Klein v. Takeda Pharmaceutical Co Ltd et al
Louisiana Western District Court | |
Judge: | Rebecca F Doherty |
Referred: | Patrick J Hanna |
Case #: | 6:17-mc-00055 |
Case Filed: | Mar 15, 2017 |
Terminated: | Apr 04, 2017 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 6 hours ago |
Tuesday, April 04, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
order
Judgment Adopting Report and Recommendations Order on Report and Recommendations Order on Sealed Motion
Tue 04/04 5:47 PM
JUDGMENT re2 Report and Recommendations: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the1 Motion to Approve the Settlement is hereby GRANTED pursuant to the Report and Recommendation of Magistrate Judge Hanna, which is hereby adopted. Signed by Judge Rebecca F Doherty on 4/4/2017. (crt,Williams, L) |
|
Thursday, March 23, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
motion
Report and Recommendations
Mon 03/27 2:53 PM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re1 SEALED MOTION Approving Settlement Amount, Contingency Fee and Advanced Costs filed by Phyllis M Klein. This Court having considered all submissions made, I recommend to the Court that the Motion be GRANTED. Objections to R&R due by 4/2/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 3/23/2017. (crt,Alexander, E) |
|
Wednesday, March 15, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
motion
Sealed Motion (Sealed Pleading)
Wed 03/15 4:30 PM
SEALED MOTION Approving Settlement Amount, Contingency Fee and Advanced Costs by Phyllis M. Klein.(Attorney Patrick C Morrow added to party Phyllis M. Klein(pty:pla))(aty,Morrow, Patrick) |
|
Att: 1 Attorney Verification, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed order | ||
misc
Electronic Payment of Miscellaneous Case Filing Fee
Wed 03/15 4:30 PM
ELECTRONIC PAYMENT of Miscellaneous Case filing fee by Phyllis M. Klein. ( Filing Fee: $47, receipt number 0536-3315954) . (aty,Morrow, Patrick) |
||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Mon 03/20 5:24 PM
CASE Assigned to Judge Rebecca F Doherty and Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna. Motions referred to Patrick J Hanna. (crt,Williams, L) |