(SS) Crawford v Commissioner of Social Security
California Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Dennis M Cota |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-00551 |
Nature of Suit | 864 Social Security - SSID Title XVI |
Cause | 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID) |
Case Filed: | Mar 14, 2017 |
Terminated: | Sep 27, 2018 |
Defendant
Commissioner of Social Security
|
|
Plaintiff
Ida Crawford
|
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Wednesday, June 05, 2019 | ||
26 | 26
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Wed 06/05 9:47 AM
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 6/5/20109 GRANTING25 Motion to Clarify24 Order regarding an award of fees to plaintiff's attorney. Specifically, defendant seeks clarification of the 65-day deadline to pay fees awarded by the court. The court clarifies the 3/6/2019, order to reflect that initiation of the payment process within the specified deadline constitutes sufficient compliance. (York, M) |
|
Friday, March 08, 2019 | ||
25 | 25
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Fri 03/08 4:16 PM
MOTION to Clarify Pursuant to Rule 60(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, and/or for Relief from Order Pursuant to Rule 60(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure re24 Order on Motion for Attorney Fees, by Commissioner of Social Security.(Talbert, Daniel) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of Trent Waters | ||
Wednesday, March 06, 2019 | ||
24 | 24
7
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Attorney Fees
Wed 03/06 10:39 AM
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 3/6/2019 GRANTING22 Motion for Attorney Fees. Plaintiff is awarded $5,830.92 in fees plus $19.86 in costs, payable to plaintiff within 65 days of the date of this order. (York, M) |
|
Friday, January 18, 2019 | ||
23 | 23
respm
Opposition to Motion
Fri 01/18 11:04 AM
OPPOSITION by Commissioner of Social Security to22 Motion for Attorney Fees. (Talbert, Daniel) |
|
Thursday, December 20, 2018 | ||
22 | 22
motion
Attorney Fees
Thu 12/20 2:20 PM
MOTION for ATTORNEY FEES by Ida Crawford.(Barasch, Stuart) Modified on 12/20/2018 (Benson, A.) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit E, | ||
Att: 7 Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 8 Certificate of Service | ||
Thursday, September 27, 2018 | ||
21 | 21
order
Judgment
Thu 09/27 10:19 AM
JUDGMENT dated *9/26/18* entered pursuant to order signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 9/26/18. (Kastilahn, A) |
|
20 | 20
order
Memorandum, Opinion & Order ~Util - Case Remanded Order on Motion for Summary Judgment
Thu 09/27 10:17 AM
MEMORANDUM, OPINION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 9/26/18 GRANTING15 Motion for Summary Judgment and DENYING16 Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment. The Commissioner's final decision is REVERSED and this matter is REMANDED for further proceedings consistent with this order. The Clerk is directed to enter judgment. CASE CLOSED (Kastilahn, A) |
|
Tuesday, September 04, 2018 | ||
19 | 19
misc
Order Reassigning Newly Appointed Magistrate Judge
Tue 09/04 10:15 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill: Due to the appointment of *Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota* to the bench of the Eastern District of California, this action is reassigned from *Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison* to Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota for all further proceedings. (Zignago, K.) |
|
Friday, February 09, 2018 | ||
18 | 18
misc
Designation of Counsel
Fri 02/09 4:49 PM
DESIGNATION of COUNSEL FOR SERVICE. Added attorney Edward Alan Olsen, ss for Commissioner of Social Security, attorney Bobbie J. Montoya, ss terminated (Olsen, Edward) |
|
Friday, October 27, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Reply
Fri 10/27 10:27 AM
REPLY by Ida Crawford re16 MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT.(Barasch, Stuart) |
|
Att: 1 Proof of Service | ||
Wednesday, October 11, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
motion
Summary Judgment
Wed 10/11 3:35 PM
MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Commissioner of Social Security. (Talbert, Daniel) |
|
Monday, September 11, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
appeal
Appellants Brief
Mon 09/11 11:56 AM
APPELLANT'S BRIEF by Ida Crawford.(Barasch, Stuart) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Wednesday, July 26, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Acknowledgement of Receipt
