(PC) Fratus v. Klein et al
California Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Kimberly J Mueller |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-00535 |
Nature of Suit | 550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Mar 13, 2017 |
Terminated: | Nov 13, 2017 |
Defendant
J. Nicholson
|
|
Defendant
K. Huggett
|
|
Defendant
M. Ramirez
|
|
Defendant
T. Klein
|
|
Plaintiff
John Fratus
|
Docket last updated: 04/23/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Monday, November 13, 2017 | ||
32 | 32
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Mon 11/13 8:25 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE of VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL (text only): This matter is DISMISSED per31 Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal pursuant to FRCP 41(a). CASE CLOSED. (Henshaw, R) |
|
service
Service by Mail
Mon 11/13 8:25 AM
SERVICE BY MAIL: 32 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal served on John Fratus. (Henshaw, R) |
||
Thursday, November 09, 2017 | ||
33 | 33
minutes
Settlement Conference
Mon 11/13 11:47 AM
MINUTES for proceedings before Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison: SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE held on 11/9/2017; CASE SETTLED. In the course of settlement negotiations in Fratus v. Klein 2:17-cv-0535-KJM-KJN and Fratus v. Mazyck 2:16-cv-0076-KJM-EFB, the matter of Fratus v. Gonzales 2:17-cv-0462-KJM-DB also SETTLED. Terms of the settlement were read on the record. Plaintiff John Fratus Pro Se present. Defendants' Counsel Sarah Brattin, Joanna Hood, and Gabrielle DeSantis-Nield present. Court Reporter/CD Number: ECRO. (Crouch, J) |
|
31 | 31
misc
Stipulation
Thu 11/09 3:21 PM
STIPULATION for Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice (Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii)) by K. Huggett, T. Klein, J. Nicholson, M. Ramirez. (Brattin, Sarah) |
|
Thursday, November 02, 2017 | ||
30 | 30
notice
Notice (Other)
Thu 11/02 10:36 AM
NOTICE of Submission of CONFIDENTIAL Settlement Conference Statement by K. Huggett, T. Klein, J. Nicholson, M. Ramirez. (Brattin, Sarah) |
|
Monday, August 21, 2017 | ||
29 | 29
order
Order
Mon 08/21 11:26 AM
ORDER and WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 8/21/2017 ORDERING the Custodian to produce John Fratus at 9:00 a.m. on 11/9/2017 in Courtroom #4 before Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison. Custodian is ordered to notify the Court of any changes in custody and to provide new custodian with a copy of this writ. Clerk shall serve a copy of this order and writ on the Custodian and Out-to-Court Desk. (cc: Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison and OTCD) (Henshaw, R) |
|
28 | 28
order
Scheduling Order
Mon 08/21 11:22 AM
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 8/21/2017 ORDERING Settlement Conference set before Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison for 11/9/2017 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4. A representative with full and unlimited authority to negotiate and enter into a binding settlement on the defendants behalf shall attend in person. Those in attendance must be prepared to discuss the claims, defenses and damages. The failure of any counsel, party or authorized person subject to this order to appear in person may result in the imposition of sanctions. In addition, the conference will not proceed and will be reset to another date. Judge Kellison or another representative from the court will be contacting the parties either by telephone or in person, approximately one week prior to the settlement conference, to ascertain each partys expectations of the settlement conference. (cc: Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison) (Henshaw, R) |
|
service
Service by Mail
Mon 08/21 11:28 AM
SERVICE BY MAIL:28 Order and29 Order and Writ Issued served on John Fratus. 3 Certified copies of29 Order and Writ Issued served on Warden, SAC, P. O. Box 290002, Represa, California 95671. (Henshaw, R) |
||
Wednesday, August 16, 2017 | ||
27 | 27
notice
Notice re Judge Election for Settlement Conference
Wed 08/16 10:57 AM
NOTICE RE: JUDGE ELECTION FOR SETTLMENT CONFERENCE (Post-Screening ADR Project) requesting the assigned Magistrate Judge participate in the settlement conference by Defendants K. Huggett, T. Klein, J. Nicholson, M. Ramirez. Attorney Brattin, Sarah Margaret Gold added. (Brattin, Sarah) |
|
Monday, August 14, 2017 | ||
26 | 26
notice
Notice re Judge Election for Settlement Conference
Tue 08/15 12:26 PM
NOTICE RE: JUDGE ELECTION FOR SETTLMENT CONFERENCE (Post-Screening ADR Project) requesting a different judge hold the settlement conference by Plaintiff John Fratus. (Hunt, G) |
|
Thursday, August 03, 2017 | ||
25 | 25
misc
Document(s) Served Electronically
Thu 08/03 9:48 AM
DOCUMENTS SERVED ELECTRONICALLY:1 Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint served on Monica Anderson, Supervising Deputy Attorney General. (cc: Monica Anderson, Supervising Deputy Attorney General) (Henshaw, R) |
|
Att: 1 | ||
Att: 9 Screening Order | ||
24 | 24
order
Order Referring Case for ADR Project
Thu 08/03 9:45 AM
ORDER REFERRING CASE TO POST-SCREENING ADR PROJECT AND STAYING CASE FOR 120 DAYS. The parties shall file the attached notice re settlement conference within 30 days of this order. The assigned DAG shall contact Courtroom Deputy within 30 days to schedule a settlement conference. Each party shall submit a confidential settlement conference statement at least 7 days prior to the conference. If settlement is reached, the parties shall file a Notice of Settlement. The Clerk shall serve copies of (a) plaintiff's complaint, (b) the screening order, and (c) the instant order, on Supervising DAG Monica Anderson. (cc: Monica Anderson) signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 8/3/2017. (Henshaw, R) |
|
service
Service by Mail
Thu 08/03 9:45 AM
SERVICE BY MAIL:24 Order Referring Case to Post-Screening ADR Project served on John Fratus. (Henshaw, R) |
||
Tuesday, August 01, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Tue 08/01 3:47 PM
WAIVER of SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED: K. Huggett Waiver sent on 6/19/2017, answer due 8/18/2017; T. Klein Waiver sent on 6/19/2017, answer due 8/18/2017; J. Nicholson Waiver sent on 6/19/2017, answer due 8/18/2017; M. Ramirez Waiver sent on 6/19/2017, answer due 8/18/2017. (Brattin, Sarah) |
|
Monday, July 24, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
misc
Status Report
Tue 07/25 3:44 PM
STATUS REPORT by John Fratus. (Mena-Sanchez, L) |
|
Thursday, July 13, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
order
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Order on Motion for Extension
Thu 07/13 11:30 AM
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 7/13/17 denying16 Motion for the U.S. Marshal service and granting20 Motion for Extension of time. Plaintiff is granted 30 days from the date of this order in which to effect service on defendants. (Plummer, M) |
|
service
Service by Mail
Thu 07/13 11:31 AM
SERVICE BY MAIL:21 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,, Order on Motion for Extension, served on John Fratus. (Plummer, M) |
||
Thursday, June 29, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
motion
Extension of Time
Fri 06/30 9:27 AM
MOTION for EXTENSION OF TIME to serve defendants by John Fratus. (Hunt, G) |
|
Tuesday, June 13, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
order
Order ~Util - 1 Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Tue 06/13 10:36 AM
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 6/13/2017 DENYING as duplicative17 and18 Motions for U.S. Marshal to Serve Defendants. Plaintiff to complete and return the application to proceed IFP within 30 days from the date of this order. (Henshaw, R) |
|
service
Service by Mail
Tue 06/13 10:37 AM
SERVICE BY MAIL:19 Order and IFP application served on John Fratus. (Henshaw, R) |
||
Wednesday, June 07, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Thu 06/08 3:47 PM
MOTION for U.S. Marshal to serve Defendants by John Fratus. (Nguyen, K) |
|
Thursday, June 01, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Fri 06/02 3:54 PM
MOTION for Order directing service by US Marshal by John Fratus. (Hunt, G) |
|
Friday, May 19, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Mon 05/22 11:21 AM
MOTION for U.S. Marshal to serve Defendants by John Fratus. (Nguyen, K) |
|
Wednesday, May 10, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
misc
Decline of Jurisdiction of US Magistrate Judge
Thu 05/11 8:31 AM
DECLINE to PROCEED BEFORE US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by John Fratus. (Hunt, G) |
|
Wednesday, May 03, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
order
09 - Order Re Consent or Request for Reassignment
Wed 05/03 1:54 PM
ORDER RE CONSENT OR REQUEST FOR REASSIGNMENT signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 5/3/2017. (Yin, K) |
|
Att: 1 Order re Consent, | ||
Att: 2 Order re Consent, | ||
Att: 3 Order re Consent, | ||
Att: 4 Order re Consent | ||
13 | 13
service
Summons Issued
Wed 05/03 1:52 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to *M. Ramirez* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *John Fratus V-74577* *California State Prison, Sacramento* *P.O. Box 290066* *Represa, CA 95671-0066*. (Yin, K) |
|
12 | 12
service
Summons Issued
Wed 05/03 1:50 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to *J. Nicholson* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *John Fratus* *California State Prison, Sacramento* *P.O. Box 290066* *Represa, CA 95671-0066*. (Yin, K) |
|
11 | 11
service
Summons Issued
Wed 05/03 1:48 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to *T. Klein* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *John Fratus V-74577* *California State Prison, Sacramento* *P.O. Box 290066* *Represa, CA 95671-0066*. (Yin, K) |
|
10 | 10
service
Summons
Wed 05/03 1:46 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to *K. Huggett* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *John Fratus V-74577* *California State Prison, Sacramento* *P.O. Box 290066* *Represa, CA 95671-0066*. (Yin, K) |
|
9 | 9
order
08 - Screening Order
Wed 05/03 1:44 PM
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 5/3/2017 ORDERING the Clerk to send plaintiff forms to effect service on defendants Nicholson, Klein, Ramirez, and Huggett. Plaintiff shall complete service of process within 60 days, in accordance with this order. Defendants shall reply to the complaint within the time provided in Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(a). Plaintiff's status report shall be filed within 90 days from the date of this order. Defendants' status report shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. The Clerk shall serve plaintiff a copy of the Local Rules.(Yin, K) |
|
service
Service by Mail
Wed 05/03 2:01 PM
SERVICE BY MAIL:9 Order along with Local Rules,10 ,11 ,12 ,13 Summons Issued, 5 copies of14 Order Re Consent or Request for Reassignment, and 1 copy of the1 complaint served on John Fratus. (Yin, K) |
||
Tuesday, April 18, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
order
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Tue 04/18 12:49 PM
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 4/18/2017 DENYING plaintiff's6 motion for disqualification. (Yin, K) |
|
service
Service by Mail
Tue 04/18 12:50 PM
SERVICE BY MAIL:8 Order on Motion served on John Fratus. (Yin, K) |
||
Friday, April 07, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Clerk's Notice of Docket Correction
Fri 04/07 3:39 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE (text only): This case is assigned to District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller and Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman; the new case number is 2:17-cv-0535-KJM-KJN (PC). (Zignago, K.) |
|
service
Service by Mail
Fri 04/07 3:53 PM
SERVICE BY MAIL: 7 Clerk's Notice served on John Fratus. (Zignago, K.) |
||
Friday, March 31, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Mon 04/03 3:37 PM
MOTION to vacate assignment to Magistrate Judge Newman by John Fratus. (Zignago, K.) |
|
Thursday, March 30, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Decline of Jurisdiction of US Magistrate Judge
Fri 03/31 3:56 PM
DECLINE to PROCEED BEFORE US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by John Fratus. (Zignago, K.) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Objections
Fri 03/31 3:56 PM
OBJECTIONS by Plaintiff John Fratus to Magistrate Judge conducting any proceedings in this matter. (Zignago, K.) |
|
Tuesday, March 28, 2017 | ||
misc
CAED Receipt
Tue 03/28 2:24 PM
RECEIPT number #CAE200080963 $400.00 fbo John Fratus by State of California on 3/28/2017. (Michel, G.) |
||
Friday, March 24, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
order
Order
Fri 03/24 3:35 PM
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 3/24/2017 ORDERING plaintiff to submit, within 30 days, an affidavit to proceed ifp or the required fees in the amount of $400.00; and the Clerk shall send plaintiff a new ifp application.(Yin, K) |
|
service
Service by Mail
Fri 03/24 3:35 PM
SERVICE BY MAIL:3 Order and ifp form served on John Fratus. (Yin, K) |
||
Tuesday, March 14, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
order
Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider
Tue 03/14 2:26 PM
PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 4/17/2017 (Washington, S) |
|
Att: 1 Order re Consent | ||
service
Service by Mail
Tue 03/14 2:27 PM
SERVICE BY MAIL:2 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on John Fratus. (Washington, S) |
||
Monday, March 13, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint
Tue 03/14 2:26 PM
PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against All Defendants by John Fratus.(Washington, S) |
|
Att: 1 Litigant Letter re fees |