David Milan v. Southern Indiana Gas & Electri
Original Case: 3:16-cv-00177
Seventh Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:17-cv-01534 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Mar 13, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jun 01, 2017 |
Last checked: Friday Jun 02, 2017 3:35 AM CDT |
Defendant - Appellee
SOUTHERN INDIANA GAS & ELECTRIC COMPANY, now known as VECTREN
|
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
DAVID A. MILAN
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 06/02/2017 3:30 AM CDT |
Monday, March 13, 2017 | ||
1 | 1 Private civil case docketed. IFP pending in the District Court. Docketing Statement due for Appellant David A. Milan by 03/20/2017. Transcript information sheet due by 03/27/2017. [1] [6825488] 17-1534 (CAG) | |
2 | 2 This is notification that no appellee(s) or counsel for the appellee(s) were served in the District Court. [2] [6825490] 17-1534 (CAG) |