(HC) Roberson v. People of the State of California
California Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Morrison C England, Jr |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-00531 |
Nature of Suit | 530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General |
Cause | 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State) |
Case Filed: | Mar 13, 2017 |
Terminated: | Nov 07, 2018 |
Petitioner
Kenneth Wayne Roberson
|
|
Respondent
California State Prison - Solano
|
|
Respondent
People of the State of California
|
Docket last updated: 04/17/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Monday, November 26, 2018 | ||
misc
Mail Returned
Tue 11/27 11:33 AM
MAIL RETURNED as Undeliverable, Retun to Sender - Refused - Unable to Forward:29 Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations, Findings and Recommendations (Order), Order on Motion to Dismiss,30 Judgment sent to Kenneth Wayne Roberson. Notice of Change of Address due by 2/4/2019. (Washington, S) |
||
Wednesday, November 07, 2018 | ||
30 | 30
order
Judgment
Wed 11/07 10:42 AM
JUDGMENT dated *11/7/18* pursuant to order signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 11/6/18. (Coll, A) |
|
29 | 29
2
pgs
order
Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations Order on Motion to Dismiss
Wed 11/07 10:41 AM
ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 11/6/18 ADOPTING28 Findings and Recommendations in full and GRANTING14 Motion to Dismiss. The petition is DISMISSED as unexhausted. The court DECLINES to issue the certificate of appealability referenced in 28 U.S.C. § 2253. CASE CLOSED. (Coll, A) |
|
service
Service by Mail
Wed 11/07 10:43 AM
SERVICE BY MAIL:29 Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations and30 Judgment served on Kenneth Wayne Roberson. (Coll, A) |
||
Wednesday, September 26, 2018 | ||
28 | 28
motion
Findings and Recommendations
Wed 09/26 8:29 AM
FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 09/25/18 RECOMMENDING that respondent's motion to dismiss14 be granted and the petition be dismissed as unexhausted. This court decline to issue the certificate of appealability. Motion to Dismiss14 referred to Judge Morrison C. England Jr. Objections due within 14 days. (Plummer, M) |
|
service
Service by Mail
Wed 09/26 8:29 AM
SERVICE BY MAIL:28 Findings and Recommendations (Motion), served on Kenneth Wayne Roberson. (Plummer, M) |
||
Monday, July 16, 2018 | ||
27 | 27
notice
Notice of Change of Address
Tue 07/17 10:40 AM
NOTICE of CHANGE of ADDRESS to P.O. Box 4000, Vacaville, CA 95696 by Kenneth Wayne Roberson. (Kaminski, H) |
|
Thursday, July 05, 2018 | ||
26 | 26
notice
Notice of Change of Address
Fri 07/06 12:41 PM
NOTICE of CHANGE of ADDRESS to Deuel Vocational Institution, 23500 Kasson Road, Tracy, CA 95378 by Kenneth Wayne Roberson. (Becknal, R) |
|
Wednesday, May 23, 2018 | ||
25 | 25
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Thu 05/24 9:38 AM
MOTION requesting rule of completeness by Kenneth Wayne Roberson. (Kastilahn, A) |
|
Thursday, March 15, 2018 | ||
24 | 24
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension
Thu 03/15 8:42 AM
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 03/14/18 denying22 ,23 Motions for Extension of time. (Plummer, M) |
|
service
Service by Mail
Thu 03/15 8:42 AM
SERVICE BY MAIL:24 Order on Motion for Extension, served on Kenneth Wayne Roberson. (Plummer, M) |
||
Wednesday, March 07, 2018 | ||
23 | 23
motion
Extension of Time
Thu 03/08 5:07 PM
MOTION for EXTENSION OF TIME and NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS to 141 S. Lassen Street Willows, CA 95988 by Kenneth Wayne Roberson. (Mena-Sanchez, L) |
|
Thursday, February 22, 2018 | ||
22 | 22
motion
Extension of Time
Fri 02/23 4:40 PM
MOTION for 30-DAY EXTENSION OF TIME to bring the case up to date; and NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS to 141 S. Lassen Street Willows, CA 95988 by Kenneth Wayne Roberson. (Mena-Sanchez, L) |
|
Thursday, January 18, 2018 | ||
21 | 21
misc
Reply
Thu 01/18 11:12 AM
REPLY by California State Prison - Solano re19 Opposition to Motion.(Mitchell, Stephanie) |
|
Att: 1 Proof of Service | ||
Wednesday, January 10, 2018 | ||
20 | 20
notice
Notice (Other)
Thu 01/11 10:26 AM
NOTICE of WITHDRAWAL by Kenneth Wayne Roberson of18 Opposition ("Motion to Seek Relief from Procedural Default"). (Benson, A.) |
|
19 | 19
respm
Opposition to Motion
Thu 01/11 10:18 AM
OPPOSITION ("Motion to Seek Relief from Procedural Default") by Kenneth Wayne Roberson to14 Motion to Dismiss. (Benson, A.) |
|
Monday, January 08, 2018 | ||
18 | 18
respm
Opposition to Motion
Tue 01/09 3:18 PM
OPPOSITION ("Motion to Seek Relief from Procedural Default") by Kenneth Wayne Roberson to14 Motion to Dismiss. (Benson, A.) |
|
Wednesday, December 20, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
1
pgs
order
Order
Wed 12/20 10:00 AM
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 12/19/2017 ORDERING, within 21 days, plaintiff shall file and serve an opposition or statement of non-opposition to the pending14 motion to dismiss. Failure to comply with this order will result in a recommendation that this action be dismissed without prejudice for failure to prosecute pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(b).(Yin, K) |
|
service
Service by Mail
Wed 12/20 10:00 AM
SERVICE BY MAIL:17 Order served on Kenneth Wayne Roberson. (Yin, K) |
||
Thursday, November 02, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Consent to Jurisdiction of US Magistrate Judge
Fri 11/03 8:57 AM
CONSENT to JURISDICTION of US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Kenneth Wayne Roberson. (York, M) |
|
misc
Acknowledgement of Receipt
Thu 11/02 3:06 PM
ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT of15 lodged documents from Stephanie Mitchell,. (Benson, A.) |
||
Wednesday, November 01, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
notice
Notice of Filing / Lodging Document in Paper
Wed 11/01 10:01 AM
NOTICE OF LODGING DOCUMENT IN PAPER by California State Prison - Solano: Documents in Support of Motion to Dismiss.(Mitchell, Stephanie) |
|
Att: 1 Proof of Service | ||
Monday, October 30, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
motion
Dismiss
Mon 10/30 2:08 PM
MOTION to DISMISS by California State Prison - Solano.(Mitchell, Stephanie) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of Service | ||
Thursday, October 26, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Notice (Other)
Thu 10/26 9:20 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE (TEXT ONLY): This case is assigned to U.S. District Judge Morrison C. England Jr. and U.S. Magistrate Judge Allison Claire; the new case number is 2:17-cv-0531 MCE AC (HC). (Plummer, M) |
|
service
Service by Mail
Thu 10/26 9:20 AM
SERVICE BY MAIL: 13 Notice - Other served on Kenneth Wayne Roberson. (Plummer, M) |
||
Wednesday, October 25, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Decline of Jurisdiction of US Magistrate Judge
Wed 10/25 8:18 AM
DECLINE to PROCEED BEFORE US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by California State Prison - Solano. Attorney Mitchell, Stephanie Ayn added.(Mitchell, Stephanie) |
|
Att: 1 Proof of Service | ||
Thursday, August 31, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Document(s) Served Electronically
Thu 08/31 11:02 AM
DOCUMENT SERVED ELECTRONICALLY:1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus served on Tami Krenzin, Supervising Deputy Attorney General. (Henshaw, R) |
|
10 | 10
order
09 - Order Re Consent or Request for Reassignment
Thu 08/31 11:01 AM
ORDER RE CONSENT OR REQUEST FOR REASSIGNMENT signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 8/31/2017. Consent or Decline due by 10/5/2017. (cc: Tami Krenzin, Supervising Deputy Attorney General) (Henshaw, R) |
|
9 | 9
order
06 - HC/Order Requiring Respondent to File a Response
Thu 08/31 11:00 AM
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 8/31/2017 ORDERING warden of CSP-Solano substituted as respondent and Clerk of Court to amend the docket accordingly; ORDERING ground one of the petition dismissed; and DIRECTING respondent to file a response to grounds two, three, and four of the petition within 60 days from the date of this order. Clerk to serve a copy of this order, a copy of the Petition and the Order re Consent on the Attorney General. (cc: Tami Krenzin, Supervising Deputy Attorney General) (Henshaw, R) |
|
service
Service by Mail
Thu 08/31 11:01 AM
SERVICE BY MAIL:9 Order Directing Respondent to File a Response to the Petition served on Kenneth Wayne Roberson. (Henshaw, R) |
||
Friday, July 14, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
order
Order ~Util - 1 Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings Order on Motion to Stay
Fri 07/14 10:05 AM
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 7/13/2017 DENYING without prejudice7 Motion to Stay. Within 30 days of this order, petitioner may file motion for stay and abeyance under Rhines. If petitioner does not file a motion for stay or if he does not address all three Rhines factors, the court will proceed to order service of the petition without a stay and any unexhausted claims will be subject to dismissal unless the respondent explicitly waives the exhaustion requirement.(Henshaw, R) |
|
service
Service by Mail
Fri 07/14 10:06 AM
SERVICE BY MAIL:8 Order served on Kenneth Wayne Roberson. (Henshaw, R) |
||
Wednesday, June 28, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Stay
Thu 06/29 10:37 AM
MOTION to STAY and ABEYANCE by Kenneth Wayne Roberson to preserve the filing date re6 Order. (Nguyen, K) |
|
Tuesday, June 13, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
order
Order Order on Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Tue 06/13 3:03 PM
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 6/13/2017 GRANTING petitioner's5 motion to proceed IFP. Within 30 days, petitioner shall either (1) advise the court that he has exhausted his state court remedies or that they were unavailable to him or (2) file a motion for stay and abeyance under Rhines while he returns to state court to exhaust his state court remedies. If petitioner does not respond to this order, the court will proceed to order service of the petition without a stay and any unexhausted claims will be subject to dismissal unless the respondent explicitly waives the exhaustion requirement. (Yin, K) |
|
service
Service by Mail
Tue 06/13 3:03 PM
SERVICE BY MAIL:6 Order served on Kenneth Wayne Roberson. (Yin, K) |
||
Thursday, April 13, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
motion
In Forma Pauperis
Fri 04/14 11:06 AM
MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Kenneth Wayne Roberson. (Mena-Sanchez, L) |
|
Monday, March 27, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
order
Order
Mon 03/27 9:13 AM
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 03/24/17 ordering petitioner shall submit within 30 days from service of this order, an application in support of his request to proceed in forma pauperis provided by the clerk of the court or the appropriate filing fee. The clerk of the court is directed to send petitioner a copy of the in forma pauperis form used by this district. (Plummer, M) |
|
service
Service by Mail
Mon 03/27 9:13 AM
SERVICE BY MAIL:4 Order, and prisoner IFP form served on Kenneth Wayne Roberson. (Plummer, M) |
||
Wednesday, March 22, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Consent to Jurisdiction of US Magistrate Judge
Thu 03/23 11:40 AM
CONSENT to JURISDICTION of US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Kenneth Wayne Roberson. (Zignago, K.) |
|
Tuesday, March 14, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
order
Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider
Tue 03/14 2:37 PM
PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 4/17/2017 (Washington, S) |
|
Att: 1 Order re Consent | ||
service
Service by Mail
Tue 03/14 2:37 PM
SERVICE BY MAIL:2 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Kenneth Wayne Roberson. (Washington, S) |
||
Monday, March 13, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
Tue 03/14 2:37 PM
PETITION for WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS against People of the State of California by Kenneth Wayne Roberson.(Washington, S) |