MCKINNEY v. LEAR CORPORATION
Indiana Northern District Court | |
Judge: | John E Martin |
Referred: | John E Martin |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-00115 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Petition for Removal |
Case Filed: | Mar 15, 2017 |
Terminated: | Feb 13, 2018 |
Last checked: Monday Sep 11, 2017 4:40 AM EDT |
Defendant
Lear Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Mediator
Steven A Johnson
250 East 90th Drive
Merrillville, IN 46410 |
|
Plaintiff
Steven McKinney
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 4 hours ago |
Tuesday, February 13, 2018 | ||
30 | 30
1
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Wed 02/14 11:25 AM
ORDER: The Court GRANTS the Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Settlement29 and ACKNOWLEDGES that all claims are DISMISSED with prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 2/13/2018. (lhc) |
|
Monday, February 05, 2018 | ||
29 | 29
motion
Dismiss
Mon 02/05 1:40 PM
First MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Settlement by Defendant Lear Corporation.(Masters, John) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1- Stip to Dismiss | ||
Thursday, January 25, 2018 | ||
28 | 28
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines
Thu 01/25 4:18 PM
ORDER re27 Report filed by Steven A Johnson. Dismissal Papers due by 2/20/2018. Text entry order. By Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 1/25/2018. (smb) |
|
Friday, January 19, 2018 | ||
27 | 27
misc
Report
Fri 01/19 3:11 PM
REPORT by Steven A Johnson REPORT OF MEDIATOR: AGREEMENT . (Johnson, Steven) |
|
Friday, January 05, 2018 | ||
26 | 26
misc
Report
Fri 01/05 11:11 AM
REPORT by Steven A Johnson MEDIATOR'S NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE AND REPORT OF MEDIATOR: SCHEDULING . (Johnson, Steven) |
|
Thursday, November 02, 2017 | ||
25 | 25
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines
Thu 11/02 4:18 PM
AMENDED ORDER: Mediation Status Report due by 3/2/2018. Text entry order. By Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 11/2/2017. (smb) Modified on 11/2/2017 to correct text/regenerate to counsel (smb) |
|
24 | 24
minutes
Telephone Conference
Thu 11/02 4:17 PM
(Amended Minutes) TELEPHONE CONFERENCE held 11/2/2017 before Magistrate Judge John E Martin. Pla appeared by atty Edward Lawhead III. Dft appeared by atty William Weiler. Partie's oral motion for an extension of discovery is granted. Discovery ddl extended to 3/2/2018. Expert Discovery ddl extended to 3/2/2018 Mediation to be completed by 3/2/2018. No dispositive motions anticipated. Telephonic Status Conference set for 2/22/2018 09:30 AM Central before Magistrate Judge John E Martin. The Court will initiate the conference. Any change in contact inform is to be provided to the case manager sue_brown@innd.uscourts.gov within 48 hours in advance of the conference. (#FTR.) (smb) Modified on 11/2/2017 to correct mediation completion ddl/regenerated to counsel(smb) |
|
utility
Set Deadlines/Hearings
Thu 11/02 4:55 PM
Correct Deadlines: Mediation to be completed by 3/2/2018. Mediation Status Report due by 3/2/2018. (smb) |
||
Wednesday, July 19, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
order
Order on Motion for Protective Order
Thu 07/20 9:17 AM
PROTECTIVE ORDER GRANTING22 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 7/19/17. (mlc) |
|
Monday, July 17, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
motion
Protective Order
Mon 07/17 12:06 PM
First MOTION for Protective Order by Defendant Lear Corporation. (Masters, John) |
|
Wednesday, June 21, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
order
Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
Wed 06/21 3:23 PM
ORDER granting19 and20 Motions to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Lia Mariel Gucciardi Bowers and Christopher R Whitten WITHDRAWN from case. Text entry order. By Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 6/21/2017. (smb) |
|
Monday, June 19, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
motion
Withdraw as Attorney
Mon 06/19 3:35 PM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Defendant Lear Corporation. (Gucciardi Bowers, Lia) |
|
19 | 19
motion
Withdraw as Attorney
Mon 06/19 3:33 PM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Defendant Lear Corporation. (Whitten, Christopher) |
|
Wednesday, June 14, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
order
Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney
Thu 06/15 8:21 AM
ORDER DENYING16 MOTION to Substitute Attorney William B. Weiler by Defendant Lear Corporation with leave to refile motions that comply with the Local Rules. The Court ACKNOWLEDGES Attorney Weiler's appearance on the docket, filed separately from the instant Motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 6/14/2017. (lhc) |
|
Monday, June 12, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 06/12 3:53 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by John A Masters on behalf of Lear Corporation (Masters, John) |
|
Friday, June 09, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
motion
Substitute Attorney
Fri 06/09 1:34 PM
MOTION to Substitute Attorney William B. Weiler by Defendant Lear Corporation. (Weiler, William) |
|
15 | 15
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 06/09 1:31 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by William B Weiler on behalf of Lear Corporation (Weiler, William) |
|
Tuesday, May 16, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
order
Order ~Util - Set Hearings
Tue 05/16 4:31 PM
ORDER re13 Notice of Full Consent to Magistrate Judge. Telephonic Status Conference set for 11/2/2017 09:30 AM Central before Magistrate Judge John E Martin for status on discovery and entry of further dates/ddl where appropriate. The Court will initiate the conference. Any change in teleph number is to be provided to the case manager sue_brown@innd.uscourts.gov within 48 hours in advance. Text entry order. By Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 5/16/2017. (smb) |
|
Monday, May 15, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Notice of Full Consent to Magistrate Judge - Standard
Mon 05/15 4:31 PM
NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT OF CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: The parties having consented pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c), this case is referred to Magistrate Judge John E Martin for all purposes and is reassigned pursuant to General Order 2007-10 from Magistrate Judge John E Martin and Judge Joseph S Van Bokkelen to Magistrate Judge John E Martin. (kjp) |
|
Thursday, May 04, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
minutes
Pretrial Conference - Preliminary - customized ddls & hrgs
Fri 05/05 1:40 PM
RULE 16 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held 5/4/2017 before Magistrate Judge John E Martin. Pla appeared by atty Edward Lawhead III. Dft appeared by atty Lia Gucciardi Bowers. All dates/ddl in Joint Report11 through close of discovery are approved and adopted herein. Any motion for leave to amend pleadings to be filed by 7/28/2017. Discovery deadline is 12/22/2017. Expert Discovery deadline is 12/22/2017 Plaintiff expert witness disclosures and reports to be delivered to the defendant by 10/27/2017. Defendant expert witness disclosures and reports to be delivered to the plaintiff by 11/27/2017. Supplemental expert reports due 12/11/2017. Initial Disclosures to be exchanged by 5/25/2017. Parties agree to Steven Johnson as Mediator. Mediation to be completed by close of discovery, 12/22/2017. The summary judgment ddl in FRCP 56 shall not apply. All other dates/ddl to be set by the presiding trial judge upon conclusion of discovery. Magistrate Consent forms ddl extended to 5/25/2017. (#FTR.) (smb) |
|
Thursday, April 27, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Report of Rule 26f Planning Meeting
Thu 04/27 11:00 AM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Gucciardi Bowers, Lia) |
|
Friday, March 24, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 03/24 11:29 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Edward C Lawhead, III on behalf of Steven McKinney (Lawhead, Edward) |
|
Wednesday, March 22, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Mag Consent Forms Sent - Standard with pptc - form will be generated
Wed 03/22 4:06 PM
MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties (Standard Track).. (smb) |
|
8 | 8
order
Order ~Util - Set Hearings
Wed 03/22 4:06 PM
ORDER & NOTICE OF HEARING: Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 5/4/2017 10:45 AM Central in US District Court - Hammond before Magistrate Judge John E Martin. Proposed joint discovery plan in accordance with FRCP 26(f) due 4/28/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 3/22/2017. (smb) |
|
Monday, March 20, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 03/20 11:26 AM
ANSWER to Complaint , Affirmative Defenses and Demand for Trial by Jury by Lear Corporation.(Gucciardi Bowers, Lia) |
|
6 | 6
order
Order
Mon 03/20 11:20 AM
ORDER: Each party and each attorney in this case shall take reasonable steps to preserve electronically stored information (ESI) that is relevant to any claim or defense in this case, whether or not the information is admissible at trial. This requirement relates back to the point in time when the party or attorney reasonably anticipated litigation about these matters. Text entry order. By Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 3/20/2017. (smb) |
|
Thursday, March 16, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Thu 03/16 11:09 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by LEAR CORPORATION. (Gucciardi Bowers, Lia) |
|
Wednesday, March 15, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 03/15 5:18 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher R Whitten on behalf of LEAR CORPORATION (Whitten, Christopher) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 03/15 5:11 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Lia Mariel Gucciardi Bowers on behalf of LEAR CORPORATION (Gucciardi Bowers, Lia) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Wed 03/15 4:52 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Lake Superior Court No. 1, Cause No. 45D01-1701-CT-00022, filed by LEAR CORPORATION.(Gucciardi Bowers, Lia) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Plaintiff's Responses to Defendant's First Request for Admission Directed to Plaintiff, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Complaint, Appearance, Appearance, Motion for Extension of Time, Order on Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time, Initial Case Management Order, | ||
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Thu 03/16 12:20 PM
Judge Joseph S Van Bokkelen and Magistrate Judge John E Martin added. *NEW CASE* (jss) |
||
Tuesday, January 17, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
cmp
State Court Complaint
Thu 03/16 12:21 PM
STATE COURT COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Lear Corporation, filed by Steven McKinney.(jss) |