(PS) Ortiz v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al
California Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Morrison C England, Jr |
Referred: | Deborah Barnes |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-00529 |
Nature of Suit | 480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit |
Cause | 15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 13, 2017 |
Terminated: | Aug 07, 2017 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 09, 2017 2:24 AM PDT |
Defendant
Craig Boundy
|
|
Defendant
Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Rene Ortiz
7566 Phoenix Park Drive
Sacramento, CA 95823 |
Docket last updated: 04/17/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Monday, August 07, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
order
Judgment
Mon 08/07 2:50 PM
JUDGMENT dated *8/7/2017* pursuant to order signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 8/7/2017. (Washington, S) |
|
5 | 5
order
Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations
Mon 08/07 2:50 PM
ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 8/7/2017 ADOPTING in FULL4 Findings and Recommendations. This action is DISMISSED without prejudice. CASE CLOSED (Washington, S) Modified on 8/7/2017 (Washington, S) |
|
service
Service by Mail
Mon 08/07 2:51 PM
SERVICE BY MAIL:6 Judgment,5 Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations, served on Rene Ortiz. (Washington, S) |
||
Friday, June 23, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
motion
Findings and Recommendations
Fri 06/23 11:52 AM
FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 6/22/17 RECOMMENDING that this action be DISMISSED without prejudice. Referred to Judge Morrison C. England, Jr.; Objections due within 14 days after being served with these findings and recommendations. (Becknal, R) |
|
service
Service by Mail
Fri 06/23 11:53 AM
SERVICE BY MAIL:4 Findings and Recommendations served on Rene Ortiz. (Becknal, R) |
||
Friday, May 05, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
order
Order
Fri 05/05 9:42 AM
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 5/4/2017 DISMISSING1 Complaint WITH LEAVE to amend. Within twenty-eight days from the date of this order, an amended complaint shall be filed that cures the defects noted in this order and complies with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the Local Rules of Practice. Failure to comply with this order in a timely manner may result in a recommendation that this action be dismissed. (Washington, S) |
|
service
Service by Mail
Fri 05/05 9:43 AM
SERVICE BY MAIL:3 Order, served on Rene Ortiz. (Washington, S) |
||
Tuesday, March 14, 2017 | ||
misc
IFP Application
Tue 03/14 1:27 PM
APPLICATION TO PROCEED IFP filed - Action Required. (Becknal, R) |
||
Monday, March 13, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
motion
In Forma Pauperis
Tue 03/14 1:25 PM
MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Rene Ortiz. (Becknal, R) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 03/14 1:24 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Rene Ortiz.(Becknal, R) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |