Tyus v. Janssen Research & Development LLC et al
Louisiana Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Eldon E Fallon |
Referred: | Michael North |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-02137 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Mar 15, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jul 10, 2020 |
Last checked: Monday Sep 11, 2017 4:26 AM CDT |
Defendant
Bayer AG
|
|
Defendant
Bayer Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Bayer Healthcare LLC
|
|
Defendant
Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Bayer Pharma AG
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Ortho LLC
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Research & Development LLC
|
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson Company
|
|
Defendant
Bayer HealthCare AG
|
|
Plaintiff
Ella Tyus
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 8 hours ago |
Friday, July 10, 2020 | ||
5 | 5
1
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Fri 07/10 4:48 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE with Prejudice- originally filed as rec. doc. 17741 in master case 14-md-2592. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 6/30/2020.(dw) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Tuesday, March 21, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
order
Order ~Util - Create Case Association
Tue 03/21 10:55 AM
PRETRIAL ORDERS #1 - #31. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon.(ADI) |
|
Wednesday, March 15, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Wed 03/15 10:52 AM
Summons Issued as to Bayer AG, Bayer Corporation, Bayer Healthcare AG, Bayer Healthcare LLC, Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals Inc., Bayer Pharma AG, Janssen Ortho LLC, Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Janssen Research & Development LLC, Johnson & Johnson Company.(tm) |
|
Att: 1 Summons, | ||
Att: 2 Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Summons, | ||
Att: 4 Summons, | ||
Att: 5 Summons, | ||
Att: 6 Summons, | ||
Att: 7 Summons, | ||
Att: 8 Summons, | ||
Att: 9 Summons | ||
2 | 2
misc
Initial Case Assignment
Wed 03/15 8:43 AM
Initial Case Assignment to Judge Eldon E. Fallon and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (gk) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 03/15 8:37 AM
COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-6024823) filed by Ella Tyus.Attorney Brian J. Perkins added to party Ella Tyus(pty:pla).(Perkins, Brian) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Summons, | ||
Att: 4 Summons, | ||
Att: 5 Summons, | ||
Att: 6 Summons, | ||
Att: 7 Summons, | ||
Att: 8 Summons, | ||
Att: 9 Summons, | ||
Att: 10 Summons, | ||
Att: 11 Summons |