United States of America v. Boyle et al
Texas Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Reed C O'Connor |
Referred: | Hal R Ray, Jr |
Case #: | 7:17-cv-00030 |
Nature of Suit | 220 Real Property - Foreclosure |
Cause | 28:1345 Recovery of Debt to US |
Case Filed: | Mar 15, 2017 |
Last checked: Monday Sep 11, 2017 4:08 AM CDT |
Defendant
Sandra Kay Baker
|
|
Defendant
Joseph Charles Boyle
|
|
Plaintiff
United States of America
US Attorney's Office Department of Justice 1100 Commerce St 3rd Floor
Dallas, TX 75242 |
Represented By
|
Receiver
Mike Personius
Keller-Williams Realty 2611 Cross Timbers Suite 100
Flower Mound, TX 75028 |
Docket last updated: 04/18/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Monday, July 10, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
order
Order Accepting/Adopting Findings and Recommendations
Mon 07/10 4:38 PM
ORDER ACCEPTING FINDINGS, CONCLUSIONS, AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Accordingly, it is ORDERED that the United States" Motion to Apply Proceeds of Sale (ECF No.17 ) is GRANTED. The proceeds from the sale of the real property at 512 North Bois DArc Street, Holliday, Texas 76366 are to be applied first to the payment of closing costs, local real and personal property taxes and fees, and the Receiver's commission and expenses, as set forth in the Final Closing Statement. The remainder of the proceeds are to be paid to the Clerk of the Court and applied to the unpaid restitution debt of Joseph Charles Boyle in the related case of United States v. Joseph Charles Boyle, No. 7:15-CR-00019-O (N.D. Tex.). (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 7/10/2017) (skg) |
|
Monday, June 26, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
motion
Findings and Recommendations
Mon 06/26 3:35 PM
FINDINGS, CONCLUSIONS, AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Before the Court is the United States' Motion to Apply Proceeds of Sale (ECF No.17 ), with Appendix in Support (ECF No.18 ), both filed on June 23, 2017. After review of the pleadings and the Final Closing Statement, the undersigned RECOMMENDS that United States District Judge Reed O'Connor GRANT the United States' Motion to Apply Proceeds of Sale (ECF No.17 ). Additionally, the undersigned RECOMMENDS that Judge O'Connor order that the proceeds from the sale of the real property at 512 North Bois DArc Street, Holliday, Texas 76366 be applied first to the payment of closing costs, local real and personal property taxes and fees, and the Receiver's commission and expenses, as set forth in the Final Closing Statement. The remainder of the proceeds should be ordered to be paid to the Clerk of the Court and applied to the unpaid restitution debt of Joseph Charles Boyle in the related case of United States v. Joseph Charles Boyle, No. 7:15-CR-00019-O (N.D. Tex.). (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Hal R. Ray, Jr on 6/26/2017) (skg) |
|
Friday, June 23, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
respm
Appendix in Support
Fri 06/23 1:44 PM
Appendix in Support filed by United States of America re17 MOTION to Apply Proceeds of Sale (Childs-DOJ, Melissa) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) A - Final Closing Statement | ||
17 | 17
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Fri 06/23 1:37 PM
MOTION to Apply Proceeds of Sale filed by United States of America (Childs-DOJ, Melissa) |
|
Monday, June 19, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
order
Order Accepting/Adopting Findings and Recommendations
Mon 06/19 10:20 AM
ORDER ACCEPTING FINDINGS, CONCLUSIONS, AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE: It is therefore ORDERED that the United States' Motion for Confirmation of Sale (ECF No.11 ) is GRANTED. See Order for further specifics. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 6/19/2017) (skg) |
|
Monday, June 05, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
motion
Findings and Recommendations
Mon 06/05 2:42 PM
FINDINGS, CONCLUSIONS, AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Before the Court is the United States' Motion for Confirmation of Sale (ECF No.11 ), with Appendix in Support (ECF No.12 ), both filed on May 31, 2017; and the United States' Certificate of Conference and of no Opposition to Motion for Confirmation of Sale (ECF No.14 ), filed on June 2, 2017. In light of the United States' Certificate of Conference (ECF No. 14), the Court finds that the Motion for Confirmation of Sale (ECF No. 11) is unopposed. Because the Motion is unopposed and because the United States' has demonstrated good cause, the undersigned RECOMMENDS that United States District Judge Reed O'Connor GRANT the United States' Motion for Confirmation of Sale (ECF No. 11). (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Hal R. Ray, Jr on 6/5/2017) (skg) |
|
Friday, June 02, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
notice
Certificate of Conference
Fri 06/02 5:51 PM
CERTIFICATE of Conference re12 Appendix in Support,13 Order Setting Deadline/Hearing,,11 MOTION for Confirmation of Sale re10 Order,9 Judgment,,, Terminate Motions,, by Melissa A Childs-DOJ on behalf of United States of America (Childs-DOJ, Melissa) |
|
Thursday, June 01, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
order
Order Setting Deadline/Hearing
Thu 06/01 4:25 PM
ORDER: Before the Court is the United States' Motion for Confirmation of Sale (ECF No.11 ), with Appendix in Support (ECF No.12 ), both filed on May 31, 2017. The Court finds that expedited briefing is necessary to address the United States' Motion (ECF No.11 ) in a timely fashion. See L.R. 7.1. It is therefore ORDERED that Defendants file any Response to the United States' Motion on or before June 15, 2017. Furthermore, if the United States believes their Motion is unopposed, it shall file the appropriate pleading documenting that fact on or before June 15, 2017. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Hal R. Ray, Jr on 6/1/2017) (plp) |
|
Wednesday, May 31, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
respm
Appendix in Support
Wed 05/31 12:59 PM
Appendix in Support filed by United States of America re11 MOTION for Confirmation of Sale re10 Order,9 Judgment,,, Terminate Motions,, (Childs-DOJ, Melissa) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) A-B | ||
11 | 11
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Wed 05/31 12:53 PM
MOTION for Confirmation of Sale re10 Order,9 Judgment,,, Terminate Motions,, filed by United States of America (Childs-DOJ, Melissa) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order Confirming Sale, | ||
Att: 2 Additional Page(s) Receiver's Deed | ||
Friday, April 28, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
order
Order
Fri 04/28 10:33 AM
CONSENT ORDER OF RECEIVERSHIP: IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED Pursuant to 18 U.S.C. §§ 3613 and 3664(m)(1)(A) and 26 U.S.C. §§ 7402(a) and 7403(d), Mike Personius is appointed as the Receiver for the real property located at 512 North Bois D'Arc Street, Holliday, Texas 76366. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 4/28/2017) (skg) |
|
9 | 9
order
Judgment ~Util - Terminate Motions
Fri 04/28 10:31 AM
CONSENT JUDGMENT ORDER: On the motion of the United States, and pursuant to the stipulation for entry of consent judgment executed by the parties (ECF No.8 ), IT IS ORDERED that judgment is entered in favor of the United States, and against Joseph Charles Boyle and Sandra Kay Baker, to foreclose the federal lien in the amount of $130,963.88 against the real property located at 512 North Bois D'Arc Street, Holliday, Texas 76366. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 4/28/2017) (skg) |
|
Thursday, April 27, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
motion
Judgment
Thu 04/27 4:57 PM
Consent MOTION for Judgment of Foreclosure, Appointment of Receiver, and Sale of Property filed by United States of America (Childs-DOJ, Melissa) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) A - Stipulation for Entry of Consent Judgment | ||
Wednesday, April 05, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Wed 04/05 11:09 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Joseph Charles Boyle. Waiver sent on 3/21/2017. (Childs-DOJ, Melissa) |
|
6 | 6
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Wed 04/05 11:08 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Sandra Kay Baker. Waiver sent on 3/27/2017. (Childs-DOJ, Melissa) |
|
Wednesday, March 15, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
qcref
O' Connor (WICHITA FALLS CASES)
Thu 03/16 8:38 AM
New Case Notes: A filing fee is not due for this case. File to: Judge Ray. CASREF case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Ray (see Special Order 3). Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Ray). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (skg) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice (Other)
Wed 03/15 6:06 PM
NOTICE of Related Case USA v. Joseph Charles Boyle, 7:15-CR-019-O (N.D. Tex.) re:1 Complaint,,,, filed by United States of America (Childs-DOJ, Melissa) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement
Wed 03/15 6:04 PM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by United States of America. (Childs-DOJ, Melissa) |
|
2 | 2
respm
Appendix in Support
Wed 03/15 6:03 PM
Appendix in Support filed by United States of America re1 Complaint,,,, (Childs-DOJ, Melissa) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) A-H | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 03/15 6:01 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by United States of America. (Filer fee note- Filed by the USA) Summons(es) not requested at this time. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the[LINK:Judges Copy Requirements] is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Childs-DOJ, Melissa) |
|
Att: 1 Cover Sheet |