Dixson v. Davis-Director TDCJ-CID
Texas Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Jane J Boyle |
Referred: | Paul D Stickney |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-00748 |
Nature of Suit | 530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General |
Cause | 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State) |
Case Filed: | Mar 14, 2017 |
Terminated: | Apr 11, 2017 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Wednesday, April 12, 2017 | ||
misc
Order Receipt
Wed 04/12 8:58 AM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:5,6. Wed Apr 12 08:58:00 CDT 2017 (crt) |
||
Tuesday, April 11, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
order
Judgment
Wed 04/12 8:57 AM
JUDGMENT: The motion for extension of time is dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. The Clerk of the Court is directed to close this case. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 4/11/2017) (epm) |
|
5 | 5
order
Order Accepting/Adopting Findings and Recommendations
Wed 04/12 8:53 AM
Order Accepting4 Findings and Recommendations re:3 Motion for Extension of Time to File filed by Van Dixson. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 4/11/2017) (epm) |
|
Friday, March 17, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
motion
Findings and Recommendations
Fri 03/17 10:47 AM
FINDINGS, CONCLUSIONS AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE: The motion for extension of time should be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction unless Petitioner submits a § 2254 petition on the appropriate form and files a motion to proceed in forma pauperis or pays the $5 filing fee within the fourteen-day period for objection to this recommendation, or other deadline set by the Court. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Paul D Stickney on 3/17/2017) (sss) |
|
Att: 1 2254 Form, | ||
Att: 2 IFP Form | ||
misc
Order Receipt
Fri 03/17 10:47 AM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:4. Fri Mar 17 10:47:16 CDT 2017 (crt) |
||
Wednesday, March 15, 2017 | ||
misc
Order Receipt
Wed 03/15 8:58 AM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:1,2. Wed Mar 15 08:58:44 CDT 2017 (crt) |
||
Tuesday, March 14, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
motion
Extension of Time to File Document
Wed 03/15 8:57 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Van Dixson. (ndt) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party
Wed 03/15 8:55 AM
Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (ndt) |
|
1 | 1
qcref
Boyle
Wed 03/15 8:54 AM
New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. CASREF case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Stickney (see Special Order 3). Initiating documents received by mail. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the[LINK:national] and[LINK:circuit] indexes.) Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Stickney). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (ndt) |