(HC) Dukes v. Warden et al
California Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Kimberly J Mueller |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-00541 |
Nature of Suit | 530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General |
Cause | 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State) |
Case Filed: | Mar 13, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jun 21, 2017 |
Petitioner
Melvin Dukes
|
|
Respondent
A. Buyen
|
|
Respondent
Captain
|
|
Respondent
Duncan
|
|
Respondent
Warden
|
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Wednesday, July 05, 2017 | ||
misc
Mail Returned
Thu 07/06 10:30 AM
MAIL RETURNED as Undeliverable, Inmate refused delivery:6 Judgment,5 Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations sent to Melvin Dukes. (Kastilahn, A) |
||
Wednesday, June 21, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
order
Judgment
Wed 06/21 2:38 PM
JUDGMENT dated *6/21/2017* pursuant to order signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 6/21/2017. (Donati, J) |
|
5 | 5
order
Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations
Wed 06/21 2:38 PM
ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 6/21/2017 ADOPTING4 Findings and Recommendations in full. This action is DISMISSED without prejudice. The court DECLINES to issue a Certificate of Appealability. (Donati, J) |
|
service
Service by Mail
Wed 06/21 2:39 PM
SERVICE BY MAIL:6 Judgment and5 Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations served on Melvin Dukes. (Donati, J) |
||
Tuesday, May 30, 2017 | ||
misc
Mail Returned
Wed 05/31 3:05 PM
MAIL RETURNED as Undeliverable, inmate refused:4 Findings and Recommendations sent to Melvin Dukes. Notice of Change of Address due by 8/7/2017. (Benson, A) |
||
Wednesday, May 10, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
motion
Findings and Recommendations
Wed 05/10 9:57 AM
ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 5/9/2017 DIRECTING the Clerk to assign a District Judge and RECOMMENDING that this action be dismissed without prejudice. Referred to Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. Objections to F&R due within 14 days after being served with these findings and recommendations. (Henshaw, R) |
|
service
Service by Mail
Wed 05/10 9:57 AM
SERVICE BY MAIL:4 Order and Findings and Recommendations served on Melvin Dukes. (Henshaw, R) |
||
Friday, April 21, 2017 | ||
misc
Mail Returned
Mon 04/24 10:10 AM
MAIL RETURNED AS UNDELIVERABLE, RTS - refused:2 Prisoner New Case Documents,3 Order sent to Melvin Dukes D-33572. Notice of Change of Address due by 6/29/2017. (Michel, G.) |
||
Wednesday, April 05, 2017 | ||
service
Service by Mail
Wed 04/05 12:22 PM
RE-SERVICE BY MAIL:2 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider, and3 Order with ifp re-served on Melvin Dukes. (Yin, K) Modified on 4/5/2017 (Yin, K) |
||
Friday, March 24, 2017 | ||
misc
Mail Returned
Wed 03/29 8:36 AM
MAIL RETURNED as Undeliverable, inmate refused delivery:2 Prisoner New Case Documents sent to Melvin Dukes. (Benson, A) |
||
misc
Mail Returned
Wed 03/29 8:38 AM
MAIL RETURNED as Undeliverable, inmate refused delivery:3 Order sent to Melvin Dukes. (Benson, A) |
||
Wednesday, March 15, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
order
Order
Wed 03/15 2:32 PM
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 3/15/2017 ORDERING Petitioner shall submit, within 30 days from the date of this order, an affidavit in support of his request to proceed in forma pauperis or the appropriate filing fee; petitioner; and the Clerk of the Court is directed to send petitioner a copy of the in forma pauperis form used by this district. |
|
Att: 1 IFP Application | ||
service
Service by Mail
Wed 03/15 2:32 PM
SERVICE BY MAIL:3 Order, served on Melvin Dukes. |
||
Tuesday, March 14, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
order
Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider
Tue 03/14 10:34 AM
PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 4/17/2017. (Kastilahn, A) |
|
Att: 1 Order re Consent | ||
service
Service by Mail
Tue 03/14 10:35 AM
SERVICE BY MAIL:2 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Melvin Dukes. (Kastilahn, A) |
||
Monday, March 13, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
Tue 03/14 10:34 AM
PETITION for WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS against all respondents by Melvin Dukes. (Kastilahn, A) |