|
GPO
Jun 15 2017
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 6/15/2017 ORDERING Petitioner to submit, within 30 days from the date of this order, an affidavit to support his request to proceed IFP or the filing fee. Clerk of Court to serve copy of habeas petition and two motions filed upon District Attorney of El Dorado County, Vern Pierson who shall file a response, either a Motion to Dismiss or an Answer, within 30 days after the service of this Order, or by 7/17/2017. (Henshaw, R)
|
|
GPO
Aug 07 2017
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 8/7/2017 ORDERING petitioner shall either oppose respondent's motion to dismiss within 45 days, or he may seek a stay of proceedings in this court and raise the issue before the state court pursuant to the Supreme Court's decision in Rhines v. Weber, 544 U.S. 269, 270 (2005). Petitioner's 16 request for counsel is DENIED. Petitioner's 17 request for discovery is DENIED. The court's 7/12/2017 order (ECF No. 12 ), directing the AG to respond to the petition is WITHDRAWN. The motion to dismiss by the District Attorney of El Dorado County is ADOPTED as the response to the petition. (Yin, K)
|
|
GPO
Aug 10 2017
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 8/10/2017 GRANTING petitioner's motion for ifp status. The El Dorado County District Attorney's Office shall have 10 days to file a reply memorandum if it chooses.(Yin, K)
|
|
GPO
Aug 24 2017
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 8/24/2017 GRANTING 31 Motion for Extension of Time. Response due 8/28/2017. (Henshaw, R)
|
|
GPO
Aug 30 2017
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 08/30/17 denying 30 Motion for bail. (Plummer, M)
|
|
GPO
Sep 12 2017
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 9/11/2017 ORDERING petitioner's surreply will be considered when this court issues its findings and recommendations on the pending 15 motion to dismiss. Petitioner shall file no further documents, motions, or notices in this court until the pending motion to dismiss has been resolved through an order of the court. The Clerk shall refrain from filing any such pre-resolution documents, if such are filed in violation of this order, and shall only note them on the court's docket as having been received. (Yin, K)
|
|
GPO
Mar 15 2018
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 03/14/18 ORDERING that respondent file, within 7 days, the petition to the California Supreme Court. (Plummer, M) Modified on 3/15/2018 (Plummer, M).
|
|
GPO
Mar 29 2018
ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 3/28/2018 DENYING as moot 5 ex-parte motion for a hearing; DENYING as moot 7 motion to expedite the decision; DENYING 9 motion for a court order requesting the facility to provide inmate debt fund and other miscellaneous relief; DENYING as moot 10 motion to expedite the petition; and DENYING as moot 21 motion for an extension of time to file a response to the motion to dismiss. It is RECOMMENDED that the 1 Petition be dismissed for lack of exhaustion. Referred to Senior District Judge William B. Shubb. Objections due within 14 days after being served with these findings and recommendations.(York, M)
|