United States of America v. $12,900.00 in United States Currency et al
Missouri Western District Court | |
Judge: | Nanette K Laughrey |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-04047 |
Nature of Suit | 625 Forfeiture/Penalty - Drug Related Seizure of Property 21 USC 881 |
Cause | 21:881 Forfeiture Property-Drugs |
Case Filed: | Mar 15, 2017 |
Terminated: | Sep 18, 2017 |
Last checked: Monday Sep 11, 2017 3:45 AM CDT |
Defendant
$12,900.00 in United States Currency
|
|
Defendant
Beretta, Model 20, .25 Caliber Pistol, Serial Number BE05785V
|
|
Defendant
Hi-Point Firearm, Model CF380, .380ACP Pistol, Serial Number P919729
|
|
Plaintiff
United States of America
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/16/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Wednesday, October 18, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
misc
Response to Order to Show Cause
Wed 10/18 3:27 PM
RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by United States of America.(Blackburn, Amy) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Morgan County Adult Detention Center Mail Policy | ||
Monday, October 02, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
misc
Mail Returned
Tue 10/03 1:12 PM
CERTIFIED MAIL RETURNED as undeliverable. Mail sent to Dillon Matthew Naylor. (Geiser, Angel) |
|
Wednesday, September 27, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
misc
Green card (return)
Wed 09/27 12:25 PM
GREEN CARD showing return of service re 18 Order. Dillon Matthew Naylor by Emma Young served on 09/25/2017 (Lock, Tania) |
|
Tuesday, September 26, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
misc
Mail Returned
Tue 09/26 12:24 PM
MAIL RETURNED as undeliverable. Mail sent to Dillon Matthew Naylor. (Geiser, Angel) |
|
Wednesday, September 20, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
order
Order
Wed 09/20 5:25 PM
On or before 9/29/2017, Plaintiff is ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE why the Court's Order for Default Judgment, [Doc.15 ], should not be vacated. It has come to the Court's attention that the show cause order sent to Dillon Naylor on 8/18/2017 likely failed to reach him. Although the Court received a Green Card on 8/28/2017, which indicated the mail was received and signed for by Emma Young, the mail was nonetheless returned to the Court as undeliverable on 9/15/2017. Signed on 9/20/2017 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Dickinson, Gregory) |
|
Monday, September 18, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
order
Clerk's Judgment
Mon 09/18 4:18 PM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT (Matthes Mitra, Renea) |
|
15 | 15
4
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Default Judgment
Mon 09/18 3:55 PM
ORDER entered by Judge Nanette Laughrey. Plaintiff United States' Motion for Default Judgment, [Doc.11 ], is granted. Signed on 9/18/2017 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey (Dickinson, Gregory) Modified on 9/18/2017 to attach the correct Order. (Matthes Mitra, Renea) |
|
notice
Notice of Docket Modification
Mon 09/18 4:17 PM
NOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION. A modification has been made to the document filed on 9/18/17 as Document No. 15, ORDER. The document has been deleted as the incorrect document was filed. The correct Order has been attached. This is a text entry only - no document is attached. (Matthes Mitra, Renea) |
||
Friday, September 15, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Mail Returned
Wed 09/20 2:45 PM
Certified MAIL RETURNED (without green card attached) as undeliverable. Mail sent to Dillon Matthew Naylor. (Lock, Tania) |
|
Wednesday, August 30, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Mail Returned
Fri 09/01 11:48 AM
REGULAR MAIL RETURNED as undeliverable. Mail sent to Dillon Matthew Naylor. (Geiser, Angel) |
|
Monday, August 28, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Green card (return)
Mon 08/28 1:48 PM
GREEN CARD showing return of service re 12 Order to Show Cause. Emma Young served on 08/25/2017. (Lock, Tania) |
|
Friday, August 18, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
order
Order to Show Cause
Fri 08/18 4:28 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE entered by Judge Nanette Laughrey. Plaintiff filed its Motion for Default Judgment of Forfeiture on 7/31/2017. Defendant's response was due 8/14/2017. As of the date of this Order, no response has been filed. On or before 9/1/2017, Defendant is ordered to show cause why Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment should not be granted. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Dickinson, Gregory) |
|
Monday, July 31, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Default Judgment
Mon 07/31 2:37 PM
MOTION for default judgment of Forfeiture filed by Amy B. Blackburn on behalf of United States of America. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 8/14/2017 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Blackburn, Amy) |
|
Wednesday, July 26, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
order
Clerk's Entry of Default
Wed 07/26 10:57 AM
Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT. (Matthes Mitra, Renea) |
|
Tuesday, July 11, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Order
Tue 07/11 10:44 AM
MOTION for order Application for Clerk's Entry of Default filed by Amy B. Blackburn on behalf of United States of America. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 7/25/2017 unless otherwise directed by the court.(Blackburn, Amy) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration, | ||
Att: 2 Return Receipt, | ||
Att: 3 USPS Tracking Result | ||
notice
Notice of Docket Modification
Tue 07/11 10:37 AM
NOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION. A modification has been made to the document filed on 07/10/2017 as Document No. 8, Notice of Filing. The document has been deleted as the incorrect event was used when filing the document. Counsel will refile the document using the correct event. This is a text entry only - no document is attached. (Geiser, Angel) |
||
Monday, July 10, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Filing
Mon 07/10 10:22 AM
NOTICE of filing Applicaiton for Clerk's Entry of Default by United States of America(Blackburn, Amy) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration, | ||
Att: 2 Return Receipt, | ||
Att: 3 USPS Tracking Result | ||
Wednesday, June 14, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Filing
Wed 06/14 10:03 AM
NOTICE of filing Declaration of Publication by United States of America(Bohling, James) |
|
Att: 1 Certification | ||
Wednesday, March 29, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
service
Return of Service of Rule G Forfeiture Action
Wed 03/29 1:57 PM
RETURN OF SERVICE of Rule G forfeiture action executed as to Beretta, Model 20,.25 Caliber Pistol, Serial Number BE05785V, Hi-Point Firearm, Model CF380,.380ACP Pistol, Serial Number P919729. Beretta, Model 20,.25 Caliber Pistol, Serial Number BE05785V, Hi-Point Firearm, Model CF380,.380ACP Pistol, Serial Number P919729 served on 3/29/17. (Bohling, James) |
|
Monday, March 27, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
service
Return of Service of Rule G Forfeiture Action
Mon 03/27 3:23 PM
RETURN OF SERVICE of Rule G forfeiture action executed as to $12,900.00 in United States Currency. $12,900.00 in United States Currency served on 3/27/17. (Bohling, James) |
|
Wednesday, March 15, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Filing
Wed 03/15 3:19 PM
NOTICE of filing Notice of Complaint for Forfeiture In Rem to Erica Scott by United States of America (Blackburn, Amy) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Filing
Wed 03/15 3:17 PM
NOTICE of filing Notice of Complaint for Forfeiture In Rem to Dillon Naylor by United States of America (Blackburn, Amy) |
|
2 | 2
order
Notice of Pretrial Procedure
Wed 03/15 2:06 PM
ORDER ON PRETRIAL PROCEDURES. Service must be obtained on all defendants within forty (40) days of the date of this Order unless otherwise authorized by the Court. Signed on 3/15/17 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. (Matthes Mitra, Renea) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 03/15 10:30 AM
COMPLAINT For Forfeiture In Rem against $12,900.00 in United States Currency, Beretta, Model 20,.25 Caliber Pistol, Serial Number BE05785V, Hi-Point Firearm, Model CF380,.380ACP Pistol, Serial Number P919729 filed by Amy B. Blackburn on behalf of United States of America Service due by 6/13/2017 unless otherwise directed by the court.(Blackburn, Amy) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |