Alphonso Iniguez v. GIECO Indemnity Company
California Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Dale A Drozd |
Referred: | Erica P Grosjean |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-00371 |
Nature of Suit | 110 Contract - Insurance |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-(Citizenship) |
Case Filed: | Mar 14, 2017 |
Terminated: | Apr 19, 2017 |
Last checked: Sunday Sep 10, 2017 1:35 AM PDT |
Defendant
GIECO Indemnity Company
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Alphonso Iniguez
|
Represented By
|
GPO
Apr 19 2017
ORDER granting 5 Motion to Dismiss signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 4/18/2017. CASE CLOSED. (Lundstrom, T) |
Docket last updated: 12 hours ago |
Wednesday, April 19, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
order
Judgment
Wed 04/19 10:25 AM
JUDGMENT dated *4/19/2017* pursuant to order signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 4/18/2017. (Lundstrom, T) |
|
17 | 17
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss
Wed 04/19 10:24 AM
ORDER granting5 Motion to Dismiss signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 4/18/2017. CASE CLOSED. (Lundstrom, T) |
|
Tuesday, April 18, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
minutes
Motion Hearing ~Util - 1 Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings
Tue 04/18 11:23 AM
MINUTES (Text Only) for proceedings before District Judge Dale A. Drozd: MOTION HEARING held on 4/18/2017.5 MOTION to DISMISS submitted; a written order granting the motion to dismiss without prejudice will issue. Scheduling conference set for 6/1/2017, is VACATED. Plaintiffs Counsel Brian Follan telephonically present. Defendants Counsel Glenn Kenna telephonically present. Court Reporter/CD Number: Karen Hooven. (Thorp, J) |
|
Thursday, April 13, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
order
Minute Order
Thu 04/13 1:03 PM
MINUTE ORDER: (TIME CHANGE ONLY) signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 4/13/2017; The5 motion to dismiss on calendar 4/18/2017, WILL BE HEARD at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 5 (DAD) before District Judge Dale A. Drozd. The parties are encouraged to appear telephonically and may do so by dialing 877-402-9757 (access code 6966236), at the time of the hearing. Because the court may be hearing other matters using the same conference line, please wait to state your appearance until your case has been called and appearances are requested. Keep all background noise to a minimum. At least 24 hours prior to the hearing you must email Courtroom Deputy Renee Gaumnitz, at RGaumnitz@caed.uscourts.gov, to advise the court you will be appearing telephonically.(Thorp, J) |
|
Wednesday, April 12, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Response
Wed 04/12 7:59 AM
RESPONSE by GIECO Indemnity Company to13 Opposition to Motion. (Kenna, Glenn) |
|
Friday, April 07, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
respm
Opposition to Motion
Fri 04/07 2:29 PM
OPPOSITION by Alphonso Iniguez to5 MOTION to DISMISS. Attorney Folland, Brian added. (Folland, Brian) |
|
Wednesday, April 05, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
service
Certificate of Service
Wed 04/05 3:25 PM
CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by GIECO Indemnity Company re9 Statement of Non-Opposition. (Kenna, Glenn) |
|
11 | 11
service
Certificate of Service
Wed 04/05 3:22 PM
CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by GIECO Indemnity Company re10 Stipulation. (Kenna, Glenn) |
|
10 | 10
misc
Stipulation
Wed 04/05 2:39 PM
STIPULATION (Joint) re Proper Service and Consent to Jurisdiction by GIECO Indemnity Company. (Kenna, Glenn) |
|
9 | 9
respm
Statement of Non-Opposition
Wed 04/05 2:36 PM
STATEMENT of NON-OPPOSITION by GIECO Indemnity Company to5 MOTION to DISMISS. (Kenna, Glenn) |
|
Wednesday, March 29, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice (Other)
Wed 03/29 10:20 AM
NOTICE of Firm Name Change by GIECO Indemnity Company. (Kenna, Glenn) |
|
Thursday, March 23, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
respm
Exhibit
Thu 03/23 8:13 AM
EXHIBIT A to Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion re5 MOTION to DISMISS filed by GIECO Indemnity Company. (Kenna, Glenn) |
|
Wednesday, March 22, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
service
Certificate of Service
Wed 03/22 8:31 AM
CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by GIECO Indemnity Company re5 MOTION to DISMISS. (Kenna, Glenn) |
|
Tuesday, March 21, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Dismiss
Tue 03/21 2:36 PM
MOTION to DISMISS by GIECO Indemnity Company. Motion Hearing set for 4/18/2017 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 5 (DAD) before District Judge Dale A. Drozd.(Kenna, Glenn) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum | ||
Tuesday, March 14, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
utility
Civil Cover Sheet
Tue 03/14 3:39 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET by GIECO Indemnity Company (Kenna, Glenn) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Civil New Case Documents for DAD
Tue 03/14 1:01 PM
CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 6/1/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (EPG) before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean. (Martin-Gill, S) |
|
Att: 1 EPG Sch Conf, | ||
Att: 2 Consent Form, | ||
Att: 3 VDRP | ||
2 | 2
misc
Clerk's Notice of Docket Correction
Tue 03/14 12:42 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE: Attn: Glenn M. Kenna ***Civil Cover Sheet***Under Local Rule 3-200, every complaint, amended complaint, or other document initiating a civil action shall be accompanied by acompleted civil cover sheet, on a form available from the Clerk and on the Court's website. Please file your civil cover sheet. If youneed assistance, please contact the CM/ECF help desk at 866-884-5444, or refer to the CM/ECF User's Manual on the court's website.(Martin-Gill, S) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Tue 03/14 9:45 AM
NOTICE of REMOVAL from Fresno Superior Court, case number 17CECG00430 by GIECO Indemnity Company. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-6960080) (Kenna, Glenn) |