Chad Crouchet v. Douglas Anderson et al
Louisiana Western District Court | |
Judge: | James T Trimble, Jr |
Referred: | Joseph H L Perez-Montes |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-00402 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Mar 15, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jun 18, 2018 |
Last checked: Monday Sep 11, 2017 3:44 AM CDT |
Defendant
Douglas Anderson
In His Official Capacity as Sheriff of Avoyelles Parish Sheriffs Office 375 Government St
Marksville, LA 71351 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Lieutenant Lofton
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Chad Crouchet
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 1 hours ago |
Monday, July 23, 2018 | ||
24 | 24
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss/Joint or Voluntary
Mon 07/23 5:11 PM
JUDGMENT granting23 Joint/Voluntary Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge James T Trimble, Jr on 7/19/2018. (crt,Dauterive, C) |
|
Tuesday, July 17, 2018 | ||
23 | 23
motion
Dismiss/Joint or Voluntary
Tue 07/17 7:42 AM
JOINT/VOLUNTARY MOTION to Dismiss by Douglas Anderson, Lofton and Chad Crouchet.(aty,Calvit, H) Modified on 7/17/2018 to add filer (Dauterive, C) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed order | ||
Monday, June 18, 2018 | ||
22 | 22
order
Judgment - Dismissal (30,60,90 day)
Mon 06/18 4:08 PM
60 DAY JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL, to reopen the action if settlement is not consummated. FURTHER ORDERED the parties be directed to file an appropriate judgment of dismissal as soon as the settlement documents are executed. FURTHER ORDERED that the jury trial set for 8/6/2018 be removed from the trial docket. Signed by Judge James T Trimble, Jr on 6/18/2018.(crt,Bunting, M) |
|
Att: 1 Letter | ||
Tuesday, May 22, 2018 | ||
21 | 21
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension (Other)
Tue 05/22 1:52 PM
ORDER granting20 Motion for Extension. Dispositive Motions deadline reset to 6/8/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 5/22/2018. (crt,Roaix, G) |
|
20 | 20
motion
Extension (Other)
Tue 05/22 8:42 AM
Joint MOTION FOR EXTENSION of Time to File Dispositive Motions with consent by Douglas Anderson, Lofton and Chad Crouchet. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes.(aty,Calvit, H) Modified on 5/22/2018 to edit text and add filer (Dauterive, C) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed order | ||
Tuesday, April 10, 2018 | ||
19 | 19
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Take Deposition
Tue 04/10 5:24 PM
ORDER granting18 Motion to Take Deposition from Chad Crouchet Friday, April 20, 2018 at 2:30 p.m. at the Elayn Hunt Correctional Center. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 4/10/2018. (crt,Dauterive, C) |
|
18 | 18
motion
Take Deposition
Tue 04/10 8:27 AM
MOTION to Take Deposition from Chad Crouchet by Douglas Anderson, Lofton. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes.(aty,Calvit, H) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed order | ||
Friday, April 06, 2018 | ||
17 | 17
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension (Other)
Fri 04/06 3:18 PM
ORDER granting16 Motion for Extension. Discovery deadline 5/8/2018. Dispositive Motions due by 5/23/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 4/6/2018. (crt,Tice, Y) |
|
Thursday, April 05, 2018 | ||
16 | 16
motion
Extension (Other)
Thu 04/05 11:09 AM
MOTION FOR EXTENSION of Time for Discovery and Dispositive Motions Deadline with consent by Chad Crouchet, Douglas Anderson, Lofton. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes.(aty,Calvit, H) Modified on 4/5/2018 to add filer (Williams, L) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed order | ||
Tuesday, August 08, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
minutes
Telephone Conference ~Util - Set Hearings
Wed 08/16 4:12 PM
MINUTES for proceedings held before Judge James T Trimble, Jr: TELEPHONE CONFERENCE held on 8/8/2017. A three day Jury Trial is set as a second setting for 8/6/2018 at 09:30 AM in Alexandria, 2nd floor before Judge James T Trimble Jr. (crt,Bunting, M) |
|
Wednesday, July 19, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
order
Order ~Util - Set Hearings
Wed 07/19 2:01 PM
SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER A Scheduling Conference is set for 8/8/2017 11:30 AM by phone before Judge James T Trimble Jr. Counsel for the plaintiff is responsible for initiating the conference call. (crt,Roaix, G) |
|
Thursday, July 06, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
order
Order on Motion to Set Aside Default
Thu 07/06 4:22 PM
ORDER granting11 Motion to Set Aside Default. Signed by Judge James T Trimble, Jr on 7/6/2017. (crt,Crick, S) |
|
Thursday, June 22, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
answer
Answer to Complaint
Thu 06/22 9:02 AM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, by Lofton.(Attorney H Bradford Calvit added to party Lofton(pty:dft))(aty,Calvit, H) |
|
Thursday, June 15, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Set Aside Default
Thu 06/15 3:14 PM
MOTION to Set Aside Default by Douglas Anderson.(aty,Calvit, H) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support of Motion, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed order, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit | ||
Thursday, June 08, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Deficiency
Thu 06/08 11:20 AM
NOTICE of Deficiency to H Bradford Calvit on behalf of Douglas Anderson regarding9 Answer to Complaint. Reason: The document was filed on behalf of a party against whom default has been entered. The only pleading permissible from a party in default is a motion to set aside the default. (crt,FinnSld, P) |
|
9 | 9
answer
Answer to Complaint
Thu 06/08 10:37 AM
DEFICIENT?? ANSWER to1 Complaint, by Douglas Anderson.(Attorney H Bradford Calvit added to party Douglas Anderson(pty:dft))(aty,Calvit, H) Modified on 6/8/2017 to indicate deficiency (FinnSld, P) |
|
8 | 8
service
Summons Returned Executed
Thu 06/08 7:46 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Chad Crouchet. Lofton served on 6/1/2017, answer due 6/22/2017. (aty,Venezia, John) |
|
Thursday, May 18, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons Issued - All (Form Included)
Thu 05/18 1:21 PM
SUMMONS REISSUED as to Lofton (crt,FinnSld, P) Modified on 5/18/2017 to indicate reissued (FinnSld, P) |
|
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Thu 05/18 11:42 AM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Lofton, requested by Chad Crouchet. (aty,Venezia, John) |
||
Wednesday, May 10, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
order
Clerks Entry of Default (Form Included)
Wed 05/10 4:17 PM
CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Douglas Anderson (crt,Putch, A) |
|
5 | 5
motion
Entry of Default
Wed 05/10 2:54 PM
MOTION/REQUEST for Entry of Default as to Douglas Anderson by Chad Crouchet. Motions referred to Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (aty,Venezia, John) |
|
Friday, March 31, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Returned Executed
Fri 03/31 11:48 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Chad Crouchet. Lofton served on 3/28/2017, answer due 4/18/2017. (aty,Venezia, John) |
|
3 | 3
service
Summons Returned Executed
Fri 03/31 11:47 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Chad Crouchet. Douglas Anderson served on 3/28/2017, answer due 4/18/2017. (aty,Venezia, John) |
|
Thursday, March 16, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued - All (Form Included)
Thu 03/16 2:31 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to Douglas Anderson, Lofton (crt,FinnSld, P) |
|
Wednesday, March 15, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 03/15 3:45 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0536-3315821) filed by Chad Crouchet.(Attorney John Armand Venezia added to party Chad Crouchet(pty:pla))(aty,Venezia, John) |
|
Att: 1 Civil cover sheet | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Thu 03/16 2:27 PM
CASE Assigned to Judge James T Trimble, Jr and Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (crt,FinnSld, P) |