Barlow v. Cruz et al
Texas Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Jane J Boyle |
Referred: | David L Horan |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-00743 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1981 Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Mar 14, 2017 |
Terminated: | Apr 18, 2017 |
Last checked: Sunday Sep 10, 2017 3:42 AM CDT |
Defendant
GW Bush
|
|
Defendant
Ted Cruz
|
|
Defendant
LB Johnson
|
|
Defendant
United States of America
|
|
Plaintiff
Clinton C Barlow, III
PO Box 2134
Trenton, NJ 08607 |
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Tuesday, April 18, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
order
Judgment
Tue 04/18 5:00 PM
JUDGMENT: It is ORDERED, ADJUDGED and DECREED that Plaintiff is GRANTED leave to proceed in forma pauperis and that this action is summarily DISMISSED with prejudice. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 4/18/2017) (epm) |
|
7 | 7
order
Order Accepting/Adopting Findings and Recommendations
Tue 04/18 4:58 PM
Order Accepting4 Findings and Recommendations re:3 Complaint, filed by Clinton C Barlow, III. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 4/18/2017) (epm) |
|
misc
Order Receipt
Tue 04/18 5:01 PM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:7,8. Tue Apr 18 17:01:06 CDT 2017 (crt) |
||
Wednesday, April 05, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
respm
Response/Objection
Fri 04/07 2:33 PM
RESPONSE (Legal Defense) filed by Clinton C Barlow III re:4 Findings, Conclusions, and Recommendation on Case. (ran) |
|
5 | 5
motion
Stay
Wed 04/05 4:21 PM
Emergent Motion Application Stay, filed by Clinton C Barlow III. (ran) |
|
Friday, March 17, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
motion
Findings and Recommendations
Fri 03/17 10:04 AM
FINDINGS, CONCLUSIONS, AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE on Case re:3 Complaint, filed by Clinton C Barlow, III. The Court should grant Barlow leave to proceed in forma pauperis and summarily dismiss the complaint with prejudice. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Horan on 3/17/2017) (epm) |
|
misc
Order Receipt
Fri 03/17 10:05 AM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:4. Fri Mar 17 10:05:12 CDT 2017 (crt) |
||
Wednesday, March 15, 2017 | ||
misc
Order Receipt
Wed 03/15 10:26 AM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:1,2. Wed Mar 15 10:26:14 CDT 2017 (crt) |
||
Tuesday, March 14, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
cmp
Complaint
Wed 03/15 10:25 AM
COMPLAINT against GW Bush, Ted Cruz, LB Johnson, United States of America filed by Clinton C Barlow, III. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (sss) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party
Wed 03/15 10:23 AM
Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (sss) |
|
1 | 1
qcref
Boyle
Wed 03/15 10:23 AM
New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. SCREEN case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Horan (see Special Order 3). Initiating documents received by mail. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the[LINK:national] and[LINK:circuit] indexes.) Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (sss) |