Mitchell v. Magruder et al
Georgia Southern District Court | |
Judge: | J Randal Hall |
Referred: | R Stan Baker |
Case #: | 6:17-cv-00040 |
Nature of Suit | 555 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Prison Condition |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Mar 15, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jul 25, 2017 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 7 hours ago |
Tuesday, July 25, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
order
Judgment - Clerk
Tue 07/25 12:21 PM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT. Signed on 07/25/2017. (pts) |
|
8 | 8
order
Order Adopting Report and Recommendations
Tue 07/25 12:10 PM
ORDER ADOPTING6 Report and Recommendations and dismissing as moot2 Motion for TRO filed by Karl C. Mitchell,4 Motion to Certify Class filed by Karl C. Mitchell, and3 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief filed by Karl C. Mitchell. Plaintiff's complaint is dismissed without prejudice. Plaintiff is denied in forma pauperis status on appeal. This case stands closed. Signed by Chief Judge J. Randal Hall on 07/25/2017. (pts) |
|
Monday, June 12, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
notice
notice (Other)
Mon 06/12 11:47 AM
NOTICE by Karl C. Mitchell.(ca) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Envelope | ||
Friday, May 12, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Report and Recommendations Order
Fri 05/12 2:30 PM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of the Magistrate Judge that the Court DISMISS Plaintiff's1 Complaint, without prejudice for failure to prosecute and DIRECT the Clerk of Court to CLOSE this case. It is further RECOMMENDED that the Court DENY Plaintiff leave to appeal in forma pauperis. Any party seeking to object to this Report and Recommendation is ordered to file specific written objections within fourteen (14) days of the date on which this Report and Recommendation is entered. (Objections to R&R due by 5/26/2017). ORDER directing service of the REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of the Magistrate Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Stan Baker on 5/12/2017. (csr) |
|
Wednesday, March 15, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Filing Set/Reset Deadlines
Wed 03/15 3:05 PM
NOTICE of Filing Deficiency re1 Complaint, filing fee was omitted. Set/Reset Deadlines: Compliance due by 4/5/2017. (ca) |
|
4 | 4
motion
Certify Class
Wed 03/15 2:57 PM
MOTION to Certify Class by Karl C. Mitchell.REFERRED to Judge R. Stan Baker.(ca) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope | ||
3 | 3
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Wed 03/15 2:53 PM
MOTION for Prisoner Release Order by Karl C. Mitchell.REFERRED to Judge R. Stan Baker.(ca) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope | ||
2 | 2
motion
Temporary Restraining Order
Wed 03/15 2:52 PM
MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Karl C. Mitchell.REFERRED to Judge R. Stan Baker.(ca) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 03/15 2:50 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Karl C. Mitchell.(ca) |
|
Att: 1 Cover letter, | ||
Att: 2 Envelope |