Lyle et al v. Satellite Shelters, Inc.
Louisiana Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Greg Gerard Guidry |
Referred: | Dana Douglas |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-02169 |
Nature of Suit | 110 Contract - Insurance |
Cause | 28:1446 Breach of Contract- Insurance |
Case Filed: | Mar 15, 2017 |
Re-opened: | Mar 11, 2019 |
Terminated: | Mar 12, 2020 |
Last checked: Monday Sep 11, 2017 4:40 AM CDT |
Defendant
Satellite Shelters, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Angela Douglas Lyle
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Charles Lyle
|
Represented By
|
Third Party Defendant
Brock Services, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Third Party Plaintiff
Satellite Shelters, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 10 hours ago |
Friday, May 15, 2020 | ||
126 | 126
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss Case
Fri 05/15 11:02 AM
ORDER granting124 Motion to Dismiss Case with prejudice. Signed by Judge Greg Gerard Guidry on 05/15/2020. (ko) |
|
Wednesday, May 13, 2020 | ||
125 | 125
misc
Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk
Wed 05/13 4:08 PM
Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re124 MOTION to Dismiss. **Filing attorney did not enter additional filer(s) in the blank text box on the docket text screen. Clerk added filer(s).** (mm) |
|
124 | 124
motion
Dismiss Case
Wed 05/13 3:24 PM
EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Dismiss by All Parties.(Darling, Thomas) Modified filers on 5/13/2020 (mm) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order |