Wed 07/26 3:04 PM
ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT of13 SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATIVE TRANSCRIPT by Commissioner of Social Security. (Routed to the file room) (Kastilahn, A) |
|
13 | 13
notice
Notice of Lodging Social Security Administrative Transcript
Wed 07/26 12:07 PM
NOTICE OF LODGING SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATIVE TRANSCRIPT by Commissioner of Social Security. In Paper Format and E-Filing Electronic Administrative Transcript(Montoya, Bobbie) |
|
Att: 1 Certification Page, | ||
Att: 2 Court Transcript Index, | ||
Att: 3 Administrative Process Including Transcript of Oral Hearing, if applicable, | ||
Att: 4 Payment Documents, | ||
Att: 5 Jurisdictional Documents Part 1, | ||
Att: 6 Jurisdictional Documents Part 2, | ||
Att: 7 Non Disability Related Development, | ||
Att: 8 Disability Related Development Part 1, | ||
Att: 9 Disability Related Development Part 2, | ||
Att: 10 Disability Related Development Part 3, | ||
Att: 11 Medical Records Part 1, | ||
Att: 12 Medical Records Part 2, | ||
Att: 13 Medical Records Part 3, | ||
Att: 14 Medical Records Part 4, | ||
Att: 15 Medical Records Part 5 | ||
12 | 12
answer
Answer to Complaint
Wed 07/26 10:08 AM
ANSWER by Commissioner of Social Security.(Talbert, Daniel) |
|
Monday, June 19, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 06/19 4:12 PM
NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Bobbie J. Montoya, ss on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security. Attorney Montoya, Bobbie J. added. (Montoya, Bobbie) |
|
Friday, May 12, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Consent to Jurisdiction of US Magistrate Judge
Fri 05/12 3:10 PM
CONSENT to JURISDICTION of US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Ida Crawford. (Barasch, Stuart) |
|
Monday, May 08, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
service
Summons Returned Executed as to USA
Mon 05/08 2:43 PM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Ida Crawford. Commissioner of Social Security served on 4/27/2017, answer due 6/26/2017. (Barasch, Stuart) |
|
Saturday, May 06, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Consent to Jurisdiction of US Magistrate Judge
Sat 05/06 7:29 AM
CONSENT to JURISDICTION of US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Commissioner of Social Security. Attorney Talbert, Daniel P. added. (Talbert, Daniel) |
|
Monday, April 17, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
order
Social Security New Case Documents for MJ as Presider
Mon 04/17 10:02 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER and ORDER RE CONSENT in SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL Consent or Decline due by 7/20/2017 (Becknal, R) |
|
Att: 1 Order re Consent, | ||
Att: 2 SS Conset Form | ||
6 | 6
service
Summons
Mon 04/17 10:02 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Commissioner of Social Security* with answer to complaint due within *60* days. Attorney *Stuart T. Barasch* *Law Offices of Stuart T. Barasch* *767 N Hill Street, Suite 220* *Los Angeles, CA 90012*. (Becknal, R) |
|
5 | 5
order
Order ~Util - Set/Clear Flags
Mon 04/17 9:57 AM
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 1/14/17 ORDERING that Plaintiff's4 Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED; the Clerk is directed to serve on plaintiff the undersigned's scheduling order in social security cases; Within 15 days Plaintiff shall submit service documents to the USM and file a statement with the court that said documents have been submitted. (cc: USM)(Becknal, R) |
|
Tuesday, March 14, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
motion
In Forma Pauperis
Tue 03/14 2:42 PM
MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Ida Crawford. (Barasch, Stuart) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Exhibit
Tue 03/14 1:26 PM
EXHIBIT A by Ida Crawford re2 Social Security Complaint. (Barasch, Stuart) Modified on 3/14/2017 (Kaminski, H) |
|
2 | 2
cmp
Complaint (Social Security Appeal)
Tue 03/14 1:24 PM
SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT for Review of a Social Security Decision against Commissioner of Social Security by Ida Crawford. Attorney Barasch, Stuart T. added.(Barasch, Stuart) Modified on 3/14/2017 (Kaminski, H) |
|
1 | 1
utility
Civil Cover Sheet
Tue 03/14 1:19 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET by Ida Crawford. (Barasch, Stuart) Modified on 3/14/2017 (Kaminski, H) |
|
misc
IFP Application
Tue 03/14 3:44 PM
APPLICATION TO PROCEED IFP filed - Action Required. (Kaminski, H) |