Umahon-Otono v. WCS Services LLC et al
Texas Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Jane J Boyle |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-00758 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1981 Job Discrimination (Race) |
Case Filed: | Mar 15, 2017 |
Terminated: | Mar 06, 2018 |
Last checked: Monday Sep 11, 2017 3:23 AM CDT |
Defendant
WCS Services LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Esther Umahon-Otono
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Michael N Wardlaw
Terminated: 04/10/2017
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
William F Wardlaw
Terminated: 04/10/2017
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 4 hours ago |
Thursday, March 22, 2018 | ||
45 | 45
misc
Costs Taxed
Thu 03/22 9:46 AM
Costs Taxed in the amount of $1,485.90 against Esther Umahon-Otono. (zkc) |
|
Friday, March 09, 2018 | ||
44 | 44
adr
ADR Summary
Fri 03/09 9:38 AM
Alternative Dispute Resolution Summary filed by ADR Provider. Attorneys in Attendance: N/A. Prv Fee: $ N/A. Outcome of ADR: Parties did not use my services. (Hostetter, J) |
|
Thursday, March 08, 2018 | ||
43 | 43
misc
Bill of Costs
Thu 03/08 3:17 PM
BILL OF COSTS by WCS Services LLC. (Ross, John) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) A | ||
Tuesday, March 06, 2018 | ||
42 | 42
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss
Tue 03/06 3:03 PM
ORDER granting41 Motion to Dismiss With Prejudice. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 3/6/2018) (zkc) |
|
Monday, March 05, 2018 | ||
41 | 41
motion
Dismiss
Mon 03/05 8:14 AM
Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss With Prejudice filed by Esther Umahon-Otono (O'Brien, Kerry) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, February 22, 2018 | ||
40 | 40
respm
Appendix in Support
Thu 02/22 2:52 PM
Appendix in Support filed by WCS Services LLC re39 Reply to Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's Motion to Compel and for Sanctions (Ross, John) |
|
39 | 39
respm
Reply
Thu 02/22 2:51 PM
REPLY filed by WCS Services LLC re:26 MOTION to Compel MOTION for Sanctions AND MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT (Ross, John) |
|
Wednesday, February 21, 2018 | ||
38 | 38
respm
Response/Objection
Wed 02/21 10:27 AM
RESPONSE filed by Esther Umahon-Otono re:26 MOTION to Compel MOTION for Sanctions AND MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT (O'Brien, Kerry) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, February 13, 2018 | ||
37 | 37
misc
Status Report
Tue 02/13 4:21 PM
Joint STATUS REPORT filed by WCS Services LLC. (Ross, John) |
|
36 | 36
order
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Tue 02/13 8:56 AM
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting35 the parties' Joint Motion to Amend19 the Scheduling Order. The mediation deadline is now April 13, 2018. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 2/13/2018) (chmb) |
|
Monday, February 12, 2018 | ||
35 | 35
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Mon 02/12 1:56 PM
MOTION JOINT MOTION TO MODIFY THE SCHEDULING ORDER re19 Scheduling Order,, filed by WCS Services LLC (Ross, John) |
|
Monday, February 05, 2018 | ||
34 | 34
4
pgs
order
Order Setting Deadline/Hearing
Tue 02/06 9:37 AM
ORDER REQUIRING CONFERENCE AND JOINT STATUS REPORT: Joint Status Report due by 2/16/2018. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Rebecca Rutherford on 2/5/2018) (aaa) |
|
33 | 33
minutes
Telephone Conference
Mon 02/05 3:01 PM
ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Rebecca Rutherford: Telephone Conference held on 2/5/2018. Should any issues arise at the deposition on Tuesday, February 6, the attorneys are ordered to call 214-753-2412. Attorney Appearances: Plaintiff - Kerry Vincent O'Brien; Defense - John L. Ross. (Court Reporter: Not Recorded) (No exhibits) |
|
32 | 32
trial
Designation of Experts
Mon 02/05 2:21 PM
Designation of Experts by Esther Umahon-Otono. (O'Brien, Kerry) |
|
Friday, February 02, 2018 | ||
31 | 31
order
Order Referring Motion
Fri 02/02 10:43 AM
ELECTRONIC Order Referring25 &26 the parties' motions to compel to Magistrate Judge Rebecca Rutherford. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 2/2/2018) (chmb) |
|
Wednesday, January 31, 2018 | ||
30 | 30
respm
Response/Objection
Wed 01/31 4:59 PM
RESPONSE AND OBJECTION filed by WCS Services LLC re:25 MOTION to Compel OPPOSED (Ross, John) |
|
Tuesday, January 30, 2018 | ||
29 | 29
respm
Appendix in Support
Tue 01/30 2:01 PM
Appendix in Support filed by WCS Services LLC re28 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion TO COMPEL AND FOR SANCTIONS (Ross, John) |
|
28 | 28
respm
Brief/Memorandum In Support
Tue 01/30 2:00 PM
Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by WCS Services LLC re26 MOTION to Compel MOTION for Sanctions AND MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL AND FOR SANCTIONS (Ross, John) |
|
27 | 27
respm
Appendix in Support
Tue 01/30 8:17 AM
Appendix in Support filed by WCS Services LLC re26 MOTION to Compel MOTION for Sanctions AND MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT (Ross, John) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) APP 1-70, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit(s) APP 71-140 | ||
26 | 26
motion
Compel Sanctions
Tue 01/30 7:53 AM
MOTION to Compel , MOTION for Sanctions AND MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT () filed by WCS Services LLC with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Ross, John) |
|
Tuesday, January 23, 2018 | ||
25 | 25
motion
Compel
Tue 01/23 3:29 PM
MOTION to Compel OPPOSED filed by Esther Umahon-Otono with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (O'Brien, Kerry) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit(s) B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit(s) C, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit(s) D, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit(s) E, | ||
Att: 6 Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, November 30, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
adr
Designation of Mediator
Thu 11/30 1:59 PM
Designation of Mediator by Esther Umahon-Otono. (O'Brien, Kerry) |
|
Wednesday, November 29, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
order
Order
Wed 11/29 10:35 AM
ELECTRONIC ORDER: The parties were required to designate a mediator thirty-five days after the22 amended scheduling order was filed, but have not done so. Therefore, the Court ORDERS the parties to designate a mediator by December 6, 2017. Failure to do so may result in sanctions. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 11/29/2017) (chmb) |
|
Tuesday, October 10, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
order
Scheduling Order
Tue 10/10 9:32 AM
AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial on the Court's four-week docket beginning set for 8/13/2018 before Judge Jane J. Boyle. Joinder of Parties due by 3/23/2018. Amended Pleadings due by 3/23/2018. Motions due by 5/14/2018. Discovery due by 4/13/2018. Deadline for mediation is on or before 3/16/2018. Pretrial Order due by 6/29/2018. Pretrial Materials due by 7/30/2018. Pretrial Conference set for 8/10/2018 10:00 AM before Judge Jane J. Boyle. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 10/10/2017) (ams) |
|
Friday, October 06, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
order
Order
Fri 10/06 10:15 AM
ELECTRONIC ORDER: Two Scheduling Orders were erroneously entered in this case (Docs. 19 & 20). Both of those Scheduling Orders are VACATED. A new, corrected Scheduling Order will follow. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 10/6/2017) (Judge Jane J. Boyle) |
|
Wednesday, October 04, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
order
Scheduling Order
Wed 10/04 4:00 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for four-week docket beginning 8/13/2018 before Judge Jane J. Boyle. Joinder of Parties due by 11/16/2017. Amended Pleadings due by 11/16/2017. Motions due by 5/14/2018. Discovery due by 4/13/2018. Deadline for mediation is on or before 3/16/2018. Pretrial Order due by 7/30/2018. Pretrial Materials due by 7/30/2018. Pretrial Conference set for 8/10/2018 10:00 AM before Judge Jane J. Boyle. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 10/4/2017) (ams) |
|
19 | 19
order
Scheduling Order
Wed 10/04 3:48 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: This case is set for trial on this Court's four-week docket beginning 8/13/2018 before Judge Jane J. Boyle. Joinder of Parties due by 3/23/2018. Amended Pleadings due by 3/23/2018. Motions due by 5/14/2018. Discovery due by 4/13/2018. Deadline for mediation is on or before 3/16/2018. Pretrial Order due by 7/30/2018. Pretrial Materials due by 7/30/2018. Pretrial Conference set for 8/10/2018 10:00 AM before Judge Jane J. Boyle. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 10/4/2017) (svc) |
|
Wednesday, August 23, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
misc
Status Report
Wed 08/23 2:11 PM
Joint STATUS REPORT filed by WCS Services LLC. (Ross, John) |
|
Monday, July 31, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
order
Status Report Order
Mon 07/31 12:49 PM
STATUS REPORT ORDER: Joint Status Report due by 8/21/2017. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 7/31/2017) (ran) |
|
Friday, July 28, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
answer
Answer to Amended Complaint
Fri 07/28 1:07 PM
ANSWER to7 Amended Complaint,, with Jury Demand filed by WCS Services LLC. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Ross, John) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) A-F | ||
Tuesday, July 11, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
order
Order
Tue 07/11 10:30 AM
ELECTRONIC ORDER: In light of14 Defendant's Response to Order to Show Cause, the Court ORDERS Defendant to file a responsive pleading to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint on or before Tuesday, August 1, 2017. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 7/11/2017) (chmb) |
|
Monday, July 10, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
respm
Response/Objection
Mon 07/10 6:21 PM
RESPONSE filed by WCS Services LLC re:13 Order to Show Cause/Order to Answer, (Ross, John) |
|
13 | 13
order
Order to Show Cause/Order to Answer
Mon 07/10 3:18 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: By Friday, 7/14/2017, Defendant must SHOW CAUSE, in writing, why it has not yet filed a responsive pleading to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint. Failure to show cause may result in sanctions. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 7/10/2017) (epm) |
|
12 | 12
order
Order on Motion to Withdraw
Mon 07/10 9:51 AM
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting11 Motion to Withdraw Motion to Withdraw as Counsel. Accordingly, the Court DENIES as moot10 Unopposed Motion to Withdraw as Counsel for Defendant. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 7/10/2017) (chmb) |
|
Friday, July 07, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Withdraw
Fri 07/07 2:41 PM
MOTION to Withdraw10 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by WCS Services LLC (Ross, John) |
|
Wednesday, July 05, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Withdraw as Attorney
Wed 07/05 4:20 PM
Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by WCS Services LLC (Ross, John) |
|
Monday, April 17, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance
Mon 04/17 3:52 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kerry Vincent O'Brien for Kay E. Goggin on behalf of Esther Umahon-Otono. (O'Brien, Kerry) |
|
Tuesday, April 11, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
Tue 04/11 9:39 AM
ELECTRONIC ORDER: In light of Plaintiff's Amended Complaint, the Court DENIES as MOOT Defendants'4 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 4/11/2017) (chmb) |
|
Monday, April 10, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
cmp
Amended Complaint
Mon 04/10 11:55 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND FIRST AMENDED against All Defendants filed by Esther Umahon-Otono. (One or more defendant(s) is no longer named.) Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (O'Brien, Kerry) |
|
Monday, April 03, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 04/03 2:25 PM
NOTICE of Local Counsel filed by Esther Umahon-Otono (O'Brien, Kerry) |
|
Tuesday, March 28, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
order
Order to Show Cause/Order to Answer
Tue 03/28 9:39 AM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Plaintiff must SHOW CAUSE, in writing, why local counsel has not yet appeared on her behalf. Show Cause Response due by 4/3/2017. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 3/28/2017) (axm) |
|
Monday, March 20, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
motion
Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
Mon 03/20 10:08 AM
Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by WCS Services LLC, Michael N Wardlaw, William F Wardlaw (Ross, John) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) Appendix, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit(s) 1, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit(s) 2 | ||
Wednesday, March 15, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
qcref
Boyle
Thu 03/16 10:21 AM
New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Stickney). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (twd) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement
Wed 03/15 5:07 PM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by WCS Services, LLC, Michael N. Wardlaw, William F. Wardlaw. (Ross, John) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Wed 03/15 5:06 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND from Dallas county, case number DC 17-00577 filed by WCS Services, LLC, Michael N. Wardlaw, William F. Wardlaw. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-8278798) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the[LINK:Judges Copy Requirements] is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Ross, John) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) Appendix with supporting exhibits, | ||
Att: 2 Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 3 Cover Sheet Supplement Supplemental |