Ricks v. Johnwell et al
Louisiana Western District Court | |
Judge: | Robert G James |
Referred: | Karen L Hayes |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-00400 |
Nature of Suit | 550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Mar 15, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jul 18, 2017 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 04/18/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Wednesday, July 26, 2017 | ||
utility
ADI Receipt Entry
Wed 07/26 9:11 AM
Confirmation of receipt of payment from WESLEY RICKS in the amount of $2.50. Transaction posted on 7/20/2017. Receipt number 0536-3417345 processed by Finance Import. (crt,Adams ADI, K) |
||
Tuesday, July 18, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
order
Judgment Adopting Report and Recommendations
Tue 07/18 4:38 PM
JUDGMENT ADOPTING9 Report and Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge. IT IS ORDERED that1 Complaint be DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE as frivolous. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's motion for evidentiary hearing, contained in10 Objections is DENIED. Signed by Judge Robert G James on 7/18/2017. (crt,Crawford, A) |
|
Wednesday, June 21, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
respoth
Objection to Report and Recommendations
Thu 06/22 9:09 AM
OBJECTION to9 Report and Recommendations by Wesley S Ricks. Response to Objection to R&R due by 7/5/2017.(crt,Williams, L) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibits A - C, | ||
Att: 2 Envelope | ||
Monday, June 12, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Report and Recommendations
Mon 06/12 3:06 PM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re1 and5 Complaints filed by Wesley S Ricks. IT IS RECOMMENDED that plaintiff's complaints be DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE as frivolous, failing to state a claim on which relief may be granted and for seeking money damages against Defendants who are immune from suit. Objections to R&R due by 6/26/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 6/12/2017. (crt,Leday, A) |
|
Tuesday, April 04, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Tue 04/04 1:47 PM
ORDER granting6 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Initial Partial Filing Fee due in the amount of $2.50. It is further ordered that plaintiff make payments of 20 percent of income for preceding month until $350.00 has been paid in full. Clerk manually noticed Prison Accounts Officer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 4/4/2017. (crt,Haik, K) |
|
7 | 7
misc
Proposed Order (Court User Only/Public Entry No NEF)
Tue 04/04 9:10 AM
PROPOSED ORDER re6 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis referred to Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Haik, K) |
|
Friday, March 31, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Tue 04/04 9:03 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Wesley S Ricks. Motions referred to Karen L Hayes.(crt,Haik, K) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope | ||
5 | 5
cmp
Complaint
Tue 04/04 9:02 AM
COMPLAINT against Eddie Bayless, Twhyler N Coutee, Marvin Holmes, Sydney A Johnwell, William Hayman filed by Wesley S Ricks.(crt,Haik, K) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope | ||
Monday, March 20, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
order
Sec P - Deficiency Order
Mon 03/20 2:44 PM
MEMORANDUM ORDER: Plaintiff failed to submit documents on approved forms. Plaintiff failed to submit filing fee or a completed IFP application. Pro Se Deadline to comply with deficiency set for 4/19/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 3/20/2017.(crt,Haik, K) |
|
Att: 1 1983 form, | ||
Att: 2 IFP form | ||
Friday, March 17, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Corrective Document
Mon 03/20 2:41 PM
CORRECTIVE DOCUMENT entitled Accounts Officer page filed by Wesley S Ricks.(crt,Haik, K) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Envelope | ||
2 | 2
misc
Proposed Order (Court User Only/Public Entry No NEF)
Fri 03/17 1:21 PM
PROPOSED MEMORANDUM ORDER re1 Complaint, referred to Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Putch, A) |
|
Wednesday, March 15, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 03/15 3:59 PM
COMPLAINT against Eddie Bayless, Twhyler N Coutee, Marvin Holmes, Sydney A Johnwell with Jury Demand filed by Wesley S Ricks.(crt,Keller, J) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibits, | ||
Att: 2 Civil cover sheet, | ||
Att: 3 Envelope | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Fri 03/17 1:18 PM
CASE Assigned to Judge Robert G James and Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes. (crt,Putch, A) |