Jenkins v. Spanish Springs Construction, Inc.
California Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | William B Shubb |
Referred: | Allison Claire |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-00542 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Mar 13, 2017 |
Terminated: | Feb 16, 2018 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 09, 2017 3:05 AM PDT |
Defendant
Spanish Springs Construction, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kerri Jenkins
|
Represented By
|
GPO
Feb 16 2018
STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 2/15/2018 DISMISSING this action with prejudice. CASE CLOSED. (Hunt, G) |
Docket last updated: 04/18/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Friday, February 16, 2018 | ||
20 | 20
order
Stipulation and Order ~Util - Terminate Civil Case
Fri 02/16 11:26 AM
STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 2/15/2018 DISMISSING this action with prejudice. CASE CLOSED. (Hunt, G) |
|
Thursday, February 15, 2018 | ||
19 | 19
misc
Stipulation and Proposed Order
Thu 02/15 9:06 AM
AMENDED STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Dismissal with Prejudice by Kerri Jenkins. (Basile, Louis) Modified on 2/15/2018 (Kirksey Smith, K) |
|
Monday, February 12, 2018 | ||
18 | 18
misc
Stipulation
Mon 02/12 12:14 PM
STIPULATION and Proposed Order for Dismissal with Prejudice by Kerri Jenkins. (Basile, Louis) |
|
Wednesday, October 04, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
notice
Notice (Other)
Wed 10/04 12:14 PM
NOTICE of Attorney's Lien by All Plaintiffs.(Cloon, Bryson) |
|
Att: 1 E-Service Notice | ||
Friday, September 22, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
order
Substitution of Attorney Order
Fri 09/22 8:55 AM
ORDER SUBSTITUTING ATTORNEY signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 9/21/17. Added Attorney Louis A. Basile for Kerri Jenkins, Attorney Mary E. Alexander terminated. (Becknal, R) |
|
Wednesday, September 20, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
notice
Notice (Other)
Wed 09/20 8:30 AM
NOTICE Consent Order Granting Substitution of Attorney by Kerri Jenkins. Attorney Cuttitta, Peter H. added. (Cuttitta, Peter) |
|
Wednesday, September 13, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
order
Minute Order
Wed 09/13 10:00 AM
MINUTE ORDER (TEXT ONLY): The Court is in receipt of13 Plaintiff's Request for Substitution of Counsel in pro per, filed 9/13/2017, and ORDERS said document STRICKEN. Counsel for plaintiff is HEREBY ORDERED to file an appropriately noticed motion for leave to withdraw as counsel of record pursuant to Local Rules 182(d) and 230. Plaintiff Kerri Jenkins shall be notified of said date and time and is required to be present at the motion hearing. All parties are instructed to review Judge Shubb's calendaring information on the court's website at www.caed.uscourts.gov for available hearing dates prior to filing any motions. (Kirksey Smith, K) |
|
13 | 13
misc
Substitution of Attorney - Proposed
Wed 09/13 9:39 AM
***DISREGARD; STRICKEN - - SEE DOCKET # 14 ***SUBSTITUTION of ATTORNEY - PROPOSED, submitted by Kerri Jenkins. (Alexander, Mary) Modified on 9/13/2017 (Kirksey Smith, K) |
|
Monday, June 26, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
order
Scheduling Order ~Util - 1 Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings
Mon 06/26 12:18 PM
STATUS (PRETRIAL SCHEDULING) ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 6/23/2017 ORDERING the parties to engage in private mediation by 10/13/2017; ORDERING the parties to file the initial disclosures in accordance with F.R.Cv.P. Rule 26(a)(1) by 7/17/2017; ORDERING the parties to disclose experts by 3/19/2018 and to disclose rebuttal experts by 4/18/2018; ORDERING that all discovery be completed by 5/18/2018; ORDERING that all motions to compel discovery be noticed on the magistrate judge's calendar to be heard (and obeyed) by 5/18/5018; ORDERING that all motions, except motions for continuances, temporary restraining orders, or other emergency applications, be filed by 6/15/2018; SETTING the Final Pretrial Conference for 8/27/2018 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb; SETTING the Jury Trial for 10/23/2018 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb; ORDERING that any requests to modify the dates or terms of this Scheduling Order, except requests to change the date of trial, be heard and decided by the assigned Magistrate Judge. (Michel, G.) |
|
Monday, June 19, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Status Report
Mon 06/19 10:17 AM
JOINT STATUS REPORT by Kerri Jenkins. (Gee, Casey) |
|
Thursday, May 04, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice (Other)
Thu 05/04 10:44 AM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Spanish Springs Construction, Inc. (Wetters, Mark) |
|
9 | 9
answer
Answer to Complaint
Thu 05/04 10:25 AM
ANSWER with Jury Demand by Spanish Springs Construction, Inc. Attorney Wetters, Mark R. added.(Wetters, Mark) |
|
Monday, May 01, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 05/01 2:31 PM
NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Casey Ann Gee on behalf of Kerri Jenkins. Attorney Gee, Casey Ann added. (Gee, Casey) |
|
Wednesday, April 19, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons Returned Executed
Wed 04/19 9:02 AM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Spanish Springs Construction, Inc. served on 4/14/2017, answer due 5/5/2017. (Alexander, Mary) |
|
Friday, March 24, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
order
Pro Hac Vice Order
Fri 03/24 11:49 AM
PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 3/24/17. Added Attorney Bryson R. Cloon, PHV for Kerri Jenkins. (Becknal, R) |
|
Thursday, March 23, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Application for Pro Hac Vice and Proposed Order
Thu 03/23 11:35 AM
PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Kerri Jenkins for attorney Bryson R. Cloon to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number 0972-6977866) (Alexander, Mary) |
|
Tuesday, March 14, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 03/14 11:19 AM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE: Attorney Jennifer L. Fiore ADDED for Kerri Jenkins. (Fiore, Jennifer) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Civil New Case Documents for WBS
Tue 03/14 9:03 AM
CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 7/3/2017 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. (Zignago, K.) |
|
Att: 1 Consent Form, | ||
Att: 2 VDRP | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons
Tue 03/14 9:02 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Spanish Springs Construction, Inc.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Mary E. Alexander* *Mary Alexander & Associates, P.C.* *44 Montgomery St., Ste. 1303* *San Francisco, CA 94104*. (Zignago, K.) |
|
Monday, March 13, 2017 | ||
1 | 1 COMPLAINT for Damages against Spanish Springs Construction, Inc. by Kerri Jenkins. Attorney Alexander, Mary E. added.(Alexander, Mary) Modified on 3/14/2017 (Zignago, K.). | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
misc
Receipt
Tue 03/14 8:52 AM
RECEIPT number 0972-6959464 for $400.00 for civil filing fee from Mary E. Alexander. (Zignago, K.) |