Fitch v. Terrebonne Parish Correctional Justice Complex
Louisiana Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Jane Triche Milazzo |
Referred: | Karen Wells Roby |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-02120 |
Nature of Suit | 550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Mar 13, 2017 |
Terminated: | Apr 10, 2018 |
Defendant
Terrebonne Parish Correctional Justice Complex
|
|
Defendant
Terrebonne Parish Criminal Justice Complex
|
|
Defendant
Warden Triche
|
|
Plaintiff
Larry James Fitch
|
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Tuesday, April 10, 2018 | ||
20 | 20
order
Judgment
Tue 04/10 12:39 PM
JUDGMENT entered in favor of Terrebonne Parish Criminal Justice Complex against Larry James Fitch. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 4/10/2018.(sa) |
|
19 | 19
2
pgs
order
Order Adopting Report and Recommendations
Tue 04/10 12:33 PM
ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS, Rec. Doc.12 . IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that Larry James Fitch's § 1983 claims against Terrebonne Parish Criminal Justice Complex are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE as frivolous and otherwise for failure to state a claim for which relief can be granted under 28 U.S.C. § 1915, § 1915A, and 42 U.S.C. § 1997e. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 4/10/2018.(sa) |
|
Thursday, January 25, 2018 | ||
18 | 18
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Thu 01/25 2:42 PM
ORDER denying17 Motion to Recall Report and Recommendation. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo. (ecm) |
|
Monday, January 22, 2018 | ||
17 | 17
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Tue 01/23 4:26 PM
EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Recall Previous Report and Recommendation by Larry James Fitch. (sa) |
|
Thursday, January 11, 2018 | ||
16 | 16
1
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties ~Util - Terminate Motions
Thu 01/11 1:39 PM
ORDER granting15 MOTION to Amend/Correct. Warden Triche added as a defendant. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 1/11/2018.(sa) |
|
Wednesday, January 10, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
motion
Amend/Correct
Wed 01/10 4:14 PM
EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Amend/Correct Original Complaint by Larry James Fitch. (sa) |
|
Monday, June 19, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
notice
Notice of Change of Address
Tue 06/20 12:28 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address. Larry Fitch was transported from Terrebonne Parish Criminal Justice Complex to Franklin Detention Center. (ecm) |
|
Thursday, June 08, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Objection to Report and Recommendations
Fri 06/09 2:35 PM
OBJECTION to12 Report and Recommendations by Larry James Fitch (ecm) |
|
Wednesday, May 31, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
order
Report and Recommendations
Wed 05/31 4:02 PM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS: RECOMMENDED that6 Amended Complaint and4 Complaint filed by Larry James Fitch be DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE as frivolousand otherwise for failure to state a claim for which relief can be granted. Objections to R&R due by 6/14/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby.(cml) |
|
Friday, May 26, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
order
Order Terminate Hearings
Fri 05/26 11:40 AM
ORDER: The Spears Hearing is not required and is CANCELLED. Plaintiff is advised that if he is transferred or released from custody, he must notify theClerk of Court in writing of his new address and telephone number. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby on 5/26/2017.(mmm) |
|
Tuesday, May 23, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice (Other)
Fri 05/26 10:47 AM
NOTICE to the Court by Larry James Fitch re8 Spears Hearing before Magistrate Judge Roby. (ecm) |
|
Thursday, April 27, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
discov
Return of Service (Non Summons & Complaint)
Tue 05/02 2:57 PM
Return of Service of Order (Doc. 8) served on Terrebonne Parish Criminal Justice Complex. (cg) |
|
Thursday, April 20, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
order
Order Set Hearings
Thu 04/20 3:36 PM
ORDER: Spears Hearing by telephone set for 5/18/2017 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby on 4/19/2017.(cc: Warden)(tm) |
|
Wednesday, April 12, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
order
Pauper Order Directing Prisoner Payment
Wed 04/12 4:02 PM
PAUPER ORDER Granting Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis with a partial payment of $9.70 and directing the remainder of filing fee be made from Prisoner Account as to Larry James Fitch in monthly payments as set out in document. FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk is directed to WITHHOLD issuance of summons until further order of the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (cc: Warden)(cml) |
|
Thursday, April 06, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
cmp
Amended Complaint
Fri 04/07 11:33 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Terrebonne Parish Criminal Justice Complex filed by Larry James Fitch.(my) |
|
5 | 5
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Fri 04/07 11:31 AM
EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Larry James Fitch. Motion(s) referred to Karen Wells Roby.(my) |
|
Att: 1 Original Deficient Motion for IFP | ||
4 | 4
cmp
Complaint
Fri 04/07 11:30 AM
COMPLAINT against Terrebonne Parish Correctional Justice Complex filed by Larry James Fitch.(my) |
|
Att: 1 Original Deficient Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
Wednesday, March 15, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
misc
1 - Notice of Deficient Filing
Wed 03/15 2:20 PM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENT ProSe COMPLAINT: re2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis,1 Complaint. Please see attached letter for steps needed to remedy deficiency. Deficiency remedy due by 4/5/2017. (mmv) |
|
Monday, March 13, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Wed 03/15 2:18 PM
**DEFICIENT** EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Larry James Fitch. Motion(s) referred to Karen Wells Roby. (mmv) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 03/15 2:17 PM
**DEFICIENT** COMPLAINT against Terrebonne Parish Correctional Justice Complex filed by Larry James Fitch.(mmv) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |