Copeland v. Edwards et al
Louisiana Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Lance M Africk |
Referred: | Joseph C Wilkinson, Jr |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-02122 |
Nature of Suit | 550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Mar 13, 2017 |
Terminated: | May 18, 2017 |
Defendant
Daniel Edwards
|
|
Defendant
Dennis Wheat
|
|
Plaintiff
Willie Copeland
|
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Thursday, May 18, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
order
Judgment
Thu 05/18 2:24 PM
JUDGMENT: IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that there be judgment in favor of defendants, Daniel Edwards and Dennis Wheat, and against plaintiff, Willie Copeland, dismissing plaintiff's Section 1983 claims without prejudice as legally frivolous and/or for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted under 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2). Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 5/17/2017.(mmv) |
|
8 | 8
order
Order Adopting Report and Recommendations
Thu 05/18 2:19 PM
ORDER ADOPTING6 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS: IT IS ORDERED that plaintiff's Section 1983 claims are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE, either as legally frivolous and/or for failure to state a claim on which relief may be granted under 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2). Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 5/17/2017.(mmv) |
|
Monday, May 15, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Objection to Report and Recommendations
Tue 05/16 10:20 AM
OBJECTION to6 Report and Recommendations by Willie Copeland (mmv) |
|
Friday, April 28, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
order
Report and Recommendations
Fri 04/28 1:50 PM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re3 Complaint filed by Willie Copeland. IT IS RECOMMENDED that plaintiff's complaint asserting claims pursuant to 42 U.S.C. 1983 arising from the failure of defendants to transport him to pay final respects to his mother be DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE as legally frivolous and/or for failure to state a claim on which relief may be granted under 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2), to whatever extent, if any, that he asserts these claims against any of the named defendants. A party's failure to file written objections to the proposed findings, conclusions, and recommendation in a magistrate judge's report and recommendation within fourteen (14) days after being served with a copy shall bar that party, except upon grounds of plain error, from attacking on appeal the unobjected-to proposed factual findings and legal conclusions accepted by the district court, provided that the party has been served with notice that such consequences will result from a failure to object. Objections to R&R due by 5/12/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 4/28/2017.(mmv) |
|
Thursday, March 30, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
order
Pauper Order Directing Prisoner Payment
Thu 03/30 3:51 PM
PAUPER ORDER Granting Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis with a partial payment of $24.05 and directing the remainder of filing fee be made from Prisoner Account as to Willie Copeland in monthly payments as set out in document. The Clerk is directed to withhold issuance of summons until further order of the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 3/30/2017.(my)(NEF: Financial, CC:Warden) |
|
Tuesday, March 28, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Wed 03/29 11:07 AM
EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Willie Copeland. Motion(s) referred to Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (bwn) |
|
3 | 3
cmp
Complaint
Wed 03/29 11:06 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Willie Copeland.(bwn) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
Wednesday, March 15, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
misc
1 - Notice of Deficient Filing
Wed 03/15 1:05 PM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENT ProSe COMPLAINT: re1 Complaint. Please see attached letter for steps needed to remedy deficiency. Deficiency remedy due by 4/5/2017. (bwn) |
|
Att: 1 Application to Proceed IFP | ||
Monday, March 13, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 03/15 1:04 PM
***DEFICIENT*** COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Willie Copeland.(bwn) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |