Jr. on behalf of Los Camperos, Inc., Munoz Brothers, LLC. Attorney Macias, Jr., Jose added. (Macias, Jr., Jose) |
|
7 | 7
misc
Stipulation
Mon 04/24 10:55 AM
STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE RESPONSIVE PLEADING by Los Camperos, Inc., Munoz Brothers, LLC. Attorney Bellafronto, Eric C. added. (Bellafronto, Eric) |
|
Wednesday, April 19, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
service
Summons Returned Executed
Wed 04/19 4:30 PM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Munoz Brothers, LLC served on 4/13/2017, answer due 5/4/2017. (Best, Zachary) |
|
5 | 5
service
Summons Returned Executed
Wed 04/19 4:29 PM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Los Camperos, Inc. served on 4/13/2017, answer due 5/4/2017. (Best, Zachary) |
|
Tuesday, March 14, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Civil New Case Documents for LJO
Tue 03/14 10:53 AM
CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED: Initial Scheduling Conference set for 6/14/2017 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. (Jessen, A) |
|
Att: 1 Standing Order, | ||
Att: 2 Consent Form, | ||
Att: 3 VDRP | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons
Tue 03/14 10:51 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Munoz Brothers, LLC* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Zachary Best* *Mission Law Firm, A.P.C.* *332 North Second Street* *San Jose, CA 95112*. (Jessen, A) |
|
2 | 2
service
Summons
Tue 03/14 10:50 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Los Camperos, Inc.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Zachary Best* *Mission Law Firm, A.P.C.* *332 North Second Street* *San Jose, CA 95112*. (Jessen, A) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 03/14 9:54 AM
COMPLAINT ASSERTING DENIAL OF RIGHT OF ACCESS UNDER THE AMERICANS WITH DISABILITIES ACT against All Defendants by Jose Trujillo. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-6960199)(Best, Zachary) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |