Prosser v. Caravan Facilities Management, LLC
Indiana Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Theresa L Springmann |
Referred: | Susan L Collins |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-00095 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment) |
Case Filed: | Mar 15, 2017 |
Terminated: | May 21, 2018 |
Last checked: Monday Sep 11, 2017 5:24 AM EDT |
Defendant
Caravan Facilities Management, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
India M. Prosser
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 63 minutes ago |
Monday, May 21, 2018 | ||
34 | 34
motion
Stipulation to Dismiss
Mon 05/21 12:01 PM
STIPULATION to Dismiss by Plaintiff India M. Prosser. (Myers, Christopher) |
|
utility
Dismissal Notice to Parties Pursuant to Rule 41a1
Mon 05/21 1:51 PM
CASE DISMISSED, WITH PREDJUDICE, pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(a)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure re34 Stipulation to Dismiss. (cer) |
||
Monday, April 23, 2018 | ||
33 | 33
respm
Brief in Support
Mon 04/23 11:36 AM
BRIEF in Support of32 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Caravan Facilities Management, LLC.(Preston, Scott) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1-Plaintiff's Deposition, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2-Bridget Foco Declaration, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3-Erika Guzman Declaration | ||
32 | 32
motion
Summary Judgment
Mon 04/23 11:33 AM
MOTION for Summary Judgment by Defendant Caravan Facilities Management, LLC. (Preston, Scott) |
|
Thursday, February 22, 2018 | ||
31 | 31
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines
Thu 02/22 8:35 AM
ORDER FOR CHIEF JUDGE THERESA L SPRINGMANN: Pursuant to the 30 Bright Line Notice, Dispositive motions to be filed by 4/23/2018, and to be briefed in accordance with Local District Rules. In the alternative, parties may jointly request trial date by written notice on or before 3/26/2018.(cer) |
|
Wednesday, February 21, 2018 | ||
30 | 30
notice
Bright Line Notice
Wed 02/21 3:53 PM
NOTICE: Because the discovery period in this case has now concluded and there are no pending non-dispositive motions, the referral to Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins is now terminated. All further matters will now be handled by Chief Judge Theresa L Springmann unless otherwise directed. This entry constitutes the court's order on this matter and shall carry the same weight and authority as a written order signed by the judge. (mr) |
|
Thursday, February 08, 2018 | ||
29 | 29
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 02/08 9:48 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer L Hitchcock on behalf of India M. Prosser (Hitchcock, Jennifer) |
|
Thursday, December 28, 2017 | ||
28 | 28
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
Thu 12/28 11:42 AM
ORDER for Magistrate Judge Susan Collins: The27 Unopposed Motion to Extend the Discovery Deadline is granted. Discovery deadline extended to 2/16/2018. Text entry order. (mr) |
|
Tuesday, December 26, 2017 | ||
27 | 27
motion
Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
Tue 12/26 8:44 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Defendant Caravan Facilities Management, LLC. (Preston, Scott) |
|
Friday, August 25, 2017 | ||
26 | 26
answer
Answer to Amended Complaint
Fri 08/25 9:05 AM
DEFENDANT'S ANSWER to16 Amended Complaint by Caravan Facilities Management, LLC.(Preston, Scott) |
|
Friday, August 11, 2017 | ||
25 | 25
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss
Fri 08/11 10:37 AM
ORDER FOR CHIEF JUDGE THERESA L SPRINGMANN: Pursuant to the23 Stipulation to dismiss claim, the17 Motion to Dismiss is RENDERED MOOT. (jlb) |
|
24 | 24
order
Order on Stipulation to Dismiss
Fri 08/11 10:35 AM
Pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Pla's Americans with Disabilities Act claim of disability by association is DISMISSED, WITH PREJUDICE, pursuant to23 Stipulation to Dismiss ADA by Association Claim Only by Pla India M. Prosser. (jlb) |
|
Thursday, August 10, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
motion
Stipulation to Dismiss
Thu 08/10 1:47 PM
STIPULATION to Dismiss ADA by Association Claim Only by Plaintiff India M. Prosser. (Myers, Christopher) |
|
Monday, July 31, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
3
pgs
order
Opinion and Order ~Util - Terminate Motions
Mon 07/31 2:35 PM
OPINION AND ORDER DISMISSING the Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Dismissal with Prejudice (DE 19) and GRANTS the Plaintiff leave to re-file a notice or stipulation for dismissal pursuant to FRCP 41(a). Signed by Chief Judge Theresa L Springmann on 7/31/17. (ksp) |
|
Monday, July 24, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
service
Summons Returned Executed
Mon 07/24 5:12 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by USM obo India M. Prosser. Caravan Facilities Management, LLC (Highest Ranking Officer) served on 7/19/2017, answer due 8/9/2017. (lns) |
|
Wednesday, July 05, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
service
Summons Returned Executed
Thu 07/06 8:30 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by USMS obo India M. Prosser. Caravan Facilities Management, LLC served on 4/17/2017, answer due 5/8/2017. (lhc) |
|
Thursday, June 29, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
motion
Dismiss
Thu 06/29 12:30 PM
MOTION to Dismiss ADA Association Claim Only by Plaintiff India M. Prosser. (Myers, Christopher) |
|
Tuesday, June 20, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
respm
Memorandum in Support
Tue 06/20 11:31 AM
