Lefler v. Midland Credit Management, Inc.
California Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Michael M Anello |
Referred: | Mitchell D Dembin |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-00504 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | 47:0227 FCC-Unsolicited Telephone Sales |
Case Filed: | Mar 14, 2017 |
Terminated: | Mar 11, 2021 |
Last checked: Sunday Sep 10, 2017 1:22 AM PDT |
Defendant
Midland Credit Management, Inc
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lori Lefler
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 76 minutes ago |
Monday, March 15, 2021 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Transfer Letter Received
Mon 03/15 12:40 PM
Transfer Letter Received from Middle District of Florida. Case number in other court is 8:21-cv-00500 (jpp) |
|
Thursday, March 11, 2021 | ||
order
Case Transferred Out - District FORM
Thu 03/11 1:22 PM
Case transferred to District of Middle District of Florida. Files transferred electronically. The parties in this case failed to stipulate or designate the contents of the remanded record as directed in the order dated 1/21/2021 (see Docket No.15 ). Pursuant to United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation Rule 10.4(b), the record of this case is being transferred to the (transferor court name) as to case No. 8:17-cv-00444 per the Conditional Remand Order of MDL 2286 (ECF 1085) dated 12/15/2020 (see Doc. No.13 ). (no document attached) (jdt) |
||
Thursday, January 21, 2021 | ||
15 | 15
3
pgs
order
Order
Thu 01/21 10:10 AM
ORDER Setting Deadline to Comply With JPML Rule 10.4(a) and Order Closing the Case. The Court order that the parties subject to the Panel's remand orders furnish the Clerk for the Southern District of California with a stipulation or designation of the contents of the record to be remanded on or before 2/12/2021. Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 1/20/2021.Associated Cases: 3:11-md-02286-MMA-MDD et al. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) CC: MDL Panel (jdt) |
|
Wednesday, January 06, 2021 | ||
14 | 14
notice
Notice of MDL Filing
Thu 01/07 2:06 PM
NOTICE of MDL Filing: Order Lifting Stay of Conditional Remand Order and Vacating the January 28, 2021 Hearing Session Order. (MDL 2286, ECF 1093.) Associated Cases: 3:11-md-02286-MMA-MDD et al. CC: MDL Panel (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) (jdt) |
|
Tuesday, December 15, 2020 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Notice of MDL Filing
Tue 12/15 12:39 PM
NOTICE of MDL Filing: Conditional Remand Order MDL 2286 (ECF 1085). Associated Cases: 3:11-md-02286-MMA-MDD et al. CC: MDL Panel(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) (Duplicate filing of ECF No. 834 in 11md2286 to spread Conditional Remand Order to all associated cases.)(jdt) |
|
Thursday, March 23, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
order
Order
Thu 03/23 12:08 PM
ORDER Re: Submission of Applications for Appointment of New Lead and Liaison Counsel. Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 3/22/2017.Associated Cases: 3:11-md-02286-MMA-MDD et al.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(ag) |
|
Tuesday, March 14, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Electronic Transfer In
Tue 03/14 2:36 PM
Judge Michael M. Anello and Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin assigned to transfer case from Middle District of Florida. (no document attached) (kas) |
|
10 | 10
cmp
Case Transferred In - District Transfer (Electronic Transfers Only)
Tue 03/14 2:34 PM
Case transferred in from District of Florida Middle; Case Number 8:17-cv-00444. Original file received electronically (kas) |
|
9 | 9
transfer
Transfer Document
Tue 03/14 1:26 PM
MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION panel order transferring case to: Southern District of California MDL case number: 2286. (DG) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 3/14/2017.] |
|
Friday, March 03, 2017 | ||
8 | 8 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re3 Notice of designation of track per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Midland Credit Management, Inc.. Related case(s): No (Eichhorn, Cory) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 3/14/2017.] | |
7 | 7 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Lori Lefler. (Arkovich, Christie) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 3/14/2017.] | |
6 | 6 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re3 Notice of designation of track per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Lori Lefler. Related case(s): NO (Arkovich, Christie) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 3/14/2017.] | |
Thursday, March 02, 2017 | ||
5 | 5 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Midland Credit Management, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Encore Capital Group, Inc. for Midland Credit Management, Inc... (Eichhorn, Cory) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 3/14/2017.] | |
Wednesday, March 01, 2017 | ||
4 | 4 Defendant Midland Credit Management's ANSWER and affirmative defenses to 2 Complaint by Midland Credit Management, Inc..(Palermo, Anthony) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 3/14/2017.] | |
Thursday, February 23, 2017 | ||
3 | 3 NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - Track 2 (LD) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 3/14/2017.] | |
Wednesday, February 22, 2017 | ||
2 | 2 COMPLAINT against Midland Credit Management, Inc. with Jury Demand filed in State Court on 1/31/2017 by Lori Lefler.(AMD) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 3/14/2017.] | |
1 | 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from the 13th Judicial Circuit, in and for Hillsborough County, Florida, case number 17-CA-000939 filed in State Court on 1/31/2017. Filing fee $ 400.00, receipt number TPA-041986 filed by Midland Credit Management, Inc.(AMD) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 3/14/2017.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet |