Britton v. Commissioner of Social Security
Illinois Central District Court | |
Judge: | Sue E Myerscough |
Referred: | Tom Schanzle-Haskins |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-03074 |
Nature of Suit | 864 Social Security - SSID Title XVI |
Cause | 42:206 Social Security Benefits |
Case Filed: | Mar 15, 2017 |
Terminated: | Oct 31, 2017 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 9 hours ago |
Friday, November 03, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Judgment
Mon 11/06 2:17 PM
JUDGMENT entered in Civil Case. (ME, ilcd) |
|
Tuesday, October 31, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Summary Judgment ~Util - Terminate Civil Case
Thu 11/02 2:47 PM
ORDER: This matter is REMANDED to the Acting Commissioner of Social Security for further administrative proceedings pursuant to sentence four of 42 U.S.C. § 405(g), and that judgment shall be entered in favor of Plaintiff. All pending motions are DENIED as MOOT. THIS CASE IS CLOSED. SEE WRITTEN ORDER. Entered by Judge Sue E. Myerscough on 10/31/2017. (SKN, ilcd) |
|
14 | 14
misc
Stipulation
Tue 10/31 9:33 AM
STIPULATION (JOINT) TO REMAND by Commissioner of Social Security.. (Stewart, Lillian) |
|
Monday, October 30, 2017 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer ~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings
Mon 10/30 9:38 AM
TEXT ORDER by U.S. Magistrate Judge Tom Schanzle-Haskins. Defedant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment13 ALLOWED. Extension granted to 11/20/2017. (LB, ilcd) |
||
Friday, October 20, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Fri 10/20 9:15 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re12 Memorandum,11 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Defendant Commissioner of Social Security. Responses due by 11/3/2017(Stewart, Lillian) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration | ||
Tuesday, September 05, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Memorandum
Tue 09/05 3:27 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment re11 MOTION for Summary Judgment by John L Britton. (Linder, Kevin) |
|
11 | 11
motion
Summary Judgment
Tue 09/05 3:26 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment by Plaintiff John L Britton. Motions due by 10/20/2017. (Linder, Kevin) |
|
Thursday, August 31, 2017 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines
Thu 08/31 3:54 PM
TEXT ORDER by U.S. Magistrate Judge Tom Schanzle-Haskins: Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time10 is ALLOWED. Plaintiff is given until 9/5/17 to file his Motion for Summary Judgment and supporting memorandum. Entered by Magistrate Judge Tom Schanzle-Haskins on 08/31/2017. (SKN, ilcd) |
||
Wednesday, August 30, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Extension of Time to File Document
Wed 08/30 4:43 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion for Summary Judgment and Memorandum of Law by Plaintiff John L Britton. Responses due by 9/13/2017 (Linder, Kevin) |
|
Friday, August 25, 2017 | ||
order
Order
Fri 08/25 10:13 AM
TEXT ORDER by U.S. Magistrate Judge Tom Schanzle-Haskins: On 7/17/2017, Defendant Commissioner of Social Security filed an Answer6 and a transcript of the administrative hearing7 . Local Rule 8.1(E), which has been provided to Plaintiff (see notice9 ), requires the Plaintiff within 30 days after the filing of Defendant's answer to file a Motion for Summary Judgment. To date, in violation of the above local rule, Plaintiff has failed to promptly file a motion. Plaintiff directed to file same on or before 8/31/2017, or the case will be subject to dismissal for want of prosecution. (LB, ilcd) |
||
Wednesday, July 19, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Local Rule 8.1E
Wed 07/19 4:01 PM
Local Rule 8.1E regarding Motions for Summary Judgment delivered to counsel by way of e-filing. Motions due by 8/16/2017. (ME, ilcd) |
|
Monday, July 17, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
order
Order
Mon 07/17 3:52 PM
ORDER CONCERNING CONSENT TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE entered by U.S. Magistrate Judge Tom Schanzle-Haskins on 7/17/2017. (Attachment: #(1) Consent Form) (LB, ilcd) |
|
7 | 7
misc
Transcript (Social Security)
Mon 07/17 11:18 AM
SOCIAL SECURITY TRANSCRIPT.(Stewart, Lillian) |
|
Att: 1 Transcript, | ||
Att: 2 Transcript, | ||
Att: 3 Transcript, | ||
Att: 4 Transcript, | ||
Att: 5 Transcript, | ||
Att: 6 Transcript, | ||
Att: 7 Transcript, | ||
Att: 8 Transcript | ||
6 | 6
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 07/17 11:16 AM
ANSWER to1 Complaint by Commissioner of Social Security.(Stewart, Lillian) |
|
Friday, March 31, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
service
Return of Service Executed
Mon 04/03 9:55 AM
Return of Service Executed by John L Britton as to US ATTORNEY GENERAL. (SKN, ilcd) |
|
Monday, March 20, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Proposed Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge
Mon 03/20 3:49 PM
PROPOSED ORDER: CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. (SKN, ilcd) |
|
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued as to USA-IFP GRANTED
Mon 03/20 3:25 PM
Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Commissioner of Social Security served on 3/20/2017, answer due 7/18/2017.(SKN, ilcd) |
|
Att: 1 Complaint | ||
Friday, March 17, 2017 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Mon 03/20 3:19 PM
TEXT ORDER by U.S. Magistrate Judge Tom Schanzle-Haskins:Before the Court is Plaintiff's Request to proceed in Forma Pauperis2 . For good cause shown, motion ALLOWED. Clerk is directed to prepare Summons and Marshal's Form USM 285 for service of Complaint on Defendants by U.S. Marshal's Office. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court is to notify the parties of their option to consent to disposition of this case before a U.S. Magistrate Judge by providing the Plaintiff with a Magistrate Judge consent form and accompanying Court explanation. Entered by Magistrate Judge Tom Schanzle-Haskins on 03/17/2017. (SKN, ilcd) |
||
Wednesday, March 15, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Wed 03/15 3:05 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff John L Britton. Responses due by 3/29/2017 (Linder, Kevin) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Attorney Complaint
Wed 03/15 3:03 PM
COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by John L Britton.(Linder, Kevin) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet |