New Paradigm Property Management LLC v. Allied World Insurance Company
California Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Morrison C England, Jr |
Referred: | Gregory G Hollows |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-00552 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | Mar 14, 2017 |
Terminated: | Apr 25, 2017 |
Last checked: Sunday Sep 10, 2017 2:25 AM PDT |
Defendant
Allied World Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
New Paradigm Property Management LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Tuesday, April 25, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
order
Order Reassigning Case ~Util - 1 Terminate Deadlines and Hearings ~Util - Terminate Civil Case
Tue 04/25 10:41 AM
RELATED AND CONSOLIDATED CASE ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 4/24/2017 RELATING CASE(S) 2:16-CV-2992 MCE GGH and 2:17-CV-552 KJM CKD; Case No. 2:17-CV-552 is REASSIGNED to District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows for all further proceedings; any dates currently set in 2:17-CV-552 KJM CKD are hereby VACATED; 2:16-CV-2992 MCE GGH is designated as the MASTER FILE and 2:17-CV-552 is ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED; Joint Status Report due 30 days of the filing of this Order; District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller, Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney no longer assigned to case. New Case Number: 2:17-CV-552 MCE GGH. |
|
Thursday, April 13, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Stipulation and Proposed Order
Thu 04/13 9:30 AM
STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Consolidation by New Paradigm Property Management LLC. (Rupley Haefele, Brittany) |
|
Thursday, March 23, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
order
Minute Order ~Util - 1 Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings
Thu 03/23 8:41 AM
MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy C. Schultz for District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller: On the court's own motion, the Status (Pretrial Scheduling) Conference set for 7/20/2017 is VACATED and ADVANCED to 5/11/2017 at 2:30 PM in Courtroom 3 before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller, with the filing of a joint status report due seven days prior. (Text Only Entry)(Schultz, C) |
|
Tuesday, March 21, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
answer
Answer to Complaint
Tue 03/21 3:22 PM
ANSWER with Jury Demand by Allied World Insurance Company. Attorney Hopkins, Ronald W. added.(Hopkins, Ronald) |
|
Tuesday, March 14, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Civil New Case Documents for KJM
Tue 03/14 4:22 PM
CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 7/20/2017 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Kaminski, H) |
|
Att: 1 Standing Order, | ||
Att: 2 Consent Form, | ||
Att: 3 VDRP | ||
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Tue 03/14 2:19 PM
NOTICE of REMOVAL from California Superior Court for the County of Placer, case number SCV0038842 by Allied World Insurance Company . (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-6961597). (Gascou, Christian) Modified on 3/14/2017 (Kaminski, H) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |