Curtis v. Christian County, Missouri et al
Missouri Western District Court | |
Judge: | Stephen R Bough |
Case #: | 6:17-cv-03072 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights (Employment Discrimination) |
Case Filed: | Mar 15, 2017 |
Terminated: | Aug 27, 2020 |
Last checked: Monday Sep 11, 2017 4:37 AM CDT |
Defendant
Hosea Bilyeu
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Christian County, Missouri
100 West Church
Ozark, MO 65721 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Brad Cole
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Ralph Phillips
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Ray Weter
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert A Curtis
3207 State Highway N
Clever, MO 65631 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Monday, September 14, 2020 | ||
211 | 211
respoth
Reply to objections to bill of costs
Mon 09/14 4:17 PM
REPLY to objections to bill of costs re210 Objection to bill of costs filed by Christopher M Napolitano on behalf of Defendants Hosea Bilyeu, Christian County, Missouri, Brad Cole, Ralph Phillips, Ray Weter. (Napolitano, Christopher) |
|
Tuesday, September 08, 2020 | ||
210 | 210
respoth
Objections to bill of costs
Tue 09/08 3:33 PM
OBJECTION to209 bill of costs filed by Lyle M. Gregory on behalf of Plaintiff Robert A Curtis.Reply to Objections to Bill of Costs due by 9/22/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Gregory, Lyle) |