Cano v. GCA Services Group Inc
Texas Northern District Court | |
Judge: | A Joe Fish |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-00754 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment) |
Case Filed: | Mar 15, 2017 |
Terminated: | Apr 13, 2017 |
Last checked: Monday Sep 11, 2017 4:48 AM CDT |
Defendant
GCA Services Group Inc
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Efren Cano
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 6 hours ago |
Thursday, April 13, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
order
Order of Dismissal or Administrative Closure
Thu 04/13 4:46 PM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL: Pursuant to this court's9 order to show cause issued 4/07/2017, plaintiff's claims are DISMISSED without prejudice. Rule 16(f), FRCvP. (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 4/13/2017) (twd) |
|
Monday, April 10, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
trial
Pretrial Disclosures
Mon 04/10 12:55 PM
Pretrial Disclosures DEFENDANTS INITIAL DISCLOSURES filed by GCA Services Group Inc. (Strickler, Jamie) |
|
Friday, April 07, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
order
Order to Show Cause/Order to Answer
Fri 04/07 10:47 AM
ORDER: To date, no joint status report or certificate of interested persons has been timely filed. By 4/12/2017, plaintiff shall show cause in writing why sanctions should not be imposed. (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 4/7/2017) (epm) |
|
Thursday, April 06, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
order
Order
Thu 04/06 2:18 PM
ORDER: Within 15 days of the date of this order, Mark L. Scott, Jr., shall either (1) provide to the court, and to the clerk of court, satisfactory documentation of membership or (2) apply for membership in the Bar of this court or for admission pro hac vice for this case. (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 4/6/2017) (ash) |
|
7 | 7
misc
Status Report
Thu 04/06 1:32 PM
Proposed STATUS REPORT filed by GCA Services Group Inc. (Strickler, Jamie) Modified on 4/6/2017 to update title of document per attorney phone call (svc) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) A-C to Proposed Status Report | ||
Thursday, March 16, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
order
Status Report Order
Thu 03/16 5:01 PM
STATUS REPORT ORDER: Joint Status Report due by 4/6/2017. See order for specifics. (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 3/16/2017) (chmb) |
|
5 | 5
order
Order
Thu 03/16 4:59 PM
ORDER: No later than 20 days after this order is filed, the plaintiff must comply with Rule 3.1(c) or 3.2(e) so that the court can ensure that recusal is not required in this case. (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 3/16/2017) (chmb) |
|
Wednesday, March 15, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
qcref
Fish
Wed 03/15 4:04 PM
New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Stickney). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (aaa) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement
Wed 03/15 3:03 PM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by GCA Services Group, Inc.. (Zimmerer, Russell) |
|
2 | 2
respm
Appendix in Support
Wed 03/15 3:00 PM
Appendix in Support filed by GCA Services Group Inc re1 Notice of Removal (Zimmerer, Russell) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) 1 through 10 to accompany Appendix In Support of Defendant's Notice of Removal | ||
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Wed 03/15 2:52 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 192nd Judicial District, case number DC 17-01825 filed by GCA Services Group, Inc.. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-8277809) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the[LINK:Judges Copy Requirements] is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Zimmerer, Russell) |
|
Att: 1 Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Cover Sheet Supplement |