Hightower v. Kansas, State of et al
Kansas District Court | |
Judge: | Sam A Crow |
Referred: | David J Waxse |
Case #: | 5:17-cv-03044 |
Nature of Suit | 550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Mar 15, 2017 |
Terminated: | Aug 11, 2017 |
Defendant
(fnu) (lnu)
|
|
Defendant
FNU LNU
|
|
Defendant
Kansas, State of
|
|
Defendant
Yolanda Collins
|
|
Plaintiff
Marcqual D. Hightower
|
Docket last updated: 04/23/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Friday, August 11, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
order
Judgment ~Util - Terminate Civil Case
Fri 08/11 12:45 PM
JUDGMENT regarding Memorandum and Order7 dismissing action. ***Terminating Case. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 08/11/17. Mailed to pro se party Marcqual D. Hightower by regular mail. (smnd) |
|
7 | 7
3
pgs
order
Memorandum & Order
Fri 08/11 12:42 PM
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER ENTERED: This action is dismissed for failure to state a claim. Signed by U.S. Senior District Judge Sam A. Crow on 08/11/17. Mailed to pro se party Marcqual D. Hightower by regular mail. (smnd) |
|
Wednesday, August 02, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
respm
Response to Order
Wed 08/02 5:02 PM
RESPONSE by Plaintiff Marcqual D. Hightower re5 Notice and Order to Show Cause. (ms) |
|
Tuesday, July 25, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
order
Show Cause - Prisoner Case
Tue 07/25 9:15 AM
NOTICE AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ENTERED: Plaintiff is granted until August 24, 2017, in which to show good cause, in writing, to the Honorable Sam A. Crow, United States District Judge, why Plaintiff's Complaint1 should not be dismissed. Signed by Magistrate Judge David J. Waxse on 07/25/17. Mailed to pro se party Marcqual D. Hightower by regular mail. (smnd) |
|
Friday, March 24, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Partial Filing Fee Paid
Fri 03/24 3:01 PM
PARTIAL INITIAL PARTIAL FILING FEE PAID on 3/24/2017. Receipt number T4631010656, in the amount of $ 6.25. (ht) |
|
Wednesday, March 15, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (Prisoner Case)
Wed 03/15 2:23 PM
ORDER ENTERED: Plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis2 is granted. The Court assesses an initial partial filing fee of $10.00, calculated under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(b)(1). Plaintiff is granted fourteen (14) days from receipt of this order to submit the fee. Any objection to this order must be filed on or before the date payment is due. The failure to pay the fee as directed may result in the dismissal of this matter without further notice. Plaintiff remains obligated to pay the remainder of the $350.00 filing fee. The agency having custody of plaintiff shall forward payments from plaintiff's account in installments calculated under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(b)(2). The clerk is to transmit a copy of this order to plaintiff, to the finance office at the institution where plaintiff is currently confined, and to the court's finance office. Entered by Magistrate Judge David J. Waxse on 03/15/17. Mailed to pro se party Marcqual D. Hightower by regular mail. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (smnd) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis Prisoner Case
Wed 03/15 1:40 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Marcqual D. Hightower (smnd) |
|
Att: 1 Resident History Report and Transaction Statement; | ||
Att: 2 Envelope | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 03/15 1:39 PM
COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Marcqual D. Hightower (smnd) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope |