(SS) Contreras v. Commissioner of Social Security
California Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Barbara A Mcauliffe |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-00368 |
Nature of Suit | 864 Social Security - SSID Title XVI |
Cause | 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID) |
Case Filed: | Mar 14, 2017 |
Terminated: | Sep 19, 2018 |
Defendant
Commissioner of Social Security
|
|
Plaintiff
Isaac Michael Contreras
|
Docket last updated: 4 hours ago |
Wednesday, September 19, 2018 | ||
18 | 18
order
Judgment
Wed 09/19 3:19 PM
JUDGMENT dated *9/19/2018* in favor of Commissioner of Social Security, and against Plaintiff Isaac Contreras pursuant to order signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 9/19/2018. (Hellings, J) |
|
17 | 17
7
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Wed 09/19 3:13 PM
ORDER Regarding Plaintiff's Social Security Complaint, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 9/19/2018: This Court DENIES Plaintiff's appeal from the administrative decision of the Commissioner of Social Security. The Clerk of this Court is DIRECTED to enter judgment in favor of the Commissioner of Social Security, and against Plaintiff Isaac Contreras . (CASE CLOSED)(Hellings, J) |
|
Tuesday, December 19, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Opposition
Tue 12/19 2:44 PM
OPPOSITION by Defendant Commissioner of Social Security to15 Brief. (Coder, Ellinor) |
|
Monday, November 27, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
misc
Brief
Mon 11/27 1:50 PM
BRIEF Opening Brief by Isaac Michael Contreras. (Perales, Monica) |
|
Monday, October 30, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
1
pgs
order
Order ~Util - 1 Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings
Mon 10/30 7:46 AM
ORDER Extending Briefing Schedule (Stipulation Doc. 13): that Plaintiff shall have an extension of time, to and including November 27, 2017, in which to file Plaintiff's Opening Brief; and that all other deadlines set forth in the March 16, 2017 Case Management Order shall be extended accordingly. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 10/30/2017. (Herman, H) |
|
Thursday, October 26, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Stipulation and Proposed Order
Thu 10/26 10:06 AM
STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for extension of time by Isaac Michael Contreras.(Perales, Monica) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, September 27, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
service
Certificate of Service
Wed 09/27 12:33 PM
CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Commissioner of Social Security. (Coder, Ellinor) |
|
Friday, September 01, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
service
Certificate of Service
Fri 09/01 3:39 PM
CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Isaac Michael Contreras. (Perales, Monica) |
|
Monday, August 07, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Designation of Counsel
Mon 08/07 2:00 PM
DESIGNATION of COUNSEL FOR SERVICE. Added attorney Ellinor Ravenel Coder for Commissioner of Social Security, attorney C. Hay-Mie Cho terminated (Coder, Ellinor) |
|
Tuesday, August 01, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Lodging Social Security Administrative Transcript
Tue 08/01 8:52 AM
NOTICE OF LODGING SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATIVE TRANSCRIPT by Commissioner of Social Security. Attorney Berg, Alyson A. added. In Paper Format and E-Filing Electronic Administrative Transcript(Berg, Alyson) |
|
Att: 1 Certification Page, | ||
Att: 2 Court Transcript Index, | ||
Att: 3 Administrative Process Including Transcript of Oral Hearing, if applicable, | ||
Att: 4 Payment Documents, | ||
Att: 5 Jurisdictional Documents, | ||
Att: 6 Non Disability Related Development, | ||
Att: 7 Disability Related Development, | ||
Att: 8 Medical Records Part 1, | ||
Att: 9 Medical Records Part 2, | ||
Att: 10 Medical Records Part 3, | ||
Att: 11 Medical Records Part 4 | ||
misc
Acknowledgement of Receipt
Tue 08/01 10:35 AM
ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT of Social Security Administrative Transcript re9 Notice of Lodging. (Jessen, A) |
||
Thursday, April 06, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Consent to Jurisdiction of US Magistrate Judge
Thu 04/06 7:04 AM
CONSENT to JURISDICTION of US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Commissioner of Social Security. Attorney Cho, C. Hay-Mie added. (Cho, C. Hay-Mie) |
|
Monday, April 03, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Consent to Jurisdiction of US Magistrate Judge
Mon 04/03 4:27 PM
CONSENT to JURISDICTION of US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Isaac Michael Contreras. (Perales, Monica) |
|
6 | 6
service
Summons Returned Executed as to USA
Mon 04/03 4:26 PM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Isaac Michael Contreras. Commissioner of Social Security served on 3/31/2017, answer due 5/30/2017.(Perales, Monica) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 | ||
Thursday, March 16, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
order
Social Security New Case Documents for MJ as Presider
Thu 03/16 9:32 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER and ORDER RE CONSENT in SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL; Consent or Decline due by 6/19/2017. (Marrujo, C) |
|
Att: 1 Order re Consent, | ||
Att: 2 Consent Form, | ||
Att: 3 USM Social Security Instructions | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons
Thu 03/16 9:31 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Commissioner of Social Security* with answer to complaint due within *60* days. Attorney *Monica Perales* *Law Offices of Lawrence D. Rohlfing* *12631 E. Imperial Highway, C-115* *Santa Fe Springs, CA 90670*. (Marrujo, C) |
|
3 | 3
order
Order on Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Thu 03/16 9:30 AM
ORDER GRANTING2 Motion to Proceed IFP signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 3/16/17. (Marrujo, C) |
|
Tuesday, March 14, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
motion
In Forma Pauperis
Tue 03/14 10:14 AM
MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Isaac Michael Contreras.(Perales, Monica) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Social Security Appeal)
Tue 03/14 10:02 AM
SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT For Review of The Final Decision Of The Social Security against Commissioner of Social Security by Isaac Michael Contreras.(Perales, Monica) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Certification of Interested Parties, | ||
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 4 Declaration to proceed in forma pauperis | ||
misc
IFP Application
Tue 03/14 11:04 AM
APPLICATION TO PROCEED IFP filed - Action Required. (Jessen, A) |