LIBERTY CORPORATE CAPITAL LTD v. NU ZETA CHAPTER OF LAMBDA CHI ALPHA INC et al
Georgia Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Clay D Land |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-00053 |
Nature of Suit | 110 Contract - Insurance |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Declaratory Judgment |
Case Filed: | Mar 15, 2017 |
Terminated: | Dec 08, 2017 |
Last checked: Monday Sep 11, 2017 4:19 AM EDT |
Defendant
RACHAEL B MCKENZIE
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
NU ZETA CHAPTER OF LAMBDA CHI ALPHA INC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
LIBERTY CORPORATE CAPITAL LTD
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/23/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, December 08, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Fri 12/08 12:44 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by LIBERTY CORPORATE CAPITAL LTD (KIRK, ANN) |
|
Monday, August 14, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
order
Scheduling/Discovery Order
Mon 08/14 11:32 AM
SCHEDULING/DISCOVERY ORDER :Discovery to be complete by 12/21/2017. Dispositive motions due by 2/2/2018. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND on 8/14/2017. (esl) |
|
Wednesday, July 05, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Wed 07/05 5:27 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by LIBERTY CORPORATE CAPITAL LTD identifying Corporate Parent LIBERTY MUTUAL HOLDING COMPANY INC, Corporate Parent Liberty International Holdings Inc. for LIBERTY CORPORATE CAPITAL LTD. (KIRK, ANN) |
|
Wednesday, June 21, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
answer
Answer to Amended Complaint
Wed 06/21 1:47 PM
ANSWER to9 Amended Complaint, by RACHAEL B MCKENZIE.(DOLDER, RICHARD) |
|
Tuesday, June 20, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
order
Order - Rules 16/26
Tue 06/20 4:49 PM
RULES 16/26 ORDER :Proposed Scheduling/Discovery order due by 8/4/2017. Corporate Disclosures due by 7/5/2017. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND on 6/20/2017. (ggs) |
|
notice
Notice of Deficiency
Tue 06/20 8:54 AM
Notice of Deficiency ; Wrong event used - the correct event is "ANSWER TO COMPLAINT" - No need to refile, docket text has been edited by case manager. (ggs) |
||
Monday, June 19, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
respoth
Amended Answer to Complaint
Mon 06/19 7:15 PM
AMENDED ANSWER by NU ZETA CHAPTER OF LAMBDA CHI ALPHA INC. (TIPPINS, STEPHEN) |
|
Wednesday, June 07, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Withdrawal of Motion
Wed 06/07 2:32 PM
WITHDRAWAL of Motion re8 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint re1 Complaint,, : filed by RACHAEL B MCKENZIE (DOLDER, RICHARD) |
|
12 | 12
misc
Stipulation
Wed 06/07 12:24 PM
STIPULATION Extending Time for Defendant McKenzie to Respond re9 Amended Complaint, by RACHAEL B MCKENZIE (DOLDER, RICHARD) |
|
11 | 11
notice
Notice (Other)
Wed 06/07 12:18 PM
NOTICE of Withdrawal of Motion by RACHAEL B MCKENZIE re8 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint re1 Complaint,, : (DOLDER, RICHARD) |
|
notice
Notice of Deficiency
Wed 06/07 1:41 PM
Notice of Deficiency ; Document must be refiled using correct event. The correct event is "WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION". When the Withdrawal of Motion event it used, the motion will automatically be terminated without the necessity of a ruling by the Court. (ggs) |
||
Wednesday, May 31, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
respm
Response to Motion
Wed 05/31 6:29 PM
RESPONSE filed by LIBERTY CORPORATE CAPITAL LTD re8 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint re1 Complaint,, : (FIELDS, PAUL) |
|
9 | 9
cmp
Amended Complaint
Wed 05/31 6:24 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT re1 Complaint,, against All Defendants by LIBERTY CORPORATE CAPITAL LTD(FIELDS, PAUL) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A-Underlying Amended Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B-Policy, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C-ROR Letter, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D-Crowbar MSDS, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E-McKenzie Depo Excerpts | ||
Wednesday, May 10, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
motion
Dismiss Complaint
Wed 05/10 4:18 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Complaint re1 Complaint,, : by RACHAEL B MCKENZIE filed by RICHARD E DOLDER, JR.(DOLDER, RICHARD) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance
Wed 05/10 3:52 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by RICHARD E DOLDER, JR on behalf of RACHAEL B MCKENZIE Attorney RICHARD E DOLDER, JR added to party RACHAEL B MCKENZIE(pty:dft) (DOLDER, RICHARD) |
|
Thursday, April 27, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
service
Summons Returned Executed
Thu 04/27 11:57 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by LIBERTY CORPORATE CAPITAL LTD as to RACHAEL B MCKENZIE. (KIRK, ANN) |
|
Monday, April 24, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 04/24 10:36 AM
ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by NU ZETA CHAPTER OF LAMBDA CHI ALPHA INC.(TIPPINS, STEPHEN)Attorney STEPHEN B TIPPINS, JR added to party NU ZETA CHAPTER OF LAMBDA CHI ALPHA INC(pty:dft) |
|
Thursday, April 06, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Returned Executed
Thu 04/06 3:35 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by LIBERTY CORPORATE CAPITAL LTD as to NU ZETA CHAPTER OF LAMBDA CHI ALPHA INC. (KIRK, ANN) |
|
Thursday, March 16, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Thu 03/16 9:51 AM
Summons Issued as to RACHAEL B MCKENZIE. (ggs) |
|
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Thu 03/16 9:51 AM
Summons Issued as to NU ZETA CHAPTER OF LAMBDA CHI ALPHA INC. (ggs) |
|
Wednesday, March 15, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
misc
Complaint
Wed 03/15 6:10 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants Fee paid: Receipt # 113G-2565099, $400 filed by LIBERTY CORPORATE CAPITAL LTD(KIRK, ANN) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A-Amended Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B-Policy (Redacted), | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C-ROR Letter, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D-Crowbar Ultra Stripper MSDS, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E-McKenzie Deposition Excerpts, | ||
Att: 6 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 7 Summons to Nu Zeta Chapter to Lambda Chi Alpha, | ||
Att: 8 Summons to Rachael B. McKenzie |