|
GPO
Mar 13 2017
ORDER OF TRANSFER. Case is transferred to the United States District Court, Eastern District of California. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim on 3/13/2017. (Attachments: # (1) Certificate/Proof of Service)(mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2017) [Transferred from cand on 3/14/2017.]
|
|
GPO
Mar 20 2019
FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 03/20/19 RECOMMENDING that petitioner's application for a writ of habeas corpus be denied. Referred to Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. Objections due within 14 days. (Plummer, M)
|
|
GPO
Feb 18 2020
ORDER signed by Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 2/18/2020 ADOPTING 20 Findings and Recommendations in full; DENYING 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus; and DECLINING to issue the certificate of appealability. CASE CLOSED. (Coll, A)
|