Legendre, et al v. Huntington Ingalls Incorporated, et al
Louisiana Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Lance M Africk |
Referred: | Janis Van Meerveld |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-02162 |
Nature of Suit | 368 Torts - Personal Injury - Asbestos Personal Injury Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1446 Petition for Removal- Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Mar 15, 2017 |
Terminated: | Apr 25, 2017 |
Last checked: Monday Sep 11, 2017 4:33 AM CDT |
Defendant
Eagle Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Huntington Ingalls Incorporated
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Louisiana Insurance Guaranty Association
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Puget Sound Commerce Center, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Uniroyal, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Entergy Louisiana, L.L.C.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Stephen R Legendre
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Paul L. Legendre
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Percy J. Legendre, Jr.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ragus J. Legendre
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 12 minutes ago |
Friday, April 13, 2018 | ||
35 | 35
appeal
USCA Judgment
Fri 04/13 11:51 AM
USCA JUDGMENT issued as mandate on 4/9/2018 as to24 Notice of Appeal filed by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated. USCA judge name: Higginbotham, Prado, and Higginson. Ordered and adjudged that the judgment of the District Court is affirmed. Further Ordered that the defendant-appellant pay to plaintiffs-appellees the costs on appeal to be taxed by the Clerk of Court. (blg) |
|
Monday, April 02, 2018 | ||
34 | 34
appeal
USCA Order - Other
Mon 04/02 12:17 PM
ORDER of USCA as to24 Notice of Appeal filed by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated. ORDERED that appellant's opposed motion to expedite the appeal is DENIED AS MOOT. USCA Judge Name: Stephen A. Higginson. (blg) |
|
Tuesday, July 11, 2017 | ||
33 | 33
appeal
USCA Order - Other
Tue 07/11 4:28 PM
ORDER of USCA as to24 Notice of Appeal filed by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated. IT IS ORDERED that the Appellees' unopposed motion to view and obtain sealed documents is GRANTED. Signed by USCA Judge E. Grady Jolly (bwn) |
|
Thursday, July 06, 2017 | ||
32 | 32
order
Order on Motion to Stay
Thu 07/06 11:59 AM
ORDER denying30 Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 7/6/2017. (blg) |
|
Monday, July 03, 2017 | ||
31 | 31
respm
Response/Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
Mon 07/03 1:55 PM
RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Paul L. Legendre, Percy J. Legendre, Jr, Ragus J. Legendre, Stephen R Legendre re30 MOTION to Stay re23 Order on Motion to Remand to State Court Avondale's Motion to Stay Remand Order Pending Appeal .(Clement, Jonathan) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 | ||
Wednesday, June 21, 2017 | ||
30 | 30
motion
Stay
Wed 06/21 3:24 PM
MOTION to Stay re23 Order on Motion to Remand to State Court Avondale's Motion to Stay Remand Order Pending Appeal by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated. Motion(s) will be submitted on 7/12/2017.(Powell, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 3 Notice of Submission, | ||
Att: 4 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, June 06, 2017 | ||
29 | 29
appeal
USCA Order - Other
Wed 06/07 8:53 AM
ORDER of USCA - IT IS ORDERED that the Appellant's unopposed motion to view and obtain sealed documents is GRANTED. USCA Judge E. Grady Jolly. (bwn) |
|
Friday, June 02, 2017 | ||
28 | 28
appeal
Electronic Record on Appeal Access Granted
Fri 06/02 10:11 AM
Electronic Record on Appeal Access Granted to John Futrell, Michael Kevin Powell re24 Notice of Appeal. USCA Case Number 17-30371 Instructions for access are posted on http://www.ca5.uscourts.gov/docs/default-source/forms/instructions-for-electronic-record-download-feature-of-cm.pdf (adp) |
|
Monday, May 22, 2017 | ||
27 | 27
appeal
Electronic Record on Appeal Access Granted
Mon 05/22 11:17 AM
Electronic Record on Appeal Access Granted to Gary Allen Lee, Gerolyn Petit Roussel, Jonathan Brett Clement re24 Notice of Appeal. USCA Case Number 17-30371 Instructions for access are posted on http://www.ca5.uscourts.gov/docs/default-source/forms/instructions-for-electronic-record-download-feature-of-cm.pdf (adp) |
|
Tuesday, May 16, 2017 | ||
26 | 26
appeal
USCA Case Number
Wed 05/17 4:44 PM
USCA Case Number 17-30371 appealed to USCA 5th Circuit for24 Notice of Appeal filed by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated. (bwn) |
|
Friday, May 05, 2017 | ||
25 | 25
appeal
Appeal Transcript Request
Fri 05/05 12:20 PM
APPEAL TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated re24 Notice of Appeal. (No hearings) (Powell, Michael) |
|
Tuesday, May 02, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
appeal
Notice of Appeal
Tue 05/02 4:53 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated as to23 Order on Motion to Remand to State Court. (Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 053L-6119305.) (Powell, Michael) |
|
Tuesday, April 25, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
order
Order on Motion to Remand to State Court
Tue 04/25 2:47 PM
ORDER AND REASONS granting5 Motion to Remand to State Court; This case is REMANDED to the Civil District Court for the Parish of Orleans. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 4/25/2017. (blg) |
|
Att: 1 Remand Letter | ||
Monday, April 24, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
motion
Protective Order
Mon 04/24 3:21 PM
EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Protective Order by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated. Motion(s) referred to Janis van Meerveld.(Powell, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order Consent Protective Order | ||
Thursday, April 20, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
motion
Appear as Counsel of Record
Thu 04/20 2:20 PM
EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear as Counsel of Record by Louisiana Insurance Guaranty Association.Attorney Dawn Danna Marullo added to party Louisiana Insurance Guaranty Association(pty:dft).(Marullo, Dawn) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, April 12, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Wed 04/12 4:11 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion filed by All Plaintiffs re5 MOTION to Remand to State Court .(blg) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 19, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 20, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 21, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 22, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 23, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit 24, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit 25 | ||
19 | 19
order
Order on Motion for Leave to File
Wed 04/12 4:09 PM
ORDER granting14 Motion for Leave to File Reply. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 4/12/2017. (blg) |
|
Monday, April 10, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
minutes
Status Conference
Mon 04/10 1:35 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lance M Africk: Status Conference held on 4/10/2017. (blg) |
|
Thursday, April 06, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
order
Order on Motion to Seal
Thu 04/06 3:17 PM
ORDER granting9 Motion to Seal. Exhibits C, D, E, and F in support of Huntington's opposition to the motion to remand be and hereby are SEALED. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 4/4/2017. (bwn) |
|
16 | 16
misc
Statement of Corporate Disclosure
Thu 04/06 9:31 AM
Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Entergy Louisiana, L.L.C. (Cahn, Cory) |
|
Wednesday, April 05, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
order
Order Set Hearings
Wed 04/05 4:47 PM
ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that a telephonic status conference is set in this matter for 7:45 AM on April 10, 2017. The parties should be prepared to discuss the anticipated third-party defendants in this matter. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk.(bwn) |
|
14 | 14
motion
Leave to File Document
Wed 04/05 9:59 AM
EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum by Paul L. Legendre, Percy J. Legendre, Jr, Ragus J. Legendre, Stephen R Legendre.(Clement, Jonathan) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 3 Proposed Pleading, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 19, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 20, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit 21, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit 22, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit 23, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit 24, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit 25 | ||
Monday, April 03, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Manual Attachment Received
Tue 04/04 12:42 PM
Manual Attachment Received re9 MOTION to Seal filed by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated. (bwn) |
|
Thursday, March 30, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Statement of Corporate Disclosure
Thu 03/30 12:19 PM
Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated (Powell, Michael) |
|
Wednesday, March 29, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Notice of Compliance
Wed 03/29 4:55 PM
Notice of Compliance by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated re3 Order.(Powell, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit | ||
10 | 10
misc
Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk
Wed 03/29 10:54 AM
Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re9 MOTION to Seal - Filing attorney should have selected 'Yes' at the question 'Is this an Exparte/Consent Motion Y/N?'. Exparte/Consent motions are not set for submission. Clerk has removed submission date. (bwn) |
|
Tuesday, March 28, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Seal
Tue 03/28 3:58 PM
MOTION to Seal by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated. Motion(s) will be submitted on 4/19/2017.(Powell, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support, | ||
Att: 2 Notice of Motion to Seal Exhibits, | ||
Att: 3 Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 4 Notice of Submission | ||
8 | 8
respm
Response/Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
Tue 03/28 3:07 PM
RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated re5 MOTION to Remand to State Court .(Powell, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit | ||
Friday, March 17, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Statement of Corporate Disclosure
Fri 03/17 11:30 AM
Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Uniroyal, Inc. (Trotter, Katherine) |
|
6 | 6
answer
Answer to Complaint - Notice of Removal
Fri 03/17 11:28 AM
ANSWER to1 Notice of Removal, by Uniroyal, Inc..Attorney Katherine Weatherly Emma Trotter added to party Uniroyal, Inc.(pty:dft).(Trotter, Katherine) |
|
Thursday, March 16, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Remand to State Court
Thu 03/16 1:58 PM
MOTION to Remand to State Court by Paul L. Legendre, Percy J. Legendre, Jr, Ragus J. Legendre, Stephen R Legendre. Motion(s) will be submitted on 4/5/2017.(Clement, Jonathan) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 3 Notice of Submission, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit 3, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit 4, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit 5, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit 6, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit 7, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit 8, | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit 9, | ||
Att: 13 Exhibit 10, | ||
Att: 14 Exhibit 11, | ||
Att: 15 Exhibit 12, | ||
Att: 16 Exhibit 13, | ||
Att: 17 Exhibit 14, | ||
Att: 18 Exhibit 15, | ||
Att: 19 Exhibit 16, | ||
Att: 20 Exhibit 17, | ||
Att: 21 Exhibit 18 | ||
4 | 4
order
Order Reassigning Case
Thu 03/16 1:02 PM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Lance M Africk. Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 3/16/2017.(mmv) (NEF: Case Mgr., J. Africk) |
|
3 | 3
order
Order
Thu 03/16 12:55 PM
Notice of Directives pursuant to 28:1447(b) by Clerk.(mmv) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Initial Case Assignment
Thu 03/16 9:16 AM
Initial Case Assignment to Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown and Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld. (djg) |
|
Wednesday, March 15, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Wed 03/15 3:19 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Civil District Court, Parish of Orleans, case number 2017-1269 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-6026716) filed by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated.Attorney Michael Kevin Powell added to party Huntington Ingalls Incorporated(pty:dft).(Powell, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 3 Summons, | ||
Att: 4 State Court Pleadings, | ||
Att: 5 State Court Pleadings, | ||
Att: 6 State Court Pleadings |