Cotton v. DePuy Orthopaedics Inc et al
Texas Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Ed Kinkeade |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-00753 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Mar 15, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jan 24, 2020 |
Last checked: Monday Sep 11, 2017 4:04 AM CDT |
Defendant
DePuy Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
DePuy International Limited
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
DePuy Orthopaedics Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson International
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson Services Inc
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Richard Lee Cotton
|
Represented By
|
Special Master
Special Master
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 9 hours ago |
Friday, January 24, 2020 | ||
utility
Terminate Civil Case (Optional)
Fri 01/24 11:36 AM
Civil Case Terminated. (chmb) |
||
Wednesday, January 22, 2020 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Stipulation
Wed 01/22 3:53 PM
STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE by Richard Lee Cotton. (Showard, Sarah) |
|
Friday, April 06, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Notice (Other)
Fri 04/06 8:14 PM
Notice of filing Case Management Orders The following orders have been filed in 3:11-md-2244 and are available by using the links provided below. [LINK:CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. #10 ] [LINK:PINNACLE PLAINTIFF PROFILE FORM] [LINK:CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. #11 ] [LINK:DEFENDANTS' FACT SHEET.] (cea) |
|
Wednesday, March 15, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement
Wed 03/15 2:28 PM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Richard Lee Cotton. (Showard, Sarah) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 03/15 1:52 PM
COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against DePuy Inc, DePuy International Limited, DePuy Orthopaedics Inc, Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson International, Johnson & Johnson Services Inc filed by Richard Lee Cotton. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-8277545) Summons(es) not requested at this time. Filer indicates this case is related to MDL Case No. 2244, In re: DePuy Orthopedics, Inc., Pinnacle Hip Implant Products Liability Litigation, pending before Judge Ed Kinkeade. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the[LINK:Judges Copy Requirements] is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Showard, Sarah) |
|
Att: 1 Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Notice of Related Case |