MEMORANDUM in Support of17 MOTION to Dismiss (Partial) filed by Caravan Facilities Management, LLC.(Preston, Scott) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Copy of screenshot from login page to the Respondent Portal taken on June 19, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
motion
Dismiss
Tue 06/20 11:26 AM
MOTION to Dismiss (Partial) by Defendant Caravan Facilities Management, LLC. (Preston, Scott) |
|
Wednesday, June 07, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
cmp
Amended Complaint
Thu 06/08 8:01 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Caravan Facilities Management, LLC, filed by India M. Prosser.(lhc) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibits A - D | ||
15 | 15
order
Order on Motion to Amend/Correct
Thu 06/08 7:58 AM
ORDER GRANTING14 MOTION to Amend/Correct 1 Complaint, by Plaintiff India M. Prosser. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins on 6/7/2017. (lhc) |
|
14 | 14
motion
Amend/Correct
Wed 06/07 2:41 PM
MOTION to Amend/Correct1 Complaint, by Plaintiff India M. Prosser.(Myers, Christopher) |
|
Att: 1 Amended Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A - Charge of Discrimination, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit B - Amended Charge of Discrimination, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit C - Notice of Rights, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit D - Wage Claim Referral Letter | ||
Tuesday, June 06, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
minutes
Pretrial Conference - Preliminary - customized ddls & hrgs
Tue 06/06 11:17 AM
RULE 16 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held on 6/6/2017 before Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins. Pla appeared by atty Lori Jansen. Atty Melissa Taft appeared telephonically on behalf of Dft. The11 Report of the Parties Planning Meeting is approved in all respects (except dispositive motions deadline and establishment of a trial date) and is hereby made an ORDER of the Court. The Summary Judgment deadline in Fed.R.Civ.P. 56(b) SHALL NOT control. Any dispositive motion SHALL brief out in accordance with L.R. 56-1. DISCOVERY DEADLINE is 1/15/2018. Following the close of discovery, unless otherwise ordered by the Court, the assigned District Judge will establish all further deadlines and dates. Parties are to notify Court when case is ready to proceed with a settlement conference. Magistrate Consent forms due by 6/27/2017. (FTR 1st floor.) (mr) |
|
Thursday, June 01, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Thu 06/01 2:36 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Caravan Facilities Management, LLC. (Preston, Scott) |
|
Tuesday, May 30, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Report of Rule 26f Planning Meeting
Tue 05/30 4:51 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Preston, Scott) |
|
Monday, April 24, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Mag Consent Forms Sent - Standard with pptc - form will be generated
Mon 04/24 11:01 AM
MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties (Standard Track).. (mr) |
|
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Hearing/Deadlines
Mon 04/24 11:00 AM
NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 6/6/2017 11:00 AM in US District Court - Fort Wayne before Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins. Court to initiate call.(mr) |
|
Tuesday, April 18, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 04/18 2:35 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Melissa K Taft on behalf of All Defendants (Taft, Melissa) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Notice - Other
Tue 04/18 2:33 PM
NOTICE by Caravan Facilities Management, LLC OF INITIAL ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT (Preston, Scott) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 04/18 2:31 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Scott James Preston on behalf of All Defendants (Preston, Scott) |
|
Friday, March 24, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Issued
Fri 03/24 3:22 PM
Summons Issued as to Caravan Facilities Management, LLC. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (cc: USMS, summons for each address) (jss) |
|
4 | 4
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Fri 03/24 3:13 PM
ORDER: The Court GRANTS2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; DEFERS payment of the filing fee; ORDERS the Plaintiff to pay the filing fee from the proceeds of any recovery that is received in this case; and DIRECTS the United States Marshals Service effect service of process on the Defendant. Signed by Chief Judge Theresa L Springmann on 3/24/2017. (cc: USMS) (jss) |
|
Wednesday, March 15, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 03/15 10:31 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Lori W Jansen on behalf of India M. Prosser (Jansen, Lori) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Wed 03/15 10:30 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff India M. Prosser. (Myers, Christopher) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 03/15 10:30 AM
COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Caravan Facilities Management, LLC, filed by India M. Prosser.(Myers, Christopher) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Charge, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Amended Charge, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Notice of Rights, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D - Wage Claim Referral, | ||
Att: 5 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 6 Proposed Summons, | ||
Att: 7 Proposed Summons, | ||
Att: 8 Proposed Summons USM285s | ||
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Wed 03/15 11:49 AM
Chief Judge Theresa L Springmann and Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins added. NEW CASE, IFP PENDING. (nal) |