Henson et al v. Takeda Pharmaceuticals U S A Inc et al
Louisiana Western District Court | |
Judge: | Rebecca F Doherty |
Referred: | Patrick J Hanna |
Case #: | 6:17-cv-00404 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Mar 15, 2017 |
Terminated: | Aug 10, 2017 |
Last checked: Monday Sep 11, 2017 4:47 AM CDT |
Defendant
Eli Lilly & Co
|
|
Defendant
Takeda California Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Takeda Pharmaceutical Co Ltd
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Takeda Pharmaceuticals America Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Takeda Pharmaceuticals International Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Takeda Pharmaceuticals U S A Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Takeda Development Center Americas Inc
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Betty J Henson
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Takeda Global Research & Development Center Inc
Terminated: 03/15/2017
|
|
Defendant
Takeda Pharmaceuticals North America Inc
Terminated: 03/15/2017
|
|
Defendant
Takeda San Diego Inc
Terminated: 03/15/2017
|
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Thursday, August 10, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss
Mon 08/14 5:10 PM
ORDER granting (6869) Motion to Dismiss in case 6:11-md-02299-RFD-PJH; granting (3) Motion to Dismiss in case 6:17-cv-00404-RFD-PJH. Signed by Judge Rebecca F Doherty on 8/10/2017. Associated Cases: 6:11-md-02299-RFD-PJH, 6:17-cv-00404-RFD-PJH(crt,Williams, L) |
|
Wednesday, April 05, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
motion
Dismiss
Wed 04/05 9:40 AM
MOTION to Dismiss Named Defendants by Betty J Henson.Associated Cases: 6:11-md-02299-RFD-PJH, 6:17-cv-00404-RFD-PJH(aty,Moak, Robert) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed order | ||
Monday, April 03, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
order
Order (JPML Noticing ONLY)
Wed 04/05 9:21 AM
ORDER: WHEREAS this case is deemed a Related case and the allegations contained, on their face, indicate common questions of law and fact as those found in MDL 6:11-md-2299 Actos (Pioglitazone) Products Liability Litigation. Accordingly, it is ORDERED this action is transferred into MDL 6:11-md-2299 Actos (Pioglitazone) Products Liability Litigation for pretrial purposes only. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 4/3/2017. (crt,Williams, L) |
|
utility
Create Case Association (Docket in Member Cases)
Wed 04/05 9:23 AM
Cases associated. Create association to 6:11-md-02299-RFD-PJH. (crt,Williams, L) |
||
Wednesday, March 15, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 03/15 4:28 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0536-3315940) filed by Roy C. Henson, Betty J Henson.(Attorney Robert Warren Moak added to party Betty J Henson(pty:pla), Attorney Robert Warren Moak added to party Roy C. Henson(pty:pla))(aty,Moak, Robert) |
|
Att: 1 Civil cover sheet | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Fri 03/17 4:24 PM
CASE Assigned to Judge Rebecca F Doherty and Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna. (crt,Williams, L) |