Smith v. Social Security Administration
Louisiana Western District Court | |
Judge: | Terry A Doughty |
Referred: | Karen L Hayes |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-00401 |
Nature of Suit | 863 Social Security - DIWC/DIWW (405(g)) |
Cause | 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID) |
Case Filed: | Mar 15, 2017 |
Terminated: | Aug 03, 2018 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 8 hours ago |
Friday, August 03, 2018 | ||
19 | 19
order
Judgment re Report and Recommendations Order on Report and Recommendations
Fri 08/03 11:16 AM
JUDGMENT adopting18 Report and Recommendations of the Magistrate Judge. IT IS ORDERED that the Commissioner's decision is AFFIRMED, in its entirety, and that this matter is hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Terry A Doughty on 8/3/2018. (crt,Miletello, A) |
|
Thursday, July 19, 2018 | ||
18 | 18
motion
Report and Recommendations
Thu 07/19 1:11 PM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re1 Complaint, filed by Michael Shane Smith, RECOMMENDING that the decision of the Commissioner be Affirmed and this matter be Dismissed with prejudice. Objections to R&R due by 8/2/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 7/19/2018. (crt,Crawford, A) |
|
Monday, March 12, 2018 | ||
17 | 17
order
Minute Entry/Order Reassigning Case
Mon 03/12 10:49 AM
ELECTRONIC MINUTE ENTRY issued by the Clerk. Case reassigned to Judge Terry A. Doughty. Judge Robert G. James no longer assigned to case. All motions previously pending before Judge James are transferred to Judge Doughty. All deadlines and hearings remain as set pending further review by the court. All future filings should bear the name of the new judge assignment. Approved by Chief Judge S Maurice Hicks, Jr on 3/12/2018.(crt,Whidden, C) |
|
Monday, December 11, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
appeal
Social Security Appellants Reply Brief
Mon 12/11 11:41 AM
APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF by Michael Shane Smith. (aty,Osterhout, Karl) |
|
Friday, December 01, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
appeal
Social Security Appellees Brief
Fri 12/01 11:06 AM
APPELLEE'S BRIEF by U S Commissioner Social Security Administration. Appellant Reply Brief due by 12/11/2017. (aty,Walker, Cristina) |
|
Thursday, November 02, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension (Other)
Thu 11/02 3:24 PM
ORDER granting13 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant's Brief due by 12/3/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 11/2/2017. (crt,Leday, A) |
|
Wednesday, November 01, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
motion
Extension (Other)
Wed 11/01 4:19 PM
MOTION FOR EXTENSION of to file brief with consent by U S Commissioner Social Security Administration. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes.(aty,Walker, Cristina) |
|
Att: 1 Text of proposed order | ||
Tuesday, September 19, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
appeal
Social Security Appellants Brief
Tue 09/19 1:42 PM
APPELLANT'S BRIEF by Michael Shane Smith. Appellee Brief due by 11/3/2017. (crt,Leday, A) |
|
11 | 11
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
Tue 09/19 1:36 PM
ORDER granting10 Motion for Leave to Exceed Brief Page Limit. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant is granted similar relief from the page limit if such relief is necessary. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 9/19/2017. (crt,Leday, A) |
|
Monday, September 18, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Leave to File Excess Pages
Mon 09/18 2:19 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Exceed Brief Page Limit by Michael Shane Smith. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes.(aty,Osterhout, Karl) Modified on 9/18/2017 to modify docket text. (Crick, S) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed order, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed pleading | ||
Tuesday, July 18, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
answer
Answer to Complaint
Tue 07/18 10:21 AM
ANSWER to1 Complaint and Notice of Filing of Administrative Transcript by U S Commissioner Social Security Administration. Appellant Brief due by 9/18/2017.(aty,Walker, Cristina) Modified on 7/18/2017 to modify docket text. (Crick, S) |
|
Att: 1 Notice of Filing Transcript | ||
utility
Manual Attachment Received
Tue 07/18 11:12 AM
MANUAL ATTACHMENT received from U S Commissioner Social Security Administration regarding9 Answer to Complaint. Pursuant to LR 5.7.01, the electronic version of this manual attachment is considered the original. Paper version sent to MONROE division. (crt,Keller, J) |
||
Wednesday, April 26, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
appeal
Social Security Scheduling Order
Wed 04/26 4:06 PM
SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING ORDER. (crt,Crick, S) |
|
7 | 7
service
Summons Returned Executed as to USA (Social Security)
Wed 04/26 8:05 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed in Social Security Case by Michael Shane Smith. U S Commissioner Social Security Administration served on 4/19/2017, answer due 7/18/2017. Service made upon: U S Attorney on 4/14/2017;U S Attorney General on 4/17/2017. (aty,Osterhout, Karl) Modified on 4/26/2017 (Crick, S) |
|
Thursday, March 16, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
order
Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Thu 03/16 3:12 PM
ORDER GRANTING3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Added attorney Karl E Osterhout for Plaintiff. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 3/16/17. (crt,Leday, A) |
|
5 | 5
service
Summons Issued - SSA (Form Included)
Thu 03/16 3:00 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to US Attorney, US Attorney General and Comm of Social Security. (crt,Leday, A) |
|
4 | 4
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Thu 03/16 2:56 PM
ORDER GRANTING2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 3/16/17. (crt,Leday, A) |
|
Wednesday, March 15, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Wed 03/15 3:05 PM
MOTION for Karl E. Osterhout to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Admission fee: $105, receipt number 0536-3315720) by Michael Shane Smith.(aty,Lane, Matthew) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of good standing, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed order | ||
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Wed 03/15 3:02 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Michael Shane Smith.(aty,Lane, Matthew) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed order | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 03/15 3:00 PM
COMPLAINT for judicial review of SSA decision under 42 USC 405(g) against U S Commissioner Social Security Administration (In Forma Pauperis status requested and/or granted) filed by Michael Shane Smith.(Attorney Matthew David Lane, Jr added to party Michael Shane Smith(pty:pla))(aty,Lane, Matthew) |
|
Att: 1 Civil cover sheet | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Thu 03/16 9:35 AM
CASE Assigned to Judge Robert G James and Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes. Motions referred to Karen L Hayes. (crt,Mitchell, Pam) |