Adams, Danny v. Berryhill, Nancy
Wisconsin Western District Court | |
Judge: | William M Conley |
Referred: | Peter A Oppeneer |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-00198 |
Nature of Suit | 864 Social Security - SSID Title XVI |
Cause | 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID) |
Case Filed: | Mar 15, 2017 |
Terminated: | Oct 19, 2017 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Monday, December 04, 2017 | ||
25 | 25
order
Judgment
Mon 12/04 3:18 PM
JUDGMENT in favor of Danny Adams against Nancy A. Berryhill awarding plaintiff attorney fees and costs under the Equal Access to Justice Act, 28 U.S.C. 2412 in the amount of $6,928.64. (kwf) |
|
24 | 24
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Attorney Fees under the EAJA
Mon 12/04 3:10 PM
ORDER granting18 Motion for Attorney Fees under the EAJA. Plaintiff awarded attorney fees in the amount of $6,928.64. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 12/4/2017. (kwf) |
|
Friday, December 01, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
respm
Response Stating No Opposition
Fri 12/01 11:49 AM
Response Stating No Opposition by Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill re:18 Motion for Attorney Fees under the EAJA filed by Danny Adams, (Adili, Javitt) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, November 09, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
respm
Brief in Support
Thu 11/09 3:25 PM
Brief in Support of18 Motion for Attorney Fees under the EAJA by Plaintiff Danny Adams (Duncan, Dana) |
|
21 | 21
respm
Declaration
Thu 11/09 3:23 PM
Declaration of Fred Daley filed by Plaintiff Danny Adams re:18 Motion for Attorney Fees under the EAJA (Duncan, Dana) |
|
20 | 20
respm
Declaration
Thu 11/09 3:22 PM
Declaration of Barry Schultz filed by Plaintiff Danny Adams re:18 Motion for Attorney Fees under the EAJA (Duncan, Dana) |
|
19 | 19
respm
Affidavit
Thu 11/09 3:21 PM
Affidavit of Dana W. Duncan filed by Plaintiff Danny Adams re:18 Motion for Attorney Fees under the EAJA (Duncan, Dana) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Fee Agreement, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Attorney Time | ||
18 | 18
motion
Attorney Fees under the EAJA
Thu 11/09 3:20 PM
Motion for Attorney Fees under the EAJA by Plaintiff Danny Adams. Brief in Opposition due 11/30/2017. Brief in Reply due 12/11/2017. (Duncan, Dana) |
|
Thursday, October 19, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
order
Judgment
Thu 10/19 5:01 PM
JUDGMENT entered in favor of plaintiff remanding this case for further proceedings under sentence four of Section 205 of the Social Security Act, 42 U.S.C. 405(g). (kwf) |
|
16 | 16
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Remand
Thu 10/19 4:55 PM
ORDER granting15 Joint Stipulation to Remand. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 10/19/2017. (kwf) |
|
Wednesday, October 18, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
motion
Remand
Wed 10/18 5:14 PM
Joint MOTION TO REMAND by Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill. (Adili, Javitt) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Friday, October 06, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time
Fri 10/06 9:07 AM
** TEXT ONLY ORDER ** ORDER granting12 Motion for Extension of Time. Brief in Opposition due 10/18/2017. Brief in Reply due 11/2/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 10/6/2017. (kwf) |
|
Tuesday, October 03, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
respm
Declaration
Tue 10/03 5:55 PM
Declaration of Javitt Adili filed by Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill re:12 MOTION for Extension of Time (Adili, Javitt) |
|
12 | 12
motion
Extension of Time
Tue 10/03 5:52 PM
Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Defendant's Brief by Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer. (Adili, Javitt) |
|
Monday, August 21, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
respm
Brief in Support
Mon 08/21 4:56 PM
Brief in Support of10 Motion for Summary Judgment by Plaintiff Danny Adams (Duncan, Dana) |
|
10 | 10
motion
Summary Judgment
Mon 08/21 4:56 PM
MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Plaintiff Danny Adams. (Duncan, Dana) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Saturday, July 08, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Appearance
Sat 07/08 4:44 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by Javitt Adili for Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill. (Adili, Javitt) |
|
Thursday, July 06, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
motion
Social Security Hearing Transcript
Thu 07/06 1:32 PM
Supplemental Social Security Hearing Transcript by Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill. Brief in Support due 8/21/2017. Brief in Opposition due 10/4/2017. Brief in Reply due 10/19/2017. (Humphrey, Richard) |
|
Monday, May 22, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 05/22 10:57 AM
ANSWER by Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill. (Humphrey, Richard) |
|
6 | 6
motion
Social Security Hearing Transcript
Mon 05/22 10:56 AM
Social Security Hearing Transcript by Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill. Brief in Support due 7/6/2017. Brief in Opposition due 8/21/2017. Brief in Reply due 9/5/2017. (Humphrey, Richard) |
|
Wednesday, April 12, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
service
Affidavit of Service as to USA
Wed 04/12 3:50 PM
Affidavit of Service by Plaintiff. Nancy A. Berryhill served on 3/24/2017, answer due 5/23/2017. (Duncan, Dana) |
|
Friday, March 17, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Fri 03/17 10:43 AM
Summons Issued as to Nancy A. Berryhill. Materials returned to plaintiff's counsel for service. (kwf) |
|
Att: 1 Summons Issued as to Attorney General, | ||
Att: 2 Summons Issued as to U.S. Attorney's Office | ||
3 | 3
order
JDP Order on Oral Argument
Fri 03/17 10:14 AM
** TEXT ONLY ORDER ** From the affidavit of indigency plaintiff has submitted, I find that plaintiff is unable to prepay the fees and costs of commencing this action or to give security therefor. Accordingly, plaintiff's petition for leave to proceed without prepayment of the filing fee is granted. The clerk of court shall issue summonses and forward them to plaintiff's counsel for service. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 3/17/2017. (kwf) Modified on 3/17/2017. (kwf) |
|
utility
Add Judge for Shell Case Opening
Fri 03/17 10:40 AM
Case non-randomly assigned to District Judge William M. Conley and Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer. (kwf) |
||
utility
Standard Attachments Sent
Fri 03/17 10:41 AM
Standard attachments for District Judge William M. Conley required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service:[LINK:NORTC] ,[LINK:Corporate Disclosure Statement] . (kwf) |
||
Wednesday, March 15, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Wed 03/15 3:33 PM
Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Danny Adams. (Duncan, Dana) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 03/15 3:32 PM
COMPLAINT against Nancy A. Berryhill., filed by Danny Adams. (Duncan, Dana) |
|
Att: 1 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Summons, | ||
Att: 4 Summons |