Trujillo v. Keener et al
California Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Dale A Drozd |
Referred: | Erica P Grosjean |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-00373 |
Nature of Suit | 446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other |
Cause | 42:12101 Americans with Disabilities Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 14, 2017 |
Terminated: | Aug 21, 2017 |
Last checked: Sunday Sep 10, 2017 1:42 AM PDT |
Defendant
Antonio Alvarez
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Elizabeth Ann Keener
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
James H. Keener
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Jaclyn Phetsada
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jose Trujillo
|
Represented By
|
GPO
Aug 21 2017
ORDER Directing the Clerk of the Court to Close Case 12, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 8/18/17. (CASE CLOSED)(Hellings, J) |
Docket last updated: 1 hours ago |
Monday, August 21, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
order
Order Dismissing Case
Mon 08/21 1:00 PM
ORDER Directing the Clerk of the Court to Close Case12 , signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 8/18/17. (CASE CLOSED)(Hellings, J) |
|
Thursday, August 17, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Thu 08/17 1:08 PM
STIPULATION of DISMISSAL of Entire Action by Jose Trujillo. (Best, Zachary) |
|
Friday, June 23, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
order
Scheduling Order ~Util - 1 Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings
Fri 06/23 2:21 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Mid-Discovery Status Conference set for 12/6/2017 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (EPG) before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean; Non-Expert Discovery due by 3/2/2018; Designation of Expert Witnesses due by 4/6/2018; Rebuttal Designation of Expert Witnesses due by 5/7/2018; Expert Discovery due by 6/6/2018; Dispositive Motions filed by 8/1/2018; Pretrial Conference set for 12/10/2018 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (DAD) before District Judge Dale A. Drozd; Jury Trial set for 2/12/2019 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 5 (DAD) before District Judge Dale A. Drozd (6-day estimate). Order signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 6/23/2017. (Rooney, M) |
|
Thursday, June 22, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
minutes
Scheduling Conference
Thu 06/22 12:43 PM
MINUTES (Text Only) for proceedings before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean: SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held on 6/22/2017 with an order to follow. Plaintiff's Counsel Zachary Best telephonically present. Defendants' Counsel Gerald Slater and Matthew Owdom present. (Rooney, M) |
|
Wednesday, June 14, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Scheduling Report
Wed 06/14 4:18 PM
JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT by Jose Trujillo. (Best, Zachary) |
|
Wednesday, June 07, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
answer
Answer to Complaint
Wed 06/07 11:56 PM
ANSWER by Jaclyn Phetsada. Attorney Owdom, Matthew Davis added.(Owdom, Matthew) |
|
Monday, June 05, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 06/05 9:03 AM
ANSWER by Antonio Alvarez, Elizabeth Ann Keener, James H. Keener. Attorney Slater, Gerald Andrew added.(Slater, Gerald) |
|
Tuesday, April 04, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Tue 04/04 11:12 AM
WAIVER of SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED: Antonio Alvarez Waiver sent on 4/4/2017, answer due 6/5/2017; Elizabeth Ann Keener Waiver sent on 4/4/2017, answer due 6/5/2017; James H. Keener Waiver sent on 4/4/2017, answer due 6/5/2017; Jaclyn Phetsada Waiver sent on 4/4/2017, answer due 6/5/2017. (Best, Zachary) |
|
5 | 5
misc
Clerk's Notice of Docket Correction
Tue 04/04 11:07 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE: Disregard4 Summons Returned Executed - Wrong event used. (Martin-Gill, S) |
|
4 | 4
service
Summons Returned Executed
Tue 04/04 10:52 AM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: All Defendants. (Best, Zachary) |
|
Tuesday, March 14, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Civil New Case Documents for DAD
Tue 03/14 2:28 PM
CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 6/22/2017 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (EPG) before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean. (Flores, E) |
|
Att: 1 Standing Order, | ||
Att: 2 Consent Form, | ||
Att: 3 VDRP | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons
Tue 03/14 2:26 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Antonio Alvarez, Elizabeth Ann Keener, James H. Keener, Jaclyn Phetsada* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Zachary Best* *Mission Law Firm, P.C.* *332 North Second Street* *San Jose, CA 95112*. (Flores, E) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 03/14 10:34 AM
COMPLAINT ASSERTING DENIAL OF RIGHT OF ACCESS UNDER THE AMERICANS WITH DISABILITIES ACT (ADA) against All Defendants by Jose Trujillo. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-6960476)(Best, Zachary) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet with Attachment |