May v. Janssen Research & Development LLC et al
Louisiana Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Eldon E Fallon |
Referred: | Michael North |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-02141 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Mar 15, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jul 16, 2020 |
Last checked: Monday Sep 11, 2017 4:40 AM CDT |
Defendant
Bayer AG
|
|
Defendant
Bayer Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Bayer Healthcare LLC
|
|
Defendant
Bayer Pharma AG
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Ortho LLC
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Research & Development LLC
|
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson Company
|
|
Defendant
Bayer HealthCare AG
|
|
Defendant
Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
James T May
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 7 hours ago |
Thursday, July 16, 2020 | ||
11 | 11
1
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Thu 07/16 2:24 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE originally filed in Master Case 14-md-2592 as rec doc 17741. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 6/30/2020.(jeg) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Thursday, March 30, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
service
Summons Issued
Thu 03/30 2:20 PM
Summons Issued as to Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (am) |
|
9 | 9
service
Request for Summons Issued
Thu 03/30 10:49 AM
Request of Summons Issued as to Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc. filed by All Plaintiffs re1 Complaint,. (Mathews, David) |
|
Wednesday, March 22, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
service
Summons Issued
Wed 03/22 11:59 AM
Summons Issued as to Janssen Ortho LLC. (Dellucci, kristen) |
|
7 | 7
service
Request for Summons Issued
Wed 03/22 9:27 AM
Request of Summons Issued as to Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc. filed by All Plaintiffs re1 Complaint,. (Mathews, David) |
|
Tuesday, March 21, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
order
Order ~Util - Create Case Association
Tue 03/21 10:56 AM
PRETRIAL ORDERS #1 - #31. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon.(ADI) |
|
Monday, March 20, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Issued
Mon 03/20 2:49 PM
Summons Issued as to Janssen Ortho LLC. (am) |
|
4 | 4
service
Request for Summons Issued
Mon 03/20 9:28 AM
Request of Summons Issued as to Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc. filed by All Plaintiffs re1 Complaint,. (Mathews, David) |
|
Wednesday, March 15, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Wed 03/15 2:52 PM
Summons Issued as to Bayer Healthcare Pharamaceuticals, Inc., Bayer Pharma AG, Janssen Ortho LLC, Janssen Research & Development LLC, Johnson & Johnson Company. (am) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Initial Case Assignment
Wed 03/15 10:34 AM
Initial Case Assignment to Judge Eldon E. Fallon and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (gk) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 03/15 10:31 AM
COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-6025341) filed by James T May.Attorney David Todd Mathews added to party James T May(pty:pla).(Mathews, David) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Summons, | ||
Att: 4 Summons, | ||
Att: 5 Summons, | ||
Att: 6 Summons, | ||
Att: 7 Summons |