Crowley et al v. GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY
Texas Western District Court | |
Judge: | Robert Pitman |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-00237 |
Nature of Suit | 110 Contract - Insurance |
Cause | 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Insurance Contract |
Case Filed: | Mar 15, 2017 |
Terminated: | May 11, 2018 |
Last checked: Monday Sep 11, 2017 3:42 AM CDT |
Defendant
GEICO Indemnity Company
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gerri Crowley
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert Crowley
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/17/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Friday, May 11, 2018 | ||
20 | 20
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss
Mon 05/14 9:10 AM
ORDER GRANTING19 Joint Motion to Dismiss With Prejudice. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (td) |
|
Tuesday, May 08, 2018 | ||
19 | 19
motion
Dismiss
Tue 05/08 4:36 PM
Joint MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice by GEICO Indemnity Company.(Miller, W.) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order Granting Joint Motion to Dismiss | ||
Thursday, March 08, 2018 | ||
18 | 18
1
pgs
order
Order Cancelling Deadline
Thu 03/08 3:56 PM
ORDERED that the final pretrial conference and trial setting in this case are VACATED. The parties are further ORDERED to file a joint stipulation of dismissal on or before May 8, 2018. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (td) |
|
Wednesday, March 07, 2018 | ||
17 | 17
notice
Notice of Settlement
Wed 03/07 2:43 PM
NOTICE of Settlement by GEICO Indemnity Company (Miller, W.) |
|
Tuesday, February 27, 2018 | ||
16 | 16
1
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set Hearings
Tue 02/27 4:08 PM
ORDER, (Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/22/2018 10:00 AM before Judge Robert Pitman). Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (td) |
|
Wednesday, October 18, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Compel Order on Motion to Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines
Wed 10/18 4:16 PM
ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART12 Motion to Compel Disclosures and Discovery and Motion to Amend Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (td) |
|
Friday, October 13, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
adr
ADR Report Filed - Consent to Alternate Dispute Resolution
Fri 10/13 4:57 PM
ADR Report Filed - CONSENT to Alternate Dispute Resolution (ADR) by GEICO Indemnity Company(Miller, W.) |
|
13 | 13
adr
ADR Report - Other
Fri 10/13 2:25 PM
ADR Report Filed - by GEICO Indemnity Company(Miller, W.) |
|
Thursday, September 28, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
motion
Compel Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines
Thu 09/28 9:59 AM
MOTION to Compel Disclosures and Discovery Responses , MOTION to Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines by GEICO Indemnity Company.(Miller, W.) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, June 08, 2017 | ||
order
Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Thu 06/08 2:17 PM
Text Order GRANTING9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by atty Scott P. Ogle entered by Judge Robert Pitman. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jg) |
||
Thursday, May 04, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
order
Scheduling Order
Thu 05/04 3:45 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Selection and Trial set for 4/2/2018 at 9:00 AM before Judge Robert Pitman, ADR Report Deadline due by 10/13/2017, Amended Pleadings due by 7/31/2017, Discovery due by 11/3/2017, Joinder of Parties due by 7/31/2017, Motions due by 11/13/2017. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (td) |
|
10 | 10
minutes
Pretrial Conference
Thu 05/04 3:38 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert Pitman: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 5/4/2017 (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.). (Court Reporter Pamela Andasola.)(td) |
|
Tuesday, May 02, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Wed 05/03 8:42 AM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Scott P. Ogle ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 100030159) on behalf of Gerri Crowley, Robert Crowley. (td) |
|
Monday, April 24, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
order
Order ~Util - Set Hearings
Mon 04/24 11:11 AM
ORDER, (Initial Pretrial Conference set for 5/4/2017 at 9:30 AM before Judge Robert Pitman). Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (td) |
|
7 | 7
misc
Letter/Correspondence
Mon 04/24 10:45 AM
Letter/Correspondence (2nd & Final Notice) to Scott Patrick Ogle re: non-admission status. (td) |
|
Friday, April 21, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order
Fri 04/21 4:56 PM
Proposed Scheduling Order by GEICO Indemnity Company.(Miller, W.) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order Proposed Scheduling Order | ||
Friday, March 24, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice
Fri 03/24 3:07 PM
NOTICE Regarding State Court Record by GEICO Indemnity Company(Miller, W.) |
|
Att: 1 Supplement State-Court Record | ||
Wednesday, March 22, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Letter/Correspondence
Wed 03/22 9:45 AM
Letter to attorney Scott Patrick Ogle re; non-admission into the WD/TX. (gr) |
|
Thursday, March 16, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
order
Order
Thu 03/16 10:12 AM
ORDER that the removing party supplement the record with state court pleadings. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (gr) |
|
Wednesday, March 15, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Wed 03/15 4:51 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0542-9397296), filed by GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY.(Miller, W.) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Supplement JS-44 Supplemental Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit D | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Thu 03/16 10:08 AM
Case Assigned to Judge Robert Pitman. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (gr